IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF: VUZ-Bank JSC For an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Directing Discovery for Use in Proceedings in Dubai, United Arab Emirates
Plaintiff: VUZ-Bank JSC
Not Classified By Court: Ashley Anderson Bahceci
Intervenor: Deniz Yelda Bahceci and Alettin Bahceci
Case Number: 1:2021cv04014
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: J Clay Fuller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1782
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING the #9 Motion to Intervene and Deniz Yelda Bahceci And Alettin Bahceci (Intervenors) shall be allowed to intervene in this matter. The Clerk is DIRECTED to reflect their status as Intervenors on the docket. If Ms. Anderson and/or Intervenors object to VUZ Banks subpoena, in whole or in part, they are DIRECTED to file their motion to quash or other appropriate motion setting forth their objections to the subpoena or particular requests therein NO LATER THAN 14 DAYS from the date of entry of this Order. Responses to any motions filed shall be filed NO LATER THAN 14 DAYS after the motion is filed, and replies shall by due NO LATER THAN 14 DAYS thereafter. If no such motions are filed, the Court may lift the stay and direct compliance with the subpoena. Production of discovery in response to the subpoena shall remain STAYED until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/24/21. (jpa)
November 23, 2021 Submission of #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene , to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by VUZ-Bank JSC. (McKnight, Charles)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Ashley Anderson Bahceci. (Surden, Todd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order (Minute entry) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 11/22/2021 for VUZ-Bank to respond to the #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/15/2021. (clk)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re: #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by VUZ-Bank JSC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKnight, Charles)
November 4, 2021 Submission of #11 Status Report, #10 Order,, Set Submission Deadline,, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by VUZ-Bank JSC. (McKnight, Charles)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING VUZ Bank and Ms. Anderson to file a response to the #9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene within 14 days. Until the Court decides the issue of whether Deniz Yelda Bahceci and Alettin Bahceci will be allowed to intervene, production of discovery in response to the subpoena at issue is STAYED and no production of such discovery shall be made until the Court decides the motion to intervene and provides further direction. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/1/21. (jpa)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Deniz Yelda Bahceci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Proposed Pleading)(Andrews, Lucas)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Vuz Bank and Ms. Anderson to file a status report NO LATER THAN 14 DAYS from the date of entry of this Order in which they set forth the status of Ms. Andersons compliance with the subpoena at issue. If Vuz Bank and Ms. Anderson indicate that no further action from the Court is required, the Court will close this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 10/20/21. (jpa)
September 27, 2021 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:21-mi-00078-MLB-JCF. (adg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Responses and Objections to the Subpoena of VUZ-Bank JSC re #4 Order on Motion for Order, filed by Ashley Anderson Bahceci. (Yadlosky, Kristen) Text modified on 9/28/2021 (adg).
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Harris Surden on behalf of Anderson Bahecci (Surden, Todd)
September 16, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Kaplan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11254310). Attorney Jacob Kaplan added appearing on behalf of VUZ-Bank JSC (cdg)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by VUZ-Bank JSC re #4 Order on Motion for Order, Declaration of Service (McKnight, Charles)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 Ex Parte Application for Order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 directing discovery for use in proceedings in Dubai, United Arab Emirates. VUZ Bank shall serve Ashley Anderson Bahceci with the Subpoena attached to its Application (see Doc. 1-2 at 3-7) and a copy of this Order no later than 5 days of entry of this Order and shall file proof of such service as soon as reasonably practicable thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/14/2021. (adg)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Kaplan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11254310).by VUZ-Bank JSC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKnight, Charles) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 13, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION for Order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Directing Discovery for Use in Proceedings in Dubai, United Arab Emirates, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by VUZ-Bank JSC. (eop)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Directing Discovery for Use in Proceedings in Dubai, United Arab Emirates with Brief In Support by VUZ-Bank JSC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(eop)
September 10, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11250700 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF: VUZ-Bank JSC For an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Directing Discovery for Use in Proceedings in Dubai, United Arab Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VUZ-Bank JSC
Represented By: Charles K. McKnight, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ashley Anderson Bahceci
Represented By: Todd Harris Surden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Deniz Yelda Bahceci
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alettin Bahceci
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?