Pendergrass et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: Coakley Pendergrass, Triana Arnold James, Elliott Hennington, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert and Ojuan Glaze
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Matthew Mashburn, Anh Le and Edward Lindsey
Case Number: 1:2021cv05339
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 10301 Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 89 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. Discovery ends on 7/25/2022.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 18, 2022 Filing 88 Proposed Findings of Fact by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 87 Proposed Findings of Fact by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam)
February 18, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Arkansas State Conf. of the NAACP v. Arkansas Board of Apportionment)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 14, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 11, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 10. 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 9, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 7, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 15, 2022 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/14/2022, Afternoon Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 15, 2022 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/11/2022, A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 15, 2022 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Preliiminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/10/2022, A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 15, 2022 Filing 76 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 24-25, 2022, April 4-8, 2022, May 23-27, 2022, and July 5-8, 2022, by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Lewis, Joyce)
February 15, 2022 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/9/2022, A.M. Session before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 15, 2022 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Hearing Injunction held on 2/8/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 15, 2022 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/7/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 COORDINATED ORDER directing the parties to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2022. Parties are further ORDERED to file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to CM/ECF and e-mail a word copy the Court's Courtroom Deputy (see order for contact information). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/14/2022. (ddm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting the #70 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before February 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/11/2022. (ddm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #69 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/11/2022. (pdw) Modified on 2/11/2022 to edit docket link (ddm).
February 10, 2022 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2012 Districting Maps and Data, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2014 Districting Maps and Data, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2015 Districting Maps and Data)(Sparks, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE Of Filing Subpoenas to Appear and Testify by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N. Boren Subpoena, #2 Errata R. Barron Subpoena)(Lewis, Joyce)
February 9, 2022 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT re #66 Response (Non-Motion) Declaration of Jonathan P. Hawley by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - B. Esselstyn 2nd Supplemental Expert Report)(Sparks, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 66 RESPONSE re #65 Order, filed by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - In light of the Supreme Court's decision this Court hereby ORDERS the parties to arrive to court tomorrow morning prepared to discuss whether this Court should continue to hold the current hearing regarding Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunctions. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/7/2022. (pdw)
February 4, 2022 Filing 63 STIPULATION re #51 Order, Joint Stipulated Facts for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam)
February 4, 2022 Filing 62 Expert Report of Gina Wright by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 61 Expert Report of Lynn Bailey by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 60 Expert Report of John R. Alford, Ph.D. by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 COURT'S NOTICE REGARDING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED TO COMMENCE ON FEBRUARY 7, 2022 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 1907: As part of the Court's COVID-19 safety protocols, a maximum of 24 non-party observers will be permitted to attend. A maximum of 7 members of press will be permitted to sit in the jury box; however, entrance to and egress from the jury box will be limited to prior to start of court and during breaks only. COURTROOM 2105 WILL BE USED FOR OVERFLOW SEATING, WITH A LIVE AUDIO STREAM PROVIDED. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 COORDINATED ORDER regarding Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' witnesses and exhibits #55 . The Court declines to rule on these objections prior to the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court instructs Defendants to raise their objections to a specific exhibit when Plaintiffs move to introduce the exhibit into evidence. At that time, the Court will rule on the Defendants' objection to that particular exhibit. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER directing Defendants to file on the docket expert reports by Lynn Bailey, Gina Wright, and Dr. John Alford by no later than 12:00 p.m. (EST) on Friday, February 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 2/04/2022 - 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM: Graham W. White, Michael B. Jones, Kevin J. Hamilton, Abha Khanna Adam M. Sparks, Joyce Gist Lewis, and Jonathan. P. Hawley, and their accompanying staff, Patricia Marino, Benjamin Winstead and Patina Clarke. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Submission of #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER AMENDMENT to #57 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom: the parties will NOT be permitted to bring additional tables into the Courtroom. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)
February 2, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Lewis, Joyce) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 2, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Witnesses and Exhibits by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger re #51 Order, (Tyson, Bryan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #47 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief Joined by Georgia in Merrill v. Milligan)(Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 2/1/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
January 31, 2022 Filing 53 Witness List by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Lewis, Joyce)
January 31, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan re #51 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31, #26 Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit 33, #28 Exhibit 34, #29 Exhibit 35, #30 Exhibit 36, #31 Exhibit 37)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 COORDINATED ORDER issued for purposes of perfecting the record as to the February 7-14, 2022 coordinated in-person hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for specifics on pre-hearing deadlines, stipulations, hearing schedule and covid-19 mitigation protocols. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' request for certification of this ruling for immediate appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is denied. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER advising that on January 7, 2022, Mr. Edward Lindsey was appointed to replace Rebecca Sullivan on the State Election Board and directing the Clerk update the docket and case-style to this regard. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 26, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE Of Filing PARTIES CONSOLIDATED PRESENTATION SCHEDULE by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert re #41 Order,,,,,,, Set Submission Deadline,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, (Lewis, Joyce)
January 25, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE Of Filing of Supplemental Authority by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert re #39 Response in Opposition to Motion, #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Caster v. Merrill Order (01/26/22))(Sparks, Adam)
January 20, 2022 Filing 46 Second Declaration of Kevin J. Hamilton in Support of #32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suppl. Expert Report of William S. Cooper, #2 Exhibit 2 - Suppl. Expert Report of Dr. Orville Vernon Burton)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 1/21/2022 to edit docket entry (ddm).
