Synergy Hotels, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Synergy Hotels, LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group and IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05164
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. MaryBeth Vassil Gibson replacing attorney Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr and Matthew R. Wilson. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Ashley L. Oliker. Clerk to follow-up by 1/18/2022. (nmb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 1/18/2022. (nmb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew R. Wilson. Clerk to follow-up by 1/18/2022. (nmb)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The PH Lodging Tomball case (No. 1:21-cv-5072-SDG), the Bensalem case (No. 1:21-cv-5081-LMM), and the Synergy Hotels case (1:21-cv-5164-MHC) are transferred to Judge Ross, who currently is presiding over the first filed and first-transferred action; and the above referenced related cases shall be consolidated with the Park 80 Hotels case (No. 1:21-cv-4650-ELR) for pretrial proceedings pursuant to Rule 42(a). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/29/21. (ceo)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-05164-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ceo)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by MaryBeth Vassil Gibson on behalf of Synergy Hotels, LLC (Gibson, MaryBeth)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Stipulated Notice of Related Cases, Joint Motion to Transfer Subsequently Filed Related Cases, and Joint Motion to Consolidated Related Cases for Pretrial Proceedings by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Coleman, Ronald)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. and Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel (Coleman, Ronald)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03248. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION and ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/17/21. (sem) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Northern District of Georgia.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sem) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer) filed by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTATION ORDER granting #17 , #18 , #19 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne H. Baroody, Ronald T. Coleman, Jr. and Jared Cassity Miller. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/17/2021. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Filing fee for docs #17 , #18 & #19 : $ 600.00, receipt number 200COL067786. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Jared Cassity Miller by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Ronald T. Coleman, Jr. by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Anne H. Baroody by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A) (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer) filed by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer) filed by Plaintiff Synergy Hotels, LLC. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion For Modification of the Court's Order re: Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Opposition due 28 days after the Court enters an order on the Motion to Transfer (Doc. #9 ). Defendants' Reply due 21 days after Plaintiff's Opposition is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/6/21. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION Modification of Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Dismiss) by Plaintiff Synergy Hotels, LLC. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Dismiss, #9 Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer. Responses due by 10/22/2021 Replies due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/15/21. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Dismiss), #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer) New date requested 10/22/2021. by Plaintiff Synergy Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Transfer) by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. D/B/A Intercontinental Hotels Groups Motion to Dismiss) by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Synergy Hotels, LLC of Dismissal without Prejudice of IHG Owners Association, Inc. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Consent Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Page Limitation in Responding to Complaint) (Oliker, Ashley) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to IHG Owners Association, Inc. on 7/8/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Six Continents Hotels, Inc. on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc. and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8348635), filed by Synergy Hotels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, #4 Summons Form Intercontinental Hotels Group, #5 Summons Form IHG Owners Association) (Boyle, Michael) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 12/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy Hotels, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Wilson
Represented By: Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr.
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley L. Oliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley L. Oliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?