Ledford v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Larry Lamont Ledford
Defendant: Emmitt Perry, Jr., Tyler Perry Studio's, TP Development LLC, Christian Keyes and Dayna Thomas Law Firm LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03747
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Dayna Thomas Law Firm LLC, Emmitt Perry, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ah)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 Motion for Service by Larry Lamont Ledford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ah)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 (Motion to Deny construed by Clerk as) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Reissue Summons filed by Larry Lamont Ledford. (ah) Modified to add motion on 10/28/2021 (ah).
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 (Motion to Deny construed by Clerk as) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Larry Lamont Ledford. (ah)
October 19, 2021 Submission of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ceo)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by Dayna Thomas Law Firm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Counts, Cynthia) . Added MOTION to Dismiss on 10/5/2021 (ceo).
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar of Copyrights. (cmd)
September 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Registrar of Copyrights re #6 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (cmd)
September 28, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Larry Lamont Ledford re #6 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (cmd)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed AO 121 Forms by Larry Lamont Ledford. (Attachments: #1 (Emmitt Perry Jr), #2 (Dayna Thomas))(cmd)
September 17, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Larry Lamont Ledford re 9/10/2021 Notice of Deficiency re AO Form 121. (bgt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of mailing re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued to Tyler Perry Studios, Dayna Thomas and Christina Keyes via Priority Mail by Larry Lamont Ledford. (adg)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dayna Thomas Law Firm LLC, Christian Keyes and Tyler Perry Studio's. (Attachments: #1 Dayna Thomas, #2 C. Keyes)(eop)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Larry Lamont Ledford. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100132670) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Payment Receipt)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 10, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Larry L. Ledford as to Larry Lamont Ledford regarding #3 Order. (mlb)
September 10, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledford v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lamont Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmitt Perry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Perry Studio's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TP Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Thomas Law Firm LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L. Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?