BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC v. HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP and IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05081
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ceo)
January 6, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
January 4, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC (Gibson, MaryBeth)
December 30, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The PH Lodging Tomball case (No. 1:21-cv-5072-SDG), the Bensalem case (No. 1:21-cv-5081-LMM), and the Synergy Hotels case (1:21-cv-5164-MHC) are transferred to Judge Ross, who currently is presiding over the first filed and first-transferred action; and the above referenced related cases shall be consolidated with the Park 80 Hotels case (No. 1:21-cv-4650-ELR) for pretrial proceedings pursuant to Rule 42(a). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/29/21. (ceo)
December 29, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Judge Leigh Martin May no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-05081-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ceo)
December 29, 2021 Submission of #10 Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ceo)
December 27, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MaryBeth Vassil Gibson on behalf of BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC (Gibson, MaryBeth)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed for a period of thirty (30) days from the date of the parties' Consent Motion. Upon the expiration of such period, the parties shall submit a status report as to the issues outlined in their Consent Motion. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/23/21. (ceo)
December 22, 2021 Filing 34 Consent MOTION to Stay Or, in the Alternative, Extend Briefing Deadlines as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Ronald)
December 22, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Stipulated Notice of Related Cases, Joint Motion to Transfer Subsequently Filed Related Cases, and Joint Motion to Consolidated Related Cases for Pretrial Proceedings by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP. (Coleman, Ronald)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Because Defendants consent to the withdrawal and because they will remain represented by counsel, the Court APPROVES the withdrawal. #31 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Charles S. Marion and Lauren E. O'Donnell as counsel of record for Defendants as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/22/21. (ceo)
December 20, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP and Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel (Coleman, Ronald)
December 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin E. Proper on behalf of BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC (Proper, Justin)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: It appears that a motion to dismiss was filed in by Defendants on August 27, 2021, Dkt. No. #10 , but that briefing has not been completed. Defendants have also requested oral argument on the motion. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff file a response to the motion to dismiss within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Defendants may file a reply brief pursuant to Rule 7.1(C) of the Local Rules of this Court. The Court will consider the request for oral argument when briefing is complete. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned for further consideration 28 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/14/2021. (cmd)
December 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to counsel for BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC re #29 Order. (cmd)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/13/2021. (bnp)
December 13, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02882. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2021 Submission of #10 Motion to dismiss, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (aar)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/10/21. 12/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 12/13/2021 (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
December 10, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/10/21. 12/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
November 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP re #11 MOTION to Transfer Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP. (O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer filed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC. (PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 CONSENT MOTION REGARDING BRIEFING. ACCORDINGLY, IF THIS COURT DENIES DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER, (ECF #11 ), PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF #10 ), WITHIN TWENTY-EIGHT (28) DAYS OF THE ORDER DENYING TRANSFER, AND DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A REPLY WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS OF THE FILING OF THE RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/19/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.Certificate of Service.(PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND TRANSFER IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF MAY RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER BY 10/22/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/16/21. 9/16/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Transfer , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.Certificate of Service.(PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RONALD T. COLEMAN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/13/21. 9/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JARED C. MILLER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/13/21. 9/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANNE HORN BAROODY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/13/21. 9/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Ronald T. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15399696.) filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.Certificate of Service.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jared C. Miller ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15399682.) filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.Certificate of Service.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Anne Horn Baroody ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15399651.) filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.Certificate of Service.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration with attached Exhs A-E, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including InterContinental Hotels Group PLC with Certificate of Service by SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including InterContinental Hotels Group PLC with Certificate of Service by HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC.(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES S. MARION on behalf of HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP with Certificate of Service(MARION, CHARLES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. O'DONNELL on behalf of HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC As To IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.(PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC. SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC. HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/30/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC.(PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15220931.), filed by BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(PROPER, JUSTIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC v. HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENSALEM LODGING ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Lauren E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. D/B/A INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Lauren E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?