Williams et al v. Capshaw Development Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Williams and Michael Dotson
Defendant: Capshaw Development Company, LLC, Geosam Capital US, LP, Kevin Daniel, Silverstone Residential LLC and Scott Sibley
Case Number: 1:2021cv05024
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Kevin Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Brief Kevin Daniel's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Daniel)(Weigel, Daniel)
February 4, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Geosam Capital US, LP. (Attachments: #1 Brief Non-existent Defendant Geosam Capital US, LP's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Alise Hoffman, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jared Brode)(Weigel, Daniel)
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Weigel on behalf of Kevin Daniel, Geosam Capital US, LP (Weigel, Daniel)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Geosam Capital US, LP and Kevin Daniel shall have through and including February 4, 2022 to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 1, 2022. (ash)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendants Geosam Capital US, LP and Kevin Daniel to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Geosam Capital US, LP. (Pendergrast, Craig)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Michael Dotson, Robert Williams re #4 Order - Certificate of Compliance (Stack, Donald)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have through, and including February 14, 2022 to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 24, 2022. (ash)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Michael Dotson, Robert Williams. (Stack, Donald)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/15/2022 - 2/18/2022, 5/23/2022 - 05/31/2022, 7/7/2022 - 07/19/2022, 10/24/2022 - 10/28/2022, by Douglas K. Burrell. (Burrell, Douglas) Modified on 1/10/2022 to edit text(jkb).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Geosam Capital US, LP and Kevin Daniel shall have through January 31, 2022 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 5, 2022. (ash)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re: #1 Complaint, (Consent Request) by Kevin Daniel, Geosam Capital US, LP. (Pendergrast, Craig)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Capshaw Development Company, LLC. Discovery ends on 6/3/2022.(Burrell, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Robert Williams, Michael Dotson. Kevin Daniel served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Stack, Donald)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Robert Williams, Michael Dotson. Capshaw Development Company, LLC served on 12/16/2021, answer due 1/6/2022; Geosam Capital US, LP served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022; Scott Sibley served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022; Silverstone Residential LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Stack, Donald)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 10, 2021. (ash)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Dotson, Robert Williams. (Stack, Donald)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Capshaw Development Company, LLC, Kevin Daniel, Geosam Capital US, LP, Scott Sibley, Silverstone Residential LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Geosam, #2 Summons K. Daniel, #3 Summons S. Sibley, #4 Summons Silverstone)(jkb)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Williams, Michael Dotson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11445723) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Capshaw Development Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: George Lott
Represented By: Jaclyn Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dotson
Represented By: Donald D. J. Stack
Represented By: George Lott
Represented By: Jaclyn Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capshaw Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Kramer
Represented By: Douglas K. Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geosam Capital US, LP
Represented By: Craig K. Pendergrast
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Daniel
Represented By: Craig K. Pendergrast
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverstone Residential LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?