Davis v. Upton
Defendant: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Petitioner: Donald Davis
Respondent: Steve Upton
Case Number: 1:2021cv04957
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00121. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia for further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/03/2021. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/3/2021.]
December 3, 2021 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aar)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray no longer assigned to the case. (pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/3/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Donald Davis re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JH) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/3/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donald Davis.(JH) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/3/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SAV038136. (JH) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?