Park 80 Hotels LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Park 80 Hotels, LLC and PL Hotels, LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc. and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Case Number: 1:2021cv04650
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Andrew P. Bleiman as to PL Hotels, LLC re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #62 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Peter Bleiman. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/6/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
January 5, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #62 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Peter Bleiman Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11490083). Attorney Andrew P. Bleiman added appearing on behalf of PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC (cdg)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #61 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark Ian Fishbein. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/4/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
January 4, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Mark Fishbein as to PL Hotels, LLC regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
January 4, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #61 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Ian Fishbein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11486991).. Attorney Mark Fishbein added appearing on behalf of PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC (gas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 62 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Peter Bleiman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11490083).by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 30, 2021 Filing 61 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Ian Fishbein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11486991).by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Consolidate Cases and #58 Motion to Transfer Case. The PH Lodging Tomball case (No. 1:21-cv-5072-SDG), the Bensalem case (No. 1:21-cv-5081-LMM), and the Synergy Hotels case (1:21-cv-5164-MHC) are transferred to Judge Ross, who currently is presiding over the first filed and first-transferred action; and the above referenced related cases shall be consolidated with the Park 80 Hotels case (No. 1:21-cv-4650-ELR) for pretrial proceedings pursuant to Rule 42(a). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/29/21. (ceo)
December 27, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by MaryBeth Vassil Gibson on behalf of PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC (Gibson, MaryBeth)
December 22, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Stipulated Notice of Related Cases, Joint MOTION to Transfer Subsequently Filed Related Cases, and Joint Motion to Consolidated Related Cases for Pretrial Proceedings by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Ronald) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 12/23/2021 (ceo).
December 17, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. and Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel of Matthew A. Woolf and Kristen Lewis Hayes (Coleman, Ronald)
December 3, 2021 Filing 56 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kristen L. Hayes. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 55 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew A. Woolf. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 54 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Justin E. Proper. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 53 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark Fishbein. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 52 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Andrew P. Bleiman. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 51 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Justin Michael Klein. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph C. Peiffer. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 49 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel J. Carr. Clerk to follow-up by 12/13/2021. (nmb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 10, 2021 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00974. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #26 Motion to transfer venue is GRANTED, as set forth herein. The action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/9/2021.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/8/2021. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND REASONS that the defendants #27 Request/Statement of Oral Argument is DENIED. Unless otherwise ordered, the motion to transfer shall be heard on 11/10/2021, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/4/2021.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 41 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. 1. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section Judge Martin L.C. Feldman (F) and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas (3). (bw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia . (Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Cassity Miller. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald T. Coleman, Jr. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anne Horn Baroody, for Defendants. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 33 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9058033) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 32 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9058020) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 31 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9058009) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Matthew A. Woolf added to party IHG Owners Association, Inc.(pty:dft).(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' #25 Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within 28 days following the date the Court enters an order on the Motion To Transfer, and the defendants shall file any reply within 21 days thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing date on the defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby continued to January 12, 2022, on the papers, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/7/2021.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC and co-defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) Modified text/filers on 10/7/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 Declaration by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. of Jenny Tidwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 27 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. regarding #26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia (Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Woolf, Matthew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, IHG Owners Association, Inc. by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Peiffer, Joseph) Modified on 8/24/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File in Excess Pages. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants are granted leave to file a memorandum in support of their Motion to Dismiss, not to exceed 35 pages. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/19/2021. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Class Certification. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to move for class certification is hereby extended to 60 days after any ruling on Defendants' forthcoming motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/18/2021. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew A. Woolf added to party Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Woolf added to party Six Continents Hotels, Inc.(pty:dft).(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to IHG Owners Association, Inc. on 6/27/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 , #17 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is "Waiver of Service Returned Executed," which automatically calculates answer deadlines. Clerk took corrective action to reset dates as follows: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021; and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; Six Continents Hotels, Inc. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Peiffer, Joseph) Modified event/dates on 7/29/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021 (Peiffer, Joseph) Modified event/dates on 7/29/2021 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Fishbein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew P. Bleiman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin M Klein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin Proper. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin Klein (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8906679) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Justin Klein, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Electronic Filing Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark Fishbein (Fee previously paid) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Fishbein, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Bleiman (Fee previously paid) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Bleiman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin E. Proper (Filing fee $100 receipt number ALAEDC-8904347) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Justin Proper, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Electronic Filing Form)(Peiffer, Joseph) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark Fishbein (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8904336) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Fishbein, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 **DEFICIENT** PARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Bleiman (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8903543) by PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Bleiman Statement Under Oath, #3 Proposed Order)(Peiffer, Joseph) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (bm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Peiffer, Joseph) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8866650) filed by Park 80 Hotels, LLC, PL Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Franchise Agreement, #3 HHF Summons, #4 Six Continents Hotels Summons)Attorney Joseph C. Peiffer added to party PL Hotels, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Joseph C. Peiffer added to party Park 80 Hotels, LLC (pty:pla).(Peiffer, Joseph) Modified text/filer on 5/20/2021 (bm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park 80 Hotels LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park 80 Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Daniel J. Carr
Represented By: Joseph C. Peiffer
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PL Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Daniel J. Carr
Represented By: Joseph C. Peiffer
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Kristen L. Hayes
Represented By: Matthew A. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Kristen L. Hayes
Represented By: Matthew A. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?