January 20, 2022 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam)
January 20, 2022 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Tyson, Bryan)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file an additional five pages, for a total of 20 pages, in their forthcoming reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/19/2022. (rsg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 COORDINATED ORDER advising that for any and every case in which the Court does not grant the motion to dismiss and does not thereafter grant a request for interlocutory appeal or a request to stay, the Court will hold a coordinated, in-person preliminary injunction hearing regarding the pending motions for preliminary injunction in those cases. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties collectively will have up to six (6) days to present evidence and arguments. The presenting parties may choose not to use all six days. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, it will take place in the Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse (courtroom to be determined) and begin at 9:00 A.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2022. If the parties opt to use all six days, the hearing will take place each following business day from 9:00 A.M. to 5:00 P.M. until the overall conclusion of the hearing at 5:00 P.M. on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2022. The parties shall file with the Court a consolidated presentation schedule by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 26, 2022. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties in cases with still-pending motions for preliminary injunction shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2022. The proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be specific to each case and motion. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/19/2022. (ddm)
January 18, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of John Morgan, #2 Exhibit B - Dec. of Michael Barnes)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dwight v. Kemp Joint Statement (09/12/18))(Sparks, Adam)
January 14, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (McGowan, Charlene)
January 13, 2022 Filing 36 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (McGowan, Charlene) Modified on 1/13/2022 to note pleading was filed in wrong case and attorney has been notified (ddm).
January 12, 2022 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg: Rule 16 conference held via Zoom in Alpha Phi Alpha v. Raffensperger, 1:21-cv-5337-SCJ; Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia, 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Pendergrass v. Raffensperger, 1:21-CV-5339-SCJ; Common Cause et al v. Raffensperger, 1:22-cv-00090-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Grant v. Raffensperger, 1:22-CV-0122-SCJ (Court Reporter Viola Zbrowski)(pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their amended motion for a preliminary injunction, if any, by no later than 2:00 PM EST on January 13,2022. Defendant shall file their response, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 18, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 20, 2022. Signed Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (pdw)
January 12, 2022 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Kevin J. Hamilton by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of William S. Cooper, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Dr. Maxwell Palmer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Expert Report of Dr. Orville Vernon Burton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Dr. Loren Collingwood, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Coakley Pendergrass, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Triana Arnold James, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Elliott Hennington, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Robert Richards, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Jens Rueckert, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Ojuan Glaze, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. News & World Report Article (11/19/21), #12 Exhibit 12 - AJC Article (11/22/21), #13 Exhibit 13 - Albany Herald Article (11/9/21), #14 Exhibit 14 - GPB Article (11/22/21), #15 Exhibit 15 - AJC Article (12/30/21), #16 Exhibit 16 - SOS Webpage - Qualifying Information, #17 Exhibit 17 - House LCRC Guidelines, #18 Exhibit 18 - Dunne Letter (03/20/92), #19 Exhibit 19 - Reynolds Letter (02/11/82), #20 Exhibit 20 - AJC Article (09/30/16), #21 Exhibit 21 - CNN Article (05/02/17), #22 Exhibit 22 - Appen Media Group Article (03/15/17), #23 Exhibit 23 - AJC Article (04/15/17), #24 Exhibit 24 - AJC Article (01/16/17), #25 Exhibit 25 - Washington Post Article (11/05/18), #26 Exhibit 26 - Slate Article (11/06/18), #27 Exhibit 27 - USA Today Article (05/10/18), #28 Exhibit 28 - Salon Article (01/04/21), #29 Exhibit 29 - ABC News Article (07/28/20), #30 Exhibit 30 - CNN Article (10/17/20), #31 Exhibit 31 - AJC Article 10/26/21), #32 Exhibit 32 - 2021-2022 GLBC Members Webpage, #33 Exhibit 33 - Governing Article (01/13/21), #34 Exhibit 34 - NCSL Article (12/01/20), #35 Exhibit 35 - NGA - Former GA Governors, #36 Exhibit 36 - AJC Article (12/01/20), #37 Exhibit 37 - U.S. Senate Webpage - Georgia Senators, #38 Exhibit 38 - WUGA Article (11/19/21), #39 Exhibit 39 - House Study Committee on Maternal Mortality Final Report, #40 Exhibit 40 - AJC Article (12/01/21), #41 Exhibit 41 - AJC Article (12/06/21), #42 Exhibit 42 - AP Article (11/20/21), #43 Exhibit 43 - 2022 State Elections & Voter Registration Calendar)(Sparks, Adam)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 14,2022.Plaintiffs shall file their response, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM on January 18, 2022. Defendants shall file their reply/ if any, by no later than 5:00 PM on January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (pdw)
January 12, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Sparks, Adam)
January 11, 2022 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2022 Election Calendar, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from B. Evans regarding redistricting)(Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 1/11/2022 to remove duplicate text (ddm).
