Main Street America Assurance Company v. Martinez Brick and Masonry Company et al
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Defendant: Martinez Brick and Masonry Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company and Pulte Home Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv04927
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument by Pulte Home Company, LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Oliver, Shannan) Modified on 1/28/2022 to edit text. (cmd)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - ROR Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Martinez Notice Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - MSA Notice Letter)(Oliver, Shannan) . Added MOTION for More Definite Statement and edited text on 1/27/2022. (cmd)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave of Absence of Shannan F. Oliver: March 10-14, 2022; April 4-12, 2022; May 26-31, 2022; June 1-3, 2022; July 4-11, 2022; September 1-6 and 26-30, 2022; October 1-3, 2022; November 21-28, 2022; December 22-31, 2022; January 1-3, 2023 by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliver, Shannan)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Martinez Brick and Masonry Company. (cmd)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Main Street America Assurance Company to serve Martinez Brick through Secretary of State (Stewart, Walker)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/12/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
January 11, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark A. Boyle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11497749). Attorney Mark A. Boyle added appearing on behalf of Pulte Home Company, LLC (cdg)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including February 4, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/6/22. (bnw)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark A. Boyle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11497749).by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Oliver, Shannan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting consent motion)(Richardson, Lisa)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move Against or Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Pulte Home Company's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/5/22. (bnw)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Proposed Order)(Oliver, Shannan)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/28/21. (bnw)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Pulte Home Company, LLC served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Stewart, Walker)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Ohio Security Insurance Company served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Stewart, Walker)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Martinez Brick and Masonry Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ohio, #2 Summons Pulte)(jra)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11430943) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street America Assurance Company v. Martinez Brick and Masonry Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: John A Wilkerson
Represented By: Walker Steven Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez Brick and Masonry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa R. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Boyle
Represented By: Shannan Freeman Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?