Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 1:2021mi99999
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2021 Filing 4060 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5345 LMM RGV 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gloria Ansley vs. National Credit Systems, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487826. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 31, 2021 Filing 4059 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5344 AT AJB 480 15:192. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alan Martin vs. Credit Vision, Inc,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487824. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 31, 2021 Filing 4058 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5343 ELR 791 29:1132. TEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marcia G. Fleming vs. Rollins, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487809. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plan Document, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Meeting Minutes, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Prudential Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - FINRA Authority Letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - IPS, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Sharman, Paul)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4057 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5342 TWT 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, KYUNG TAE LEE vs. TONYAS TRANSPORT, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487698. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B - Florida Secretary of State filing for Tonya's Transport, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - Vermont Secretary of State filing for OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc., #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #5 Exhibit E - Answer of Defendants, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowles, Derron)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4056 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5341 JPB LTW 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JACLYN MERCIECA vs. MEDICAL DATA SYSTEMS, INC. d/b/a MEDICAL REVENUE SERVICE. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487672. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Dakroub, Jenna)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4055 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5340 MLB RDC 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LYNN ELIZABETH ROSA vs. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487648. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McClelland, Joseph)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4054 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5339 SCJ. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #4053 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Sparks, Adam)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4053 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5339 SCJ 441 52:10301. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint COAKLEY PENDERGRASS vs. BRAD RAFFENSPERGER. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487645. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Raffensperger, #3 Summons Defendant Sullivan, #4 Summons Defendant Tindall Ghazal, #5 Summons Defendant Mashburn, #6 Summons Defendant Le)(Sparks, Adam)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4052 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5338 SCJ. RESUBMISSION of #4051 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GEORGIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP vs. STATE OF GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487605. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Gov. Kemp Summons, # 3 Summons Secretary Raffensperger Summons, # 4 Summons State Summons, # 5 Errata Certificate)(Kastorf, Kurt). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Kastorf, Kurt)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4051 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5338 SCJ 441 52:10301. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GEORGIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP vs. STATE OF GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487605. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Gov. Kemp Summons, #3 Summons Secretary Raffensperger Summons, #4 Summons State Summons, #5 Errata Certificate)(Kastorf, Kurt)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4050 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5337 SCJ 441 52:10301. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALPHA PHI ALPHA FRATERNITY INC. vs. BRAD RAFFENSPERGER, in his official capacity as Secretary of State of Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487582. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Young, Sean)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4049 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5336-AT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, THOMAS TAYLOR vs. ACE RELOCATION SYSTEMS, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487474. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Record, #3 Exhibit Record, #4 Exhibit Communication, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Stone, Matthew)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4048 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5334-TCB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, LARRY STAFFING SERVICES, LLC vs. TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11487200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Citizenship Proof, #3 Exhibit C - Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Samford, Jessica)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4047 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5333-TWT 365 28:1446pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Hendley Wilder, the natural Mother of Jaye Wilder, deceased vs. Philips North America LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486982. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - JPML Corp. Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Philips Holding US Corp Record, #5 Exhibit E - Philips RS Holding Records and Bus Reg, #6 Exhibit F - MDL Motion, #7 Exhibit G - Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mazziotti, Thomas)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4046 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5332-WMR 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ralph Balch vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486841. (Attachments: #1 Summons To be Served)(Kahn, Madeline)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4045 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5331-JPB 190 28:1446oc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Yvette Taylor vs. Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486798. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Stuhrenberg, Joseph)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4044 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5330-WMR 890 47:0332. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CITYSWITCH, II-A, LLC vs. GWINNETT COUNTY, GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11486670. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Board of Commish, #3 Summons Summons for Gwinnett County)(Cadle, Ivy)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4043 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5329-MLB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. d/b/a CEI or Custom Ecology vs. Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486446. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brock Claim Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2021.08.1 Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letters, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Corporate Filings)(Nelson, Alphonsie)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4042 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5328-LMM 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Auto-Owners Insurance Company vs. Ovation Condominium Association, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486158. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Strickland, Rebecca)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4041 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5326-LMM 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Auto-Owners Insurance Company vs. Ovation Condominium Association, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486130. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Strickland, Rebecca)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4040 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5325-SCJ 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tonya Price vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11486017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All Pleadings Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Jury Demand, #5 Defendant The Kroger Co.'s Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wasick, Jeffrey)(smw).
December 30, 2021 Filing 4039 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5324-TCB-CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shanderla Mitchell vs. National Credit Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485971. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Lemberg, Sergei)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4038 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5323-TWT 465 08:1329. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GAMALIEL DAFE IGWELE vs. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485961. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Jaddou Summons, #5 Summons Miller Summons, #6 Summons Mayorkas Summons)(Ahmed, Urwah)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4037 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5322-SDG 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mallard IP LLC vs. Trenton Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485474. ONE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,603,330, #2 Errata B - Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Form AO120 Report to Patent Office, #5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Summons)(Alexander, Cortney)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4036 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5321-CAP 850 15:0080. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission vs. Boveda Asset Management, Inc.. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Boveda Asset Management, Inc., #3 Summons George Kenneth Witherspoon, Jr.)(Loomis, Madison)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4035 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5320-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LYNDSIE MOSS vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485428. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yaeger, Laura)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4034 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5319-JPB 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JAIYESIMI vs. MAYORKAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485439. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #8 Summons Mayorkas, #9 Summons Jaddou, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Garland, #12 Summons Erksine)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4033 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5318-WMR 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Braids R Us 305 vs. Priority Payment Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11484922. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Notice of Removal to Cobb Superior Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marshall, Edward)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4032 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5317-MHC-RGV 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tockcey Smith vs. AutoTrader.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CGANDC-11485271. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1B: Notice of Right to Sue, #4 Exhibit Ex 1A: EEOC Charge of Discrimination)(Prioleau, Oscar)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4031 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5316-SDG 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mallard IP LLC vs. Mercury Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,603,330, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Form AO120 Report to Patent Office, #5 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Summons)(Alexander, Cortney)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4030 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5315-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ENLLY PAULINO vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11485107. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Yaeger, Laura)(smw).
December 29, 2021 Filing 4029 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5313-MHC 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher Thompson vs. Merchandising Solutions Group, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11484443. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons)(Morgan, Charles)(smw)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4028 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5312-SCJ-LTW 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JENNIFER KATHLEEN PHELAN vs. KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4027 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5303-WMR 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Delta Air Lines, Inc. vs. Caribbean Airlines Limited. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11483314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutherland, Teddy) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4026 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5302-TCB 110 28:2201in. FOUR E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Auto Club Insurance Association vs. Constance Robinson. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11483214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Constance Robinson, #5 Summons Donovan Wills, #6 Summons Sabrina Folds-Wills, #7 Summons Alvin Melson)(Sheridan, Kimberly) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4025 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5300-TWT 440 42:1983cv. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiana Hill vs. Clayton County. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11482885. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet TH Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clayton County BOC Summons, #3 Summons Clayton County Summons, #4 Summons Correct Health Summons, #5 Summons Dr. Clopton Summons, #6 Summons Sheriff Victor Hill Summons, #7 Supplement Medical Authorization Forms, #8 Affidavit DH Affidavit of Med Mal)(Albert, Mitchell) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4024 CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:21-cv-0219-TCB 830 35:271 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Aviation Clean Air, LLC vs. Ionic Air Care, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11483020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, #4 Summons, #5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)DOCUMENTS FILED IN ATLANTA DIVISION IN ERROR. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO NEWNAN DIVISION ON 12/28/21 BY BC.(Brown, Charles) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4023 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5299-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AMY MICHELE SMITH vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11482954. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heard, Denman) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4022 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5298-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LYDIA RAMOS vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11482909. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heard, Denman) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4021 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5297-SDG-JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Danny Dodd vs. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11482646. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket, #3 State Court Documents)(Gaset, John) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4020 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0108-MHC-LTW 890 28:1782. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Foreign Subpoena), United States of America vs. Derek Nicholson. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Wynn, Paris) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4019 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5296-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Luz Rivera vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11482370. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Joel) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4018 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5295-JPB 440 42;1983cv. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert McGhee vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11481962. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Erik Clanton, #4 James Douglas)(Greenamyre, Zack) (bc).