January 11, 2022 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Lewis, Joyce)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Graham W. White. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Osher. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abha Khanna. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina A. Ford. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Hawley. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Robert Richards, Coakley Pendergrass, Ojuan Glaze, Jens Rueckert, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James. Sara Tindall Ghazal served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Sparks, Adam)
January 10, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel C. Osher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11496288).. Attorney Daniel C Osher added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 10, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Graham W. White Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11496315).. Attorney Graham W. White added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER AMENDING #15 Order setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to remain as previously noticed). The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY, JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues set forth in the Courts prior order at Doc. No. #15 after conferring with the parties in 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05338-ELB-SCJ-SDG; and 1:22-cv-00090-ELB-SCJ-SDG. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. (pdw)
January 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Strickland, Frank)
January 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Paradise, Loree Anne)
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Jacoutot, Bryan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Robert Richards, Coakley Pendergrass, Ojuan Glaze, Jens Rueckert, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James. Rebecca N. Sullivan served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Sparks, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Robert Richards, Coakley Pendergrass, Ojuan Glaze, Jens Rueckert, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James. Matthew Mashburn served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Sparks, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Robert Richards, Coakley Pendergrass, Ojuan Glaze, Jens Rueckert, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James. Anh Le served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Sparks, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action , as to Brad Raffensperger. (Sparks, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Per #16 : Return of Service Executed Brad Raffensperger served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (ddm)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to follow by separate notice.) The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY,JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues (set forth herein.) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/06/2022. (pdw)
January 6, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan P. Hawley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493112).. Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 6, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Christina A. Ford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493151).. Attorney Christina Ashley Ford added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 6, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493029).. Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 6, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING: RULE 16 CONFERENCE set for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM in No Courtroom before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg. Connection Instructions: Topic: Rule 16 Conference: 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; and 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605120572 Passcode: 851671 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# or +16468287666,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 551 285 1373 or +1 669 216 1590 Webinar ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 International numbers available: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abdGvu42dG Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 SIP: 1605120572@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 851671 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
January 6, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493294).. Attorney Abha Khanna added appearing on behalf of Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert (gas)
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Graham W. White Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11496315).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 5, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel C. Osher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11496288).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan (Tyson, Bryan)
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493294).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Christina A. Ford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493151).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan P. Hawley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493112).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11493029).by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Le. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara Tindall Ghazal. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca N. Sullivan. (adg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (adg)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ojuan Glaze, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James, Coakley Pendergrass, Robert Richards, Jens Rueckert. (jra)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Richards, Coakley Pendergrass, Ojuan Glaze, Jens Rueckert, Elliott Hennington, Triana Arnold James. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11487645) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendergrass et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coakley Pendergrass
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triana Arnold James
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Hennington
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Richards
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jens Rueckert
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ojuan Glaze
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Graham W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Tindall Ghazal
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lindsey
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?