Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc. and Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.
Defendant: State of Georgia, Brian Kemp and Brad Raffensperger
Case Number: 1:2021cv05338
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth L Branch
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
2 Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 10301 Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Canter. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 9, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #42 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Canter Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Jacob Canter added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 2/7/2022 -2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM: aptops, tablets, and/or cellular telephones that may contain cameras, including iPhones, Androids, or other smart phones/personal digital assistants (PDAs): Kurt Kastorf, Keith Harrison, Toni Michelle Jackson, Astor H. L. Heaven, Shira Liu, and Jacob Canter. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/04/2022. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Canter Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 3, 2022 Filing 41 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONSOLIDATING Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, et al. v. State of Georgia, et al., 1:21-cv-5338-ELB-SCJ-SDG and Common Cause, et al. v. Raffensperger, et al., 1:22-cv-00090-ELB-SCJ-SDG pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42 and in the exercise of the Court's discretion. The above-stated cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including discovery and trial. The Clerk is DIRECTED to designate both cases as related/member cases on CM/ECF. For the time being, the cases will maintain separate identities and the parties shall continue to file under the two respective civil action numbers for the particular case at issue, using that case's existing caption/case style; however, for all joint matters (or matters that will affect both cases), the parties shall file in both cases using the above-stated dual caption/case style so that the matter is docketed in both cases. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raija Horstman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shira Liu Pro. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith J. Harrison. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Toni Michelle Jackson. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Astor H.L. Heaven. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 RETURN of #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Party not listed on form and format. (nmb)
February 3, 2022 RETURN of #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Canter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548805). to attorney for correction re: Unable to Confirm Bar Membership. (nmb)
February 2, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Raija Horstman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548795).. Attorney Raija Horstman added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for specific dates and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/1/2022. (ddm)
February 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Astor H.L. Heaven Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Astor H. L. Heaven added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
February 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Toni Michelle Jackson Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Toni Michelle Jackson added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
February 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Shira Liu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548717).. Attorney Shira Liu added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
February 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith J. Harrison Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Keith J. Harrison added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (nmb)
January 28, 2022 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ezra David Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 27, 2022 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacob Canter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548805).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Raija Horstman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548795).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Shira Liu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11548717).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith J. Harrison Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Toni Michelle Jackson Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 27, 2022 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Astor H.L. Heaven Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 25, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ezra David Rosenberg added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (cdg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice.by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jon Greenbaum. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP of Withdrawal of Counsel, Esperanza Segarra. (Kastorf, Kurt) Modified on 1/18/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
January 13, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia (McGowan, Charlene)
January 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11505803). Attorney Jon M. Greenbaum added appearing on behalf of Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP (cdg)
January 13, 2022 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith Harrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504485). to attorney for correction re: form. (gas)
January 13, 2022 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Toni Michelle Jackson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504486). to attorney for correction re:form. (gas)
January 13, 2022 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Astor H.L. Heaven Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504487). to attorney for correction re: form. (gas)
January 13, 2022 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11507088). to attorney for correction RE: Form. (cdg)
January 13, 2022 RETURN of #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504484). to attorney for correction re:form. (gas)
January 12, 2022 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg: Rule 16 conference held via Zoom in Alpha Phi Alpha v. Raffensperger, 1:21-cv-5337-SCJ; Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia, 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Pendergrass v. Raffensperger, 1:21-CV-5339-SCJ; Common Cause et al v. Raffensperger, 1:22-cv-00090-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Grant v. Raffensperger, 1:22-CV-0122-SCJ. (Court Reporter Viola Zbrowski)(pdw)
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt)
January 11, 2022 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Status Report by Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2022 Election Calendar, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from B. Evans regarding redistricting)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 11, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #19 Order. This document was incorrectly filed in this civil action. This order will be docketed in the correct civil action, number 1:22-CV-00090- ELB-SCJ-SDG. (ddm)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR) ORDER setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to follow by separate notice.) The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY,JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues (set forth herein.) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. (pdw) Modified on 1/11/2022 to note this order was filed in the wrong case and has been re-docketed in the correct case, 1:22-CV-90-ELB-SCJ-SDG (ddm).
January 10, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11507088).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 10, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11505803).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER AMENDING #9 Order setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to remain as previously noticed). The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY, JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues set forth in the Courts prior order at Doc. No. #9 after conferring with the parties in 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ; and 1:22-cv-00090-ELB-SCJ-SDG. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. (pdw)
January 8, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Astor H.L. Heaven Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504487).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 8, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Toni Michelle Jackson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504486).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 8, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith Harrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504485).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 8, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11504484).by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia (Strickland, Frank)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia (Paradise, Loree Anne)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia (Jacoutot, Bryan)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to follow by separate notice.) The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY,JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues (set forth herein.) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/06/2022. (pdw)
January 6, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING: RULE 16 CONFERENCE set for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg. Connection Instructions: Topic: Rule 16 Conference: 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; and 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605120572 Passcode: 851671 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# or +16468287666,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 551 285 1373 or +1 669 216 1590 Webinar ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 International numbers available: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abdGvu42dG Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 SIP: 1605120572@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 851671 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Designating Three-Judge Court Judge Steven D. Grimberg and Circuit Judge Elizabeth L. Branch to serve with Judge Steve C. Jones. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Pryor, Jr. on 01/04/2022. (rvb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brian Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, State of Georgia (Tyson, Bryan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to State of Georgia. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER referring this matter to the Chief Judge of the Eleventh Circuit so that he may appoint a three-judge panel. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/03/2022. (pdw)
January 3, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #3 Order: copies transmitted via email to Chief Judge of the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals by chambers staff. (pdw)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP. (adg)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc., Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11487605) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Astor H. L. Heaven
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jacob Canter
Represented By: Keith J. Harrison
Represented By: Raija Horstman
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Toni Michelle Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jacob Canter
Represented By: Keith J. Harrison
Represented By: Raija Horstman
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Toni Michelle Jackson
Represented By: Astor H. L. Heaven
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Astor H. L. Heaven
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Gilda Rae Williams
Represented By: Jacob Canter
Represented By: Keith J. Harrison
Represented By: Raija Horstman
Represented By: Shira Liu
Represented By: Toni Michelle Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Georgia
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?