December 28, 2021 Filing 4017 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5294-WMR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Maison Rouge, LLC vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11481937. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court pleadings, #2 Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Answer to Complaint)(Atkins, Sabrina) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4016 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5291-LMM-WEJ 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ray Harris vs. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480837. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit B - Right to Sue Letter)(Mosley, Andrew) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4015 DUPLICATE FILING SEE #4012 FOR CASE NUMBER. NO PHONE NUMBER LISTED ON DOCUMENTS SENT EMAIL TO NORMAN BARNETT WHICH CAME BACK AS UNABLE TO DELIVER LEFT VOICE MAIL ON THE US ATTORNEY MAIN LINE. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint The United States of America vs. $4,000.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Norman) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4014 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5289-SCJ-AJB 442 42:2000sx. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Latonya Wilson vs. Extra Space Management, Inc. d/b/a Extra Space Storage. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480812. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue)(Lee, Jaclyn) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4013 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5288-AT-LTW 442 42:2000ra. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sharon Thornton vs. Merchant eSolutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Merchant, #4 Summons Quest)(Smith, Kirby) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4012 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5287-ELR 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $4,000.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Norman) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4011 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5285-LMM 350 28:1346pi. TWO E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Vincent Everett vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480461. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons)(Carestia, Michael) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4010 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5284-SCJ-CMS 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Emily Olsen vs. LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480261. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sand, Jeffrey) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4009 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5283-AT-RDC 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED NOT ISSUED/IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amanda Joy Blankenship vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4008 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5282-MLB 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Performive LLC vs. Customer Care Corp.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11480216. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Silverstein, Corey) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4007 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5281-MHC-CCB 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lamar Erkard vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480217. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Appeals Counsel Extension of Time Granted, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Comerford, Ida) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4006 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5279-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint VALDA MOORE vs. ETHICON, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480170. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badaruzzaman, Asim) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4005 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5278-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TANYA MAURNEN GARDNER vs. ETHICON, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480163. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badaruzzaman, Asim) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4004 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5276-JPB 830 28:1338pt. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sunflower Licensing LLC vs. Hisense USA Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11480096. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,487,528, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart re '528 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporation Disclosure Statement, #5 Form AO 120 Report, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Alexander, Cortney) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4003 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5275-AT-JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nicole Marie Henson vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and The Bank Of Missouri, d/b/a Ollo Card Services. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479916. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (bc).
December 27, 2021 Filing 4002 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5273-JPB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Priscilla Williams vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479857. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Demand Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Pleadings), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Ernest) (bc).
December 23, 2021 Filing 4001 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5270-WMR 830 35:0271. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479405. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - USPN 10,323,832, #2 Exhibit Ex B - USPN 10,465,888, #3 Exhibit Ex C - USPN 10,571,101, #4 Exhibit Ex D - USPN 10,598,358, #5 Exhibit Ex E - USPN 10,920,971, #6 Exhibit Ex F - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit Ex G - Infringement of the '101 Patent by Lumien-JSL's D5A1, #8 Exhibit Ex H - Infringement of the '101 Patent by Lumien-JSL's D6B1, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Infringement of the '971 Patent by Lumien-JSL's D5A1, #10 Exhibit Ex J - Settlement Agreement between WAC and Lumien, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Summons to Lumien Enterprise, Inc., #13 Supplement Report on the Filing of a Patent Case Form AO-120, #14 Supplement Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Brief Motion to File Under Seal, #16 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Anderson, Stephen) (bc).
December 23, 2021 Filing 4000 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5269-MLB 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Reina Victoria Barahona vs. Alejandro Mayorkas. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479427. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 appearance of counsel, #3 Exhibit exh. A - I-130 receipt notice, #4 Exhibit exh. B - website case status, #5 Exhibit exh. C - processing times, #6 Summons summons - Mayorkas, #7 Summons summons - Jaddou, #8 Summons summons - Miller, #9 Summons summons - Garland, #10 Summons summons - Erskine)(Cohen, Marshall) (bc).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3999 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5268-ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mackenson Saint Fleur vs. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479423. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - Attorney General, #4 Summons Summons - Director USCIS, #5 Summons Summons - Director Atlanta Field Office, #6 Summons Summons - USCIS, #7 Summons Summons - US Attorney)(Lefkoff, Steven) (bc).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3998 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5267-MHC 899 05;0702. ELEVEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Georgia College of Emergency Physicians vs. US Department of Health and Human Services. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11479138. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Attorney General, #4 Summons Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office, #5 Summons for Department of Labor, #6 Summons for Department of Treasury, #7 Summons Janet Yellen, #8 Summons Kiran Ahuja, #9 Summons Martin Walsh, #10 Summons ND of GA U.S. Attorneys Office, #11 Summons Office of Personnel Management, #12 US Department of HHS, #13 Xavier Becerra)(Cone, Brittany)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3997 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5264-AT. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3996 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,,. (Peurach, Alexandra) (smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3996 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5264-AT 110 28:2201in. SIX E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Capitol Indemnity Corporation vs. Weller Residential, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479102. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-04/14/2021 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Capitol XS Policy, #3 Exhibit C-Cross-Claim Against A&B Apartments LLC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for Weller Residential LLC, #6 Summons for Weller Workforce LLC, #7 Summons for Weller Management LLC, #8 Summons for Sonya Dimsdale, #9 Summons for A&B Apartments LLC, #10 Summons for Leno Junior Brown)(Peurach, Alexandra)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3995 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5263 MLB 196 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Floorcoverings International, Ltd. vs. Jens Dahl-Davis. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11479080. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Davis-Jones Franchise Agreement - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit B - Davis-Jens Promissory Forbearance Agreement)(Schneider, Jean-Alain)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3994 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5261-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TRACEY ELIZEE vs. JOHNSON & JOHNSON. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478964. (Lenchus, Anna)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3993 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5260-MHC 440 42:1983cv. FIFTEEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Barbara Watkins vs. Freeman Moody. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478784. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 8, #11 Summons AUSTIN ALBINO, #12 Summons KEITH BROWN, #13 Summons LATOYA CARR, #14 Summons CRYSTAL DISMUKE, #15 Summons SHAKIME FERRER, #16 Summons CODY FOUNTAIN, #17 Summons NATASHA FREEMAN, #18 Summons DANIEL GASSETT, #19 Summons TENEKA HURT, #20 Summons JESSIE JOHNSTON, #21 Summons MARCO KILLINGSWORTH, #22 Summons LORETTA LYNCH, #23 Summons JEFFREY MABEN, #24 Summons FREEMAN MOODY, #25 Summons SANDRA PARKER)(Hewitt, Melvin)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3992 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5259-TCB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anton Clifford vs. EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478634. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3991 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5258-TWT-RDC 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Londrey Hill vs. Spectra Metal Sales, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478481. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3990 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5257-SDG-CCB 442 42:2000ra. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Samantha Ramos vs. Decostar Industries Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478247. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3989 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5256-JPB-JKL 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SUSANNAH OVERBY vs. NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478272. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Legare, Cheryl)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3988 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5255-LMM 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint WestRock CP, LLC vs. Corrugated Synergies International, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478256. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 1999 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 2009 Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Sullivan, John)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3987 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5254-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lynette Jones vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478241. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3986 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5253-AT 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Massimo Fini vs. Nationwide General Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summon, Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing notice of Removal)(Samford, Jessica)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3985 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5252-WMR-CMS 442 42:2000sx. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melissa Wilkins vs. HD Supply. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478134. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3984 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5251-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Theresa McCurdy vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11478104. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3983 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5249-JPB-WEJ 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Williamson vs. National Medical Administrators, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11477894. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Lemberg, Sergei)(smw).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3982 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5247-ELR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, John E. Mitchell vs. Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11477438. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #3 Certificate, #4 Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Phillips, Jessica)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3981 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5245-MHC 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Valeriya Malaeva vs. Alejandro Mayorkas. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11477027. