Securities and Exchange Commission v. Carter
Petitioner: Securities and Exchange Commission
Respondent: Grant M. Carter
Case Number: 1:2021mi00059
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 80
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT, the Commission Order is enforced; Grant M. Carter shall pay the balance of civil money penalty in the amount of $150,000, plus outstanding interest until the entry of Judgment, together with post judgment interest from the date of the entry of this Judgment; Carter shall cease and desist from committing or causing any violations and any future violations; Carter shall make payment of the civil penalty to the Receiver appointed in Randal Lewis v. Tyler Tysdal, et al., Case No. 2018CV30684 for distribution to the harmed Cobalt and Cobalt II senior debt investors pursuant to a distribution plan approved in that case. the Court, subject to the foregoing, may order such relief as may be necessary for enforcement of any order of this Court as to the civil monetary penalty ; the Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Judgment. Post Judgment interest shall accrue pursuant to 28 U. S.C. 1961. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/10/2021. c:Financial Office(adg)
August 10, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (adg)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission re #2 Order to Show Cause CONSENT OF GRANT M. CARTER TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ENFORCING ORDER OF THE SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roessner, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF CONSENT to withdrawal Casey Geiger as counsel for defendant by Grant M. Carter
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time and to Continue Hearing. The Respondent shall have up to and including August 2, 2021 to file opposing papers, the Securities and Exchange Commission shall have up to and including August 5, 2021 to file any reply papers, and the Court grants an extension of time up to and including August 9, 2021 for the hearing. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/7/2021. (jeh)
July 7, 2021 Show Cause Hearing reset for 8/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
July 1, 2021 Submission of #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and MOTION to Continue Hearing, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (adg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and MOTION to Continue Hearing by Grant M. Carter. (Geiger, Andrew) . Added MOTION to Continue on 7/1/2021 (adg).
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Roessner, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/18/2021. (ah)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for an order pursuant to Section 20(c) of the Securities Act, Section 21(e) of the Securities Exchange Act, Section 209(d) of the Investment Advisers Act and Section 42(d) of the Investment Company Act to enforce compliance with Commission Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Roessner, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #4 Exhibit 1) (adg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grant M. Carter
Represented By: Mark Gerald Trigg
Represented By: Taylor M. Koshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael J Roessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?