Associated Industries Ins. Co. v. Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Associated Industries Ins. Co.
Defendant: Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc., Atlanta Productions Inc. doing business as Music Matters and George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv04939
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Marshall, Michael)
January 20, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance - Wangerin by George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services (Wangerin, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 18 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11,12, 13, 14, 2022, by Kevin A. Wangerin. (Wangerin, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 17 First Certificate of Interested Persons by George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services. (Wangerin, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 Lovell ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial)(Wangerin, Kevin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 17-18, 2022, April 1-8, 2022, April 27-29, 2002, May 13, 2022, May 21-31, 2022, September 14-18, 2022, by Kevin Allen Maxim. (Maxim, Kevin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Atlanta Productions Inc., Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Supplement Certificate of Compliance)(Maxim, Kevin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Allred, William)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 02/03/2022, 02/04/2022, 03/07/2022, 03/08/2022, 03/09/2022, 03/10/2022, 03/11/2022, by William Allred. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allred, William)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc. served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Allred, William)
January 4, 2022 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 1/4/2022 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Atlanta Productions Inc. Answer due 1/18/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 27, 2021. (ash)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Atlanta Productions, Inc. d/b/a Music Matters to Answer Complaint)(Allred, William)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. Atlanta Productions Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Allred, William)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties may renew their motion at the appropriate time but must indicate whether defendants have been served and the current deadlines for their Answer. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 21, 2021. (ash)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Hiscox Inc. Co., Inc. and Atlanta Productions, Inc. d/b/a Music Matters to Answer Complaint)(Allred, William) Modified on 12/21/2021 to edit event per chambers(jkb).
December 17, 2021 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (rvb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11432875. (Allred, William)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Allred, William)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 3, 2021. (ash)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Associated Industries Ins. Co.. (Allred, William)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Productions Inc., George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services, Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons George, #2 Summons Hiscox)(jra)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Associated Industries Ins. Co. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11432955) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Industries Ins. Co. v. Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Industries Ins. Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Howard
Represented By: William Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Ins. Co. Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Productions Inc. doing business as Music Matters
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Lovell III Audio Visual Services
Represented By: Michael James Marshall
Represented By: Kevin A. Wangerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?