E. N. v. Gwinnett County Schools Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: E. N.
Defendant: Gwinnett County Schools Board of Education, Dr. Calvin J. Watts, Everton Blair, Jr., Karen Watkins, Steven B. Knudsen, Dr. Tarece Johnson and Dr. Mary Kay Murphy
Case Number: 1:2021cv03909
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Everton Blair, Jr, Gwinnett County Schools Board of Education, Tarece Johnson, Steven B. Knudsen, Mary Kay Murphy, Karen Watkins, Calvin J. Watts. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Young, Jill)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Mary Kay Murphy served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Everton Blair, Jr. served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Karen Watkins served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Steven B. Knudsen served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Tarece Johnson served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by E. N. Calvin J. Watts served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (rjc)
October 1, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to E. N. re #8 Order Reassigning Case. (adg) Modified on 10/1/2021 (adg).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DECLINING ASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-3909-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/24/2021. (adg)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mary Kay Murphy. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tarece Johnson. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Steven B. Knudsen. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Karen Watkins. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Everton Blair, Jr.. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Calvin J. Watts. (eop)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by E. N., minor, (by and through her parent, Mary Beth Nelson). (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100132826) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. N. v. Gwinnett County Schools Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwinnett County Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Calvin J. Watts
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everton Blair, Jr.
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Watkins
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Knudsen
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tarece Johnson
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mary Kay Murphy
Represented By: Jill Thrasher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?