PH Lodging Tomball, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PH Lodging Tomball, LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group and IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05702
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01803. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
December 10, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Georgia. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 12/10/2021, filed. (gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
December 10, 2021 Submission of #17 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aar)
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, filed by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Granting #28 Motion for Jared C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Jared C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - Granting #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motion to Transfer ; Pltf's Response due by 10/22/2021 re: #18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Motion to Transfer by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 03:00 PM is CANCELED. Until the court has ruled on Defendants' #18 Motion to Transfer Plaintiff doesnot need to respond to Defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss. If the court denies the motion to transfer it will enter a schedule for briefing on the motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed.(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Granting #20 Motion for Anne Horn Baroody to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Granting #21 Motion for Ronald T. Coleman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.,.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Ronald T. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Anne Horn Baroody to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jenny Tidwell, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Granting #15 NOTICE of Dismissal as to IHG Owners Association, Inc. only. Defendant !HG Owners Association, Inc., only, is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs...*** IHG Owners Association, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal as to IHG Owners Association, Inc. by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Mark I. Fishbein to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lodging Tomball, LLC. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Andrew P. Bleiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for PH Lodging Tomball, LLC. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages. The court will address the motion at the 9/17/21 Conference. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stratton, Bobbie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Six Continents Hotels, Inc. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021, filed.(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021, filed.(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to IHG Owners Association, Inc. served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021, filed.(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed.(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Mark I. Fishbein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2021. (Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Andrew P. Bleiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2021. (Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request #2, #2 Summons Request #3)(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26540560) filed by PH Lodging Tomball, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fein, Cory) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PH Lodging Tomball, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH Lodging Tomball, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?