Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Turner
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04476
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglass Alan Kreis. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/3/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa)
December 1, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255). Attorney Douglass A. Kreis added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (gas)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255).by Heather Turner. (Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Robert Bell, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answers due 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. (jpa)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Anthony Osborne. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa)
November 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Robert Bell, III re #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jpa)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice E. Snedeker on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice)
November 24, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Anthony Osborne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413195).. Attorney Joseph A. Osborne added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (nmb)
November 24, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Bell, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413104).. Attorney J Robert Bell, III added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (nmb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Anthony Osborne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413195).by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Bell, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413104).by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Douglass A. Kreis. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to J Robert Bell, III. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph A. Osborne. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Wright Medical Group, Inc.)(jpa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Heather Turner. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11358207) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Turner
Represented By: Charles Andrew Childers
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: Richard R. Schlueter
Represented By: J Robert Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Alice E. Snedeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alice E. Snedeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?