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 appearance of counsel, #3 Summons Mayorkas - proposed summons, #4 Summons Jaddou - proposed summons, #5 Summons Miller - proposed summons, #6 Summons Garland - proposed summons, #7 Summons Erskine - proposed summons, #8 Exhibit A - I-485 Receipt Notice, #9 Exhibit B - EAD, #10 Exhibit C Automatic Employment Authorization (EAD) Extensio, #11 Exhibit D USCIS I-765 receipt, #12 Exhibit E - Driver's License, #13 Exhibit F USCIS notice of transfer, #14 Exhibit G USCIS website case status, #15 Exhibit H - processing times)(Cohen, Marshall) (smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3980 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5244-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michaela Hayes vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476821. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3979 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5243 SCJ 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elizabeth Sessions vs. Nelson Worldwide, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476601. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Stock Purchase Agreement (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A- Stock Purchase Agreement (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A- Stock Purchase Agreement (Part 3), #4 Exhibit B- Sample Working Capital Calculation, #5 Exhibit C- Personal Goodwill Purchase Agreement, #6 Exhibit D- Subordination Agreement, #7 Exhibit E- Promissory Notes, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Nelson Worldwide LLC, #10 Summons Nelson Worldwide Holdings, Inc.)(Hergenrother, Jenny)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3978 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5242 AT. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3977 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Mitchell, Timothy)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3977 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5242 AT 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Daniel Porter d/b/a Handiport Logistics vs. Enterprise Leasing Company of Georgia, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476658. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - partial record - Fulton Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - written notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - affidavit of Timothy L, Mitchell, Esq., #4 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Mitchell, Timothy)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3976 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5241 JPB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, ANTONIO HALL vs. SAC WIRELESS, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476284. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Answer, #4 Exhibit Other Pleadings, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Ference, Kyle)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3975 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5240 WMR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nuriath Vergara vs. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476154. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ream, Elliott)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3974 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5239 MLB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kathryn Casavant vs. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11476033. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer of Allstate, #3 Affidavit Verification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Appendix Jury Demand)(McMullen, Melissa)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3973 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5238 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Derek Shelton Gentry vs. ETHICON, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475945. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Physiomesh Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Physiomesh SummonsWaiver)(Guerra, Gerardo)WAIVER OF SUMMONS FILED(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3972 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5237 TWT 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475828. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Adam)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3971 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5236 ELR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Antonio Rodriguez vs. Dawnell Hall. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475757. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Hall Proposed Answer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Progressive Proposed Answer)(Shires, Kevin)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3970 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5228. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3966 1:21-cv-5228 LMM Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Siemon, August)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3969 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5235 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint D'Andrea Johnson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475655. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3968 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5234 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Moriah Doe vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475642. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3967 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5233 MHC AJB 480 15:1692. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert vs. Fannie. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475498. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Stalvey, Shannan)SUMMONS FOR MORTGAGE WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS WRITTEN INCORRECT. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3966 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5228 LMM JSA 530 28:2254. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus, Julius Thomas vs. Nathan Brooks, Warden. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number AGANDC-11475491. (Siemon, August) CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED IN #3970 (smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3965 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5226 SCJ 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Justin Lamar Bouchillon vs. Gwinnett County. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475341. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Elizabeth)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3964 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5225 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Enid-Eva Frank vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475359. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3963 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5224 AT RDC 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALLISON CARTER vs. GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475226. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: First Dunning Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Debt Validation Letter, #3 Exhibit C: Second Dunning Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons)(Honsalek, Brandon)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3962 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5223 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Chandler Fowler vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475206. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3961 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5222 TWT JKL 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Edwardo J. Hebbert vs. Rentgrow, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11475024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sand, Jeffrey)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3960 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5221 WMR 430 28:1446oc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Wade Roberts vs. Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11474881. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gwinnett State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Gwinnett State Court Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Keith)(smw).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3959 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5220 MLB 490 47:0551. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. Royal Room Events LLC d/b/a The Crown Room Event and Conference Center. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11474595. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Ron Brewington, #3 Summons to Royal Room Events LLC d/b/a The Crown Room Event and Conference Center, #4 Summons to Lamecia King, #5 Summons to Full Beardz LLC)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3958 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5219 ELR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SIS, LLC vs. Orion Group Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11474177. (Attachments: #1 Summons Orion Group Holdings, #2 Summons Orion Marine Construction, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Amy)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3957 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5218 MHC WEJ 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tonya Foreman Venisee vs. Progress Residential LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11474148. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Lisa)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3956 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5217 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rosa Martinez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11474125. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3955 CASE SKIPPED FOR NON-PAYMENT. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KUM SOON WOO vs. H-MART. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet WOO VS H-MART, #2 Summons GAITHERSBURG)(Kim, Jae)NOTIFIED ATTORNEY CASE CANNOT BE OPEN WITHOUT PAYMENT OR IFP(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3954 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5216-SCJ 350 28:1332mv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jae Kim vs. Philip J. Matherne. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11473547. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant 1 Philip, #3 Summons Defendant 2 Wachter)(Kim, Jae)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3953 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5214-LMM-LTW 442 29:0626. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Simmons vs. FANEUIL, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11473406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Trachian-Bradley, Mary) (smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3952 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5213-ELR 899 05:0702. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marili Duque Gonzalez vs. Loren K. Miller, Director, Nebraska Service Center, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11473184. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - 2011 USCIS Ombudsman Report, #2 Ex. B - 2021.06.23 EAD renewal application, #3 Ex. C - March 29, 2019 Asylum Application, #4 Ex. D - 2019.07.01 transcript of merits hearing, #5 Ex. E - 2019.09.16 first EAD application, #6 Ex. F - 2019.10.09 EAD, #7 Ex. G - 2019.11.21 IJ written decision, #8 Ex. H - June 15, 2021 Briefing Schedule, #9 Ex. I - 2021.10.07 USCIS written decision, #10 Ex. J - OPPM 21-28, #11 Ex. K - Appx. O - Adjournment Codes - EOIR - Department of Justice, #12 Ex. L - USCIS Applicant-Caused Delay Notice, #13 Ex. M - 180 Day Asylum Clock EAD Notice, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Dantzler, James)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3951 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5212-LMM 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jason Long vs. Malone's Service and Performance, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472893. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stephens, Jeremy)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3950 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5211-AT 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's vs. Strategic Capital Partners, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472600. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underwriters' Policy, #2 Summons to Strategic Capital Partners, LLC, #3 Summons to Ricky Novak, #4 Summons to James Freeman, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonnie, John)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3949 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5204-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jody Livengood vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472527. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Seth)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3948 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5203-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Danielle Brown vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472510. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Seth)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3947 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5202-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Naomi Johnson-Harris vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472484. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Seth)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3946 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5201-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sabine Laurent vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11472454. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Seth)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3945 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5199 JPB 110 28:2201in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint National Liabililty Fire Insurance Company vs. Shoazim Rakmanov. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471986. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Arndt, Patrick)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3944 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5198 MLB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, LORENE KNOX vs. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471929. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - All Pleadings, #3 Supplement Certificate of Filing, #4 Supplement Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Supplement Answer)(Phillips, Jessica)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3943 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5197 MHC 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donald Clark Wright, III vs. Brandon Warren. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471899. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowsert, William) (smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3942 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-CV-5196 SCJ 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Priscilla Hurtado vs. Walmart Stores East, LP d/b/a Walmart #5735. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471773. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Demand Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Pleadings), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Ernest)(smw).
December 21, 2021 Filing 3941 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5195 SCJ RDC 442 29:0206d. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kelly Weselman vs. Wellstar Health System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471622. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Attwood, Eleanor)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3940 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5194 TWT 820 28:1338cp. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint David McGlynn vs. Cumulus Media, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Article, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Carson, Dorsey)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS MADE OUT FOR THE WRONG PLANTIFF AND CIVIL COVER SHEET HAS INCORRECT INFORMATION. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO CORRECT THE DOCUMENTS AND FILE THEM IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3939 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5193 SDG 820 28:1338cp. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dennis Clark vs. Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11471014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Article, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Carson, Dorsey)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3938 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5192 SCJ 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Canal Insurance Company vs. Double-Time Transport, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470865. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Double-Time Transport, LLC, #6 Summons Zurich American Insurance Company, #7 Summons Rebel Logistics Service, LLC)(Savrin, Philip)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3937 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5191 AT CCB 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NADINE WASHINGTON vs. VENSURE HR, INC., d/b/a VENSURE EMPLOYEE SERVICES, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470903. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jermaine)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3936 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5190 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jamie Kirby vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxx, Christopher)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3935 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1;21-CV-5189 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stokes, K. Scott vs. H+G Real Estate, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470729. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3934 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5188 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ANN MCKEOWN vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC., et al. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470486. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abuzerr, Fatima) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3933 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5187 WMR 840 28:2201dj. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. vs. Procaps Laboratories, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11470085. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Leach, Jessica) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3932 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5186 SDG JKL 442 42:1981ra. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tiphony Marshall vs. Tidal Wave Response, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11469930. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Buckley, Edward) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3931 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5183 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Harsimrat Gill vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11469456. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3930 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5182 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kristina Filozova vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11469443. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3929 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5181 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Caitlin Calley vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11469423. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3928 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-cv-5180 LMM 367 28:1332pl Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Martha Aguilar vs. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11468986. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3927 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5179 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brandy Stevens vs. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11468889. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John) (bc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3926 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5178 TWT 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kahlil Mohammad vs. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11468443. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Travelers' State Court Answer Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant Goosehead's State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant Goosehead's State Court Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E - Defendant Goosehead's State Court Brief ISO Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit F - Certified Policy (PART 1), #7 Exhibit F - Certified Policy (PART 2), #8 Exhibit F - Certified Policy (PART 3), #9 Exhibit G - Travelers' State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit Travelers' Federal Court Answer, #12 Exhibit Travelers' Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement, #13 Exhibit Travelers' Motion to Dismiss, #14 Exhibit Travelers' Memo of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Karabinos, Karen) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3925 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5177 WMR JSA 442 42:2000ot. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Oneisha Lee vs. Wal-Mart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11468824. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kertscher, Douglas) (bc).
December 20, 2021 Filing 3924 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5175 MLB WEJ 442 42:2000no. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ronniebel Addy vs. Rivermont Country Club. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11468498. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kertscher, Douglas) (bc).
December 19, 2021 Filing 3923 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5172 SDG CMS 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED NOT ISSUED - IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shayna Young vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George) (bc).
December 18, 2021 Filing 3922 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5171 JPB 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint G & J Trucking, LLC vs. Truist Bank, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11467648. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mignott, Marsha) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3921 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5170 WMR 465 28:2201dj. FIVE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HILL-ANAZODO vs. MAYORKAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11467327. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #8 Summons Mayorkas, #9 Summons Jaddou, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Garland, #12 Summons Erksine)(Fogle, H.) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3920 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5169 MLB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Comonet Smith vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11467140. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Service of Process Dismissal and Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Legal Rep of Estat, #4 Exhibit C- GA Corp of Division, #5 Exhibit D- Affidavit of Timothy Dixon)(Becknell, Leslie) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3919 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5168 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Muniz vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11467074. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC)(Kassan, Randi) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3918 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0107 LMM RDC 890 frcp45b. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Motion to Quash), Walgreen Co. vs. Aaron Peters. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11466953. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Simpson, Matthew) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3917 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5166 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maureen Rosario vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466772. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3916 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5165 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bridgett Dalke vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466673. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3915 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5163 TWT 110 28:2201in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Westport Insurance Corporation vs. Kowan & Cordon, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466551. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Grant) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3914 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5162 SDG JSA 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS FILED - ONE ATTACHMENT - NOT ISSUED - IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Wycheka Baty vs. Kilolo Kijakazi. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Ginsberg, Jonathan) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3913 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5161 ELR AJB 442 42:2000ot. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Steven Thompson vs. Stan Koch and Sons Trucking, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466540. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Adian) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3912 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5160 JPB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Steven Collier Jr. vs. Ace American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466426. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - St. Ct. Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Pl.'s Disc. Responses, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - St. Ct. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - St. Ct. Answer)(Miller, Michael) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3911 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5159 ELR AJB 442 42:200sx. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Valerie de Armas vs. Stan Koch and Sons Trucking, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11466422. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Adian) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3910 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5158 ELR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, James Ransom vs. Jonathan Meekma. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11465951. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Stone, Matthew) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3909 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5157 MHC 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nekesha Kashayle Kerneal vs. Randall Lederman. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11465916. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - St. Ct. Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - St. Ct. Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Miller, Michael) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3908 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-CV-241-MLB 330 45:0051 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Levi Brewer vs. Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11465852. (Attachments: #1 Summons NSRC, #2 Summons Neesmith, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shuping, Trent)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION - DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO ROME DIVISION BY BC ON 12/17/2021. (bc). Modified on 12/17/2021 (tmf).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3907 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5156 SCJ 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, KAREN HILLIARD vs. AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11465774. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Timmons, Drew) (bc).
December 17, 2021 Filing 3906 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5155 LMM 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Arcturus International LLC vs. Darlene Geller-stoff. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11465764. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Grodzicki, Joseph) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3905 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5147 MLB CMS 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Lee McManama vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Midland States Bancorp, Inc. a/k/a and d/b/a Mac Credit. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11464494. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3904 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5146 ELR JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Michael Spinella vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Republic Finance, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11464493. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3903 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5145 MHC WEJ 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donna Zangaro vs. Cascade Capital, LLC, and Superlative RM, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11464492. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (smw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3902 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5144 SCJ 110 28:1335. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint State Farm Life Insurance Company vs. Centaur Financial Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11464469. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Whitney Toler, #3 Summons - Centaur, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Buschmann, Paul)(smw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3901 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5143 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EVELYN MARILYN SAMPOLSKI vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11464323. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heard, Denman)(smw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3900 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5142 TWT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Angelica Betancourt-Reza vs. Ronald Everton Sparks. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11463927. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hostetter, Michael) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3899 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5141 SDG 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, IBRAHIM GIWA vs. CRAIG MARSHALL KLAASSEN. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11463686. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Covert Sheet)(Huray, Scott) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3898 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5140 JPB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kimberly Breesmen vs. Alight Solutions LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11463488. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Jackson, Alfred) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3897 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5137 TWT 690 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $62,120.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Radka) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3896 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5135 JPB 360 28:144bc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cody Cameron vs. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11463203. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A- Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B- Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. C- Answer)(Hankins, James) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3895 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5134 WMR 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SnapMedTech, Inc. vs. Embassy Woodland Park. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11462641. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Crisis Staffing Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Invoices)(McKay, Brannon) (bc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 3894 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5133 MHC 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anton Clifford vs. William B Jones. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11462703. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie) (bc).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3893 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5130 LMM LTW 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alex Hill vs. Merrick B. Garland. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11461872. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karinshak, Zahra) (bc).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3892 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5128 MLB 380 28:1446pd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, AD WILSON ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a PATTERSON TRANSPORT vs. RUSH TRUCK CENTERS OF GEORGIA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11461269. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Dekalb Superior Docket - Ad Wilson Enterprises Civ. No. 21CV9434, #3 Exhibit B State Court Summons to REI, #4 Exhibit C State Court Case Initiation Form, #5 Exhibit D Verification to Verified Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Verified Complaint for Damages, #7 Exhibit F - State Court Summons to RTCG, #8 Exhibit G - State Court Affidavit of Service on RTCG, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Summons RTCG, #10 Exhibit I - State Court Summons REI, #11 Exhibit J - State Court RTCG Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit K - State Court REI Affidavit of Service, #13 Exhibit L - State Court Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit M - GA SOS AD Wilson Ent. Business Search, #15 Exhibit N - Safer Web Company Snapshot AD Wilson Enterprises LLC)(Wieseman, Joseph)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3891 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5127 ELR CCB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Natasha Ann Davis vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Trans Union LLC; and JPMorgan Chase Bank. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11461400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3890 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5126 MHC 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Angela Mabe vs. Dennis Scheglov. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11461073. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Enyinnia, Amaobi)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3889 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5123 LMM 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY vs. NOVA CASUALTY COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11460391. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Refiled Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Person $300K Demand, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Douglas Co. LEL Policy, #6 Exhibit F - Nova Coverage Denial - 5-4-20, #7 Exhibit G - Nova Coverage Denial - 10-22-21, #8 Exhibit H - Travelers CGL Policy, #9 Exhibit I - Douglas Co. Auto Policy, #10 Exhibit J - Travelers ROR letter - 05-15-20, #11 Exhibit K - Travelers ROR letter - 09-27-21, #12 Summons Person Summons, #13 Summons Hitchcock Summons, #14 Summons Nova Summons, #15 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Leet, Nicole)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3888 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5122 SDG 880 18:1836a. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11460510. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint - 2017 RSU, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint - 2018 RSU, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint - Waiver, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #8 Brief in Support of Motion for TRO, #9 Affidavit of John Demola, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Summons as to Justin Vedder, #12 Summons as to SitusAMC Holdings Corporation)(Polly, Ronald)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3887 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5121 TWT 690 18:0924. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint UNITED STATES OF AMERICA vs. One Glock Inc. 43X 9 MM Caliber Pistol, Serial Number BPRS702. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sneed, Sekret)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3886 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5120 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lindsey Cascadden vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11460342. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wallace, Edward)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3885 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5119 SCJ RDC 442 42:1981ra. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rhonda Washington Novak vs. Insight Global, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11460371. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Global Insight, #3 Summons Paypal, #4 Summons Yulang)(Pearson, Todd)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3884 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5117 ELR 870 28:7403. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. Marquet Antwain Burgess Mattox. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons for Marquet Antwain Burgess Mattox, individually, #2 Summons Proposed Summons for Marquet Antwain Burgess Mattox, as Trustee of the Noble MB-EL Family Trust, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weisberg, Andrew)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3883 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5116 LMM JKL 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jasmine Johnson vs. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., d/b/a Accurint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11459897. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sand, Jeffrey)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3882 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0106 TCB CCB 890 28:1782. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Foreign Subpoena), MS. HOY MAI vs. THE COCA-COLA COMPANY. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11459858. (Attachments: #1 Cooper Declaration, #2 Polkla Declaration, #3 Pred Declaration, #4 Exhibit A (Power of Attorney), #5 Exhibit B (ELCs & Community Forestries Map), #6 Exhibit C (Thai Civil Procedure Code Exceprts), #7 Exhibit D (Letter to Editor), #8 Exhibit E (National Human Rights Commission Report), #9 Exhibit F (Request for Production), #10 Exhibit G (Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition), #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGregor, Kristi)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3881 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5115 AT CCB 442 42:2000sx. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jordan Cole vs. Spectra Metal Sales, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11459819. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Right to Sue letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to Defendant Spectra, #4 Summons Summons to Defendant Standard, #5 Summons Summons to Defendant Hunter)(Lampros, Peter)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3880 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5114 SCJ RDC 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Linda Tuck Shields vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11459648. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
December 15, 2021 Filing 3879 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5113 WMR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Anallely Garcia De La Rosa vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11459235. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Demand Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Pleadings), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Ernest)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3878 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5109 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mike Lambert vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11458688. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Binstock, Melissa)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3877 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5108 MHC 465 08:1329. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Antonia Flores Molina vs. Merrick B. Garland. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11458388. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Claffey, Danielle)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3876 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5107 TCB JKL 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CARRIE HART vs. GAYCO INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11458331. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jermaine)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3875 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5106 SCJ. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3873 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and discovery)(Hunter, Hilary) (smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3874 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5105 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stokes, K. Scott vs. Willow Enterprises, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11458008. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3873 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5106 SCJ 110 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. CASE SKIPPED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jack Clark vs. LM General Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457816. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hunter, Hilary)LOWER COURT COMPLAINT NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE COMPLAINT. COMPLAINT FILED IN #3875 (smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3872 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0105 TWT JKL 890 frcp37a. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Foreign Subpoena), Manjit Singh Gill a/k/a Manjit Singh vs. First Intercontinental Bank. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11457754. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacko Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bushnell, Vincent)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3871 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5103 SDG CMS 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Generes, Heather vs. Equifax, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457707. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Grayson, Randall) (smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3870 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5102 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Qatra Gababa vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457680. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salger, Sara)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3869 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5101 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carey Voss vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457638. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salger, Sara)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3868 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5100 AT CMS 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amelia Valentina Gordon vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457573. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3867 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5099 TCB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUE. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Salim Merchant vs. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457531. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Melissa C. McMullen Verification, #4 Jury Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McMullen, Melissa)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3866 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5098 TWT 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Milton Mejia vs. Amazing Scapes, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11457498. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(White, Samuel)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT HAS MORE THAN ONE DEFENDANT. NOTIFIED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE (smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3865 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5093 WMR 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Blackout Entertainment, LLC vs. Young King Records. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11457405. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Alex)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3864 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5092 ELR 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $97,215.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3863 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5091 MHC 110 28:1335. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Metropolitan Life Insurance Company vs. Julaine Green Lopez, individually. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11456714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Brendan)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3862 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5090 LMM JCF 480 15:1692. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bradley Hill vs. Independence Capital Recovery, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11456664. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hormozdi, Shireen)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3861 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5089 AT RGV 480 15:1692. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Chrystal Bragg vs. TrueAccord Corp. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11456541. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to TrueAccord, #3 Summons as to Resurgent Capital, #4 Summons as to LVNV Funding, #5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons)(Carlson, Clifford)(smw).
December 14, 2021 Filing 3860 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5088 TWT CCB 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Sales vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application to Proceed without paying fees or costs)(Russell, Sara)(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3859 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5087 JPB JCF 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Pamela Hill vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11455949. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Forrest, Michael)(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3858 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5086 ELR 880 18:1836b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CMI Limited Co. vs. Bridge Brothers Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11455932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Angell Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Barnes Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Barnes Acknowledgment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Barnes Resume, #5 Exhibit 5 - Emails regarding Unfair Competition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Marine Bridge on BBI website, #7 Exhibit 7 - CMI Bridge Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - CMI Bridge Report Copyright Registration, #9 Exhibit 9 - CMI Bridge Drawings, #10 Exhibit 10 - CMI Bridge Drawings Copyright Registration, #11 Exhibit 11 - BBI Bridge Report, #12 Exhibit 12 - BBI Bridge Drawings, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons to BBI, #15 Summons to Angell, #16 Summons to Barnes)(La Briola, Stephen) (smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3857 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5085 WMR JSA 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GABRIEL CAMP vs. PRUITT HEALTH HOSPICE. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11455881. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit RTS, #3 Exhibit Dr. Note, #4 Exhibit PIP, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mixon, J.)(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3856 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5084 LMM 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY vs. RAYMOND SHEDD. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11455193. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Wilder Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service on Kista McDaniel, #4 Exhibit D - Docket - WILDER VS MCDANIEL 21-C-02486-S2, #5 Exhibit E - Motion for Default Judgment, #6 Exhibit F - Default Judgment on Liability, #7 Exhibit G - 9.7.2021 - Fax from Shea w complaint, #8 Exhibit H - McDaniel Affidavit, #9 Exhibit I - Shedd Affidavit, #10 Exhibit J - Order denying motion to set aside default, #11 Exhibit K - Shedd - Policy Forms, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons McDaniel, #14 Summons Shedd, #15 Summons Wilder)(Mandell, Samantha)(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3855 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5083 TWT 430 28:1332oc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Renaissance Group Shrinathji, LLC vs. Melio Payments, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11454470. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Melio Payments, Inc.)(Banerjee, Roy)(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3854 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5082 ELR JKL 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Newell vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE E-ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3853 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5079 JPB 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11453785. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, et al., #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Dyke, Christopher)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3852 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5074 SCJ 350 28:1446mv. RESUBMISSION of #3851 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Rachel Wimbish vs. Dustin Rhynes. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452971. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal, # 2 Exhibit "B" to Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit "C" to Notice of Removal, # 4 Exhibit "D" to Notice of Removal, # 5 Exhibit "E" to Notice of Removal)(Glavinos, Paschal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Complaint)(Glavinos, Paschal)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3851 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5074 SCJ 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Rachel Wimbish vs. Dustin Rhynes. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452971. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit "B" to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit "C" to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit "D" to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit "E" to Notice of Removal)(Glavinos, Paschal)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3850 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0103 SDG CMS 890 28:1782. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Other uncontested ancillary or supplemental proceeding), Elumeo SE vs. Gem Shopping Network. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11452839. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Elumeo SE's Application for Judicial Assistance Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782, #2 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 [Proposed] Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Request for Production of Documents and for Testimony, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration of Dr. Nicco Hahn in Support of Application for Judicial Assistance, #6 Declaration of Wolfgang Boye in Support of Application for Judicial Assistance, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Horst, Jeffrey)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3849 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5071 LMM 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, MOYA PRICE vs. CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452227. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and orporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Cruser, Joseph)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3848 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5070 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lolitalynette Coleman vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452226. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3847 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5069 SCJ 880 18:1836b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blue Wave Products, Inc. vs. Freetime, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452188. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Long-Daniels, David)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3846 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5068 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nicole Nagel vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452158. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3845 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5067 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anita Long vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452141. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3844 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5066 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Calli Reed vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452117. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3843 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5065 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Estabraq Sahib vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11452088. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3842 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5064 AT 440 42:1983cv. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IGNACIO GARCIA-CAMPOS vs. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11451682. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for U.S. Customs and Immigration, #3 Summons Summons for DeKalb CEO, #4 Summons Summons for DeKalb BOC)(Rolle, Michael)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3841 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5063 MHC 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Shawn Leftwich vs. State of Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11451498. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Superior Court case information form, #3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Indigency, #4 Exhibit D: Order on Affidavit of Indigency, #5 Exhibit E: Summons, #6 Exhibit F: Entry of Non-Established or Improper Service on State of GA, #7 Exhibit G: Entry of Non-Established Service re GDOL, #8 Exhibit H: Entry of Non-Established Service on Comm Butler, #9 Exhibit I: Notice of Filing Exhibits, #10 Exhibit J: Entry of Service on GDOL, #11 Exhibit K: Entry of Service on Comm Butler, #12 Exhibit L: Answer and Defenses, #13 Exhibit M: Verification of Answer and Defenses, #14 Exhibit N: Superior Court Notice of Removal, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoff, Katherine)(smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3840 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5062 TWT 896 09:0010. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Megan Burton vs. AU Card, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11451338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth) (smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3839 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5061 TWT 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ella Brown vs. Walmart, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11450931. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings)(Deeb, Nicholas) (smw).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3838 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5060 JPB 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Franklin Street IV, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated vs. Customized Distribution, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11450656. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Andrew)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3837 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5056 LMM AJB 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deidrean Tyler vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11450236. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Dakroub, Jenna)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3836 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5055 ELR RGV 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Colleen Nicole Pitts vs. Victor Hill. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11450223. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Weldon, Jacob)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3835 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5054 SCJ 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, EVA MEMAR vs. WHITE HORSES TRUCKLINE, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11450193. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Stone, Matthew)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3834 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5053 AT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Alice Letson vs. Bobby Fryar Trucking Co. Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11449917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: A copy of the Complaint, Summons and all other items served on these Defendants in the state court action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: A copy of the Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal submitted to the Clerk of the State Court of Gwinnett, County, State of Georgia, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, Parks)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3833 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5049 TWT 350 28:1332mv. SEVEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joel P Gemza vs. Zuan Liang Zhao. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11449288. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Citation Disposition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons re Def Zhao 1 of 2, #4 Summons Summons re Def Zhao 2 of 2, #5 Summons Summons re Def UPS Line Inc, #6 Summons Summons re Def Ioseph L Israel, #7 Summons Summons re Def Decker Truck Line Inc, #8 Summons Summons re Def United Fin Cas Co, #9 Summons Summons re Def United States Fire Ins Co)(Newton, Steven) (smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3832 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5041 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Valdenise Goldsmith vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11449020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Colin)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3831 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5040 SDG 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cosmos Granite (South East), LLC vs. Cosmos Granite (East), LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11449015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Superior Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knott, Ethan)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3830 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5039 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JESSICA ANN JONES vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11448724. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Heard, Denman)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3829 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5038 MHC WEJ 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daniel Torres vs. Total Water Treatment Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11448400. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bergmar, Nina) (smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3828 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5036 JPB 490 47:0551. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Innovative Sports Management Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media vs. Corona Restaurant and Bar at Winters Chapel LLC d/b/a Corona at Winters Chapel. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447944. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Corona Restaurant and Bar at Winters Chapel LLC d/b/a Corona at Winters Chapel, #3 Summons to Edgar Yobans Espinoza-Flores)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)(smw).
December 9, 2021 Filing 3827 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5035 WMR 440 42:1983cv. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jordan Wells vs. City of Union City, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447521. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Union City, GA, #2 Summons Vince R. William, Mayor of Union City, #3 Summons Elliot Garnes, Sergeant Union City Police, #4 Summons Victor Kyles, Former Union City Police, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mignott, Marsha)(smw).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3826 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5034 MHC 367 28:1332pl. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert Daniel Sorrells vs. Philips North America LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447487. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Philips RS), #3 Summons (Philips Holding), #4 Summons (Philips NA), #5 Summons (Royal Philips))(Deeb, Nicholas)(smw).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3825 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5033 AT 896 09:0010. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RICHARD LAUDIG vs. INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447429. (Attachments: #1 Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radford, James)(smw).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3824 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5032 MLB AJB 442 42:2000sx. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Michael Dunston vs. Meredith Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447364. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Materials, #2 Exhibit 2 - Electronic Mail Communications, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Employment Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnum, Eric)(smw).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3823 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5031 TWT 430 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sandra Peppers Everett as Administratrix of the Estate of Betty Jean Peppers aka Betty Stowe Peppers vs. Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447287. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amirfazli, Tala)(smw).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3822 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5030 LMM LTW 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PRECIOUS JONES-YOUNG vs. SOUTHERN CRESCENT ) BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SYSTEM. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11446990. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A EEOC Charge -1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B EEOC Charge -2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C RTS)(Mixon, J.) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3821 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5029 SDG RDC 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint June Kay Peters vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11447027. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Person, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Dakroub, Jenna) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3820 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-102 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Jennifer Sunderland vs. Dean Okland. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11445618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schoenthaler, Peter) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3819 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5027 LMM 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, OMAR SANTIBANEZ AGUIRRE vs. VERNIE GALLION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11446009. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Pettus, W.) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3818 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5026 SCJ 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Atain Specialty Insurance Company vs. E. Martinez Drywall, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445921. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Summons E. Martinez, #8 Summons Gallegos, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zelonka, Richard) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3817 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5025 AT 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Mary Ceraldi vs. Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445870. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Medical Billing Excerpt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Answer State & Jury Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ewing, Patrick) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3816 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5024 SDG 893 33:1365. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert Williams vs. Capshaw Development Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445723. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 60 day notice of intent to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons (Capshaw), #4 Summons Summons (Geosam), #5 Summons Summons (Silverstone), #6 Summons Summons (Kevin Daniel), #7 Summons Summons (Scott Sibley))(Stack, Donald) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3815 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5023 JPB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Leslie Michelle Garcia vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Delaware). Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445702. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Butt, #3 Exhibit B - State court pleadings)(Deeb, Nicholas) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3814 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5022 LMM CMS 550 42:1983pr. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, John Mayer vs. Newton County Sheriff Ezell Brown. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445654. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Consent to Remove), #2 Exhibit 1: Newton County Filings, #3 Exhibit 2: Notice of Removal to Newton County, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodward, Karen) (bc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 3813 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5017 AT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anton Clifford vs. Rosland Properties, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11445162. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3812 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5016 ELR 840 28:1338tr. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11444132. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #6 Brief in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #7 Bruck Declaration (attachment to Motion for Preliminary Injunction), #8 Exhibit A to the Bruck Declaration, #9 Exhibit B to the Bruck Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3811 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5015 TWT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anton Clifford vs. Graham's Service Stations, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443959. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3810 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5014 WMR 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anton Clifford vs. Fatima Investments, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443937. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3809 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5013 TWT 360 28:1446wd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sarah Fuller vs. Enterprise Leasing Company of Georgia, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443585. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Allard, Jason)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3808 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5012 SDG CCB 442 42:2000ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KATHERINE VERNET vs. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF EALRLY CARE AND LEARNING. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443476. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edmonds, Angelik)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3807 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5010 WMR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, LUGINA LASTER vs. ANTHOS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT,LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443199. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Jon(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3806 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5009 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JASMINE PICHARDO vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443119. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3805 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5008 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HAILEY LOEFFLER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443097. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3804 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5007 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BETTINA LITTLE vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443075. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3803 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5006 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ERIAN M JUDD vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443056. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3802 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5005 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lynna Sonnier vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443034. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC)(Kassan, Randi)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3801 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5004 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint YOLANDA JIMENEZ vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443043. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3800 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5003 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARYLIN HINOJOSA vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11443019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3799 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5002 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LAIAH DAVIS vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442992. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3798 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-5001 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LAUREN SUTTON vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442951. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3797 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4999 LMM 690 18:0924. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. One Century Arms VSKA Rifle, Serial Number SV70118005. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3796 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4998 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AMANDA LYNN THIBERT vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442645. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3795 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4997 MHC 820 28:1338cp. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint STEVEN HIRSCH vs. URBAN ISLANDZ MEDIA LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442625. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Proposed Summons for Urban Islandz, #23 Proposed Summons for Nickoy Campbell, #24 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, #25 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Leath, Jayma)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3794 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4996 TWT JKL 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, April Fairley vs. Ragan & Ragan, P.C.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442686. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Superior Court filings), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Notice of Filing Notice of Removal), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Rosenkoff, Matthew)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3793 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4994 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Frances Marie Santos vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442680. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3792 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4993 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Caryn Ling vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442598. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3791 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4992 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LAURA M BRAASCH vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442584. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3790 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4991 MHC 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sabrena Swinger vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442526. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate, #4 Answer, #5 Notice of Filing)(Crutchfield, Terrika)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3789 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4990 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Julie Hernandez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3788 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4989 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jill Love vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxx, Christopher)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3787 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4988 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint April Wilson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442408. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Sheet)(Dweck, Morris)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3786 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4987 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jucinta Brockish vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11442370. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Sheet)(Dweck, Morris)(smw).
December 7, 2021 Filing 3785 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4981 SCJ JCF 290 15:1601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Denise Serkedakis vs. West Coast Servicing, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11441007. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Denison, Christopher)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3784 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4980 WMR CMS 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TAMARA FLOYD vs. SYKES ENTERPRISES, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CGANDC-11440796. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Webb, Robyn)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3783 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4977 TCB JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Debbie Tabor vs. Trans Union LLC and General Motors Financial Company, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11439154. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3782 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4976 TWT 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elizabeth Bentley as Administrator of The Estate of Timothy J. Battles vs. National Security Resources, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11439071. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, James)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3781 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4975 SDG WEJ 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Doreen Melody Rodriguez vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11438958. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3780 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4974 JPB AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Margaret Marie Cook vs. Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC, and Broker Solutions, Inc. d/b/a New American Funding. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11438916. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3779 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4973 TWT CMS 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Harold King vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George) SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
December 6, 2021 Filing 3778 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4971 ELR 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TAKISHA COLEY vs. PRUITTHEALTH, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11438798. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Orlando, Roger)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3777 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4962 AT 465 08:1329. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hai Minh Ho vs. Ur Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11437451. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Appearance of Counsel, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons To Erskine, #9 Summons To Jaddou)(Goldstein, Myung-Sun)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3776 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4961 TWT 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES, LLC vs. MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11437333. (Melcher, Jeffrey)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3775 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4960 SDG CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Herman J Roche-Berry vs. RBM of Atlanta, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11437062. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rajan, Anandhi)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3774 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4959 JPB 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint UNITED STATES OF AMERICA vs. $28,908.30 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM TRUIST BANK CHECKING ACCOUNT XXXXXXXXX4454. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Norman)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3773 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4958 WMR JKL 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jermaine Whyte vs. Alliance CAS LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11437110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Alliance CAS LLC, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Nelson, John)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3772 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4954 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GENESIS COLLADO vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11436663. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Feller, Christina)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3771 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4953 AT JSA 863 42:0405wc. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jonathan Christian vs. Kilolo Kijakazi. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11436480. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons)(Hofrichter, Michael)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3770 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4950 MLB JCF 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amiriah Ponder vs. Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11435755. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Victor)(smw).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3769 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4949 MHC 220 15:1601. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11435550. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FCI, #3 Summons UAM, #4 Brief Motion & Brief for TRO)(Scott, J.)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3768 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4947 JPB 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Owners Insurance Company vs. Jose Martinez. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11434442. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asberry Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - ROR to Driver Jose Martinez, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Carlis Asberry, #6 Summons - Guzman Logistics, #7 Summons - Jose Martinez)(Crawford, Mike)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3767 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4946 WMR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint John Moore vs. Soteria Protection, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11434373. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Roberts, Victor) (smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3766 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4945 SCJ 340 46:0741. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint King Cooper vs. Hobo Seafood Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11434011. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to USA, #2 Summons Summons to HOBO SEAFOOD, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Robert)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3765 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4944 ELR 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Britton, Tiawan vs. Elexis Properties Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11434094. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3764 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4942 SCJ 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $20,750.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3763 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4941 AT 465 08:1447. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ekeke Kojo Adovor vs. Ur Mendoza Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11433422. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Summons Jaddou, #8 Summons Miller, #9 Summons Garland, #10 Summons Erskine)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3762 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4940 TWT CMS 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lisa Gardner vs. Equifax Information Service LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11433435. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Webb, Orion) (smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3761 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-cv-4937 WMR SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3756 THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons USA, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Army)(Townsend, Keshia)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3760 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4939 SDG 110 28:2201in. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11432955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Certified Policy) 000001-000123, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Atlanta Productions (Music Matters), #4 Summons George Lovell Audio Visual Services, #5 Summons HisCox Ins. Co)(Allred, William)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3759 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4938 JPB 465 08:1329. SIX E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nelson Bonilla vs. Merrick Garland. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11432890. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Appearance of Counsel Form, #10 Summons Summons- Kurt Erskine, #11 Summons Summons- Merrick Garland, #12 Summons Summons- Jedidah Hussey, #13 Summons Summons- UR. N. Jaddou, #14 Summons Summons- Alejandro Mayorkas, #15 Summons Summons- Daniel Renaud)(Zambrano, Shirley)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3758 CIVIL ACTION NO.1:21-CV-4937 WMR 350 28:1346pi. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3756 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts Complaint, #2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Attachment A, #5 Exhibit Attachment B, #6 Exhibit Attachment C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C-3, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C-4, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C-5, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C-7, #13 Exhibit Attachment D, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-4, #17 Exhibit Attachment E, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D-3)(Townsend, Keshia)(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3757 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4936 MHC 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jaan Marion vs. Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11432404. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell) (bc).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3756 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4937 WMR 350 28:1346pi. COMPLAINT IN #3758 CASE NOT OPENED - COMPLAINT MISSING - LEFT MESSAGE/EMAIL FOR ATTORNEY TOWNSEND TO CALL REGARDING THE COMPLAINT MISSING. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as subrogee of Bonita Smith Tynes vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431847. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons- US Attorney, #2 Summons Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Summons- ARMY)(Townsend, Keshia)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE NOT ON THE CORRECT FORM. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE CORRECT FORMS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3755 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4934 SCJ 350 28:2671. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Michael Hayes vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431949. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parnell, Ronald) (bc).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3754 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4932 AT JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint David Nieuwenhuis Jr., vs. Trans Union LLC, and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.),. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431535. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (bc).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3753 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4931 TWT 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, H. O. P. E. Through Divine Intervention vs. North American Elite Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431403. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Entry of Appearance - DLC, #3 Entry of Appearance - JDL, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Cochenour, Duane) (bc).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3752 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4930 SDG 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Melaan Callaway vs. Uber Technologies(GA), Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431273. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Jeffrey) (bc).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3751 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4929 ELR 240 28:1446tl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Michael Mobley vs. Guardian Automotive Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431152. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Howell, Nicholas)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3750 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4928 ELR 240 28:1446tl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marion Glen Adams vs. Guardian Automotive Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11431019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Howell, Nicholas)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3749 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4927 JPB 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Main Street America Assurance Company vs. Martinez Brick and Masonry Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430943. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Martinez Letter Dated June 7, 2019, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Pulte Letter Dated April 8, 2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons for Martinez Brick and Masonry Co, #6 Summons Summons for Ohio Security Insurance Co, #7 Summons Summons for Pulte Home Co. LLC)(Stewart, Walker)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3748 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4926 ELR 240 28:1446tl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nellie Thomas-Shepard vs. Guardian Automotive Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430877. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Howell, Nicholas)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3747 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4925 ELR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DARRYL CARTER vs. ACTION WORLDWIDE TRANSPORTATION, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430815. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Canfield, Rachel)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3746 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4924 MHC 490 47:0551. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. Vods Atlanta LLC d/b/a Up Restaurant and Lounge d/b/a Vods Lounge & Bistro ATL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430689. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Vods Atlanta LLC d/b/a Up Restaurant and Lounge d/b/a Vods Lounge & Bistro ATL, #3 Summons to Lawrence)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3745 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4923 SCJ 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Joseph T. Anderson vs. Allstate Indemnity Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430364. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - June 30, 2021 letter to Allstate from Plaintiffs' counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer of Defendant, #4 Verification of Melissa C. McMullen, #5 Jury Demand, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McMullen, Melissa)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3744 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4922-AT 490 47:0551. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. Stiffy's LLC d/b/a Padriac's. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11430118. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Franchell, #3 Summons to Padriac's)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3743 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4921-TWT 490 47:0551. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. The Bodega Restaurant Inc. d/b/a The Bodega. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11429808. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Aisha Johnson, #3 Summons to Brandon Johnson, #4 Summons to Britain Johnson, #5 Summons to Monroe Johnson, #6 Summons to The Bodega)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)(smw).
December 1, 2021 Filing 3742 SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3735 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4917 LMM - NO E-SUMMONS FILED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Porter, Timothy) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3741 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4914 JPB 440 42:1983cv. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Timothy Buford vs. Chairman Saintil. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428509. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Saintil)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3740 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4913 WMR 440 42:1983cv. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jessica Eichler vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Khatib, #4 