NADAL v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MACKENZIE NADAL
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., The Cooper Companies Inc and Coopersurgical Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv03679
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. (rjc)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03198. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-33) THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1407 TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 12/16/20, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LEIGH MARTIN MAY. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (rjc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (fdc, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15261020), filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH LLC f/k/a Teva Women's Health, Inc., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NADAL v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACKENZIE NADAL
Represented By: Lauren A. Welling
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Represented By: Timothy M. Clark
Represented By: Tobias L. Millrood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Division Of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical Inc
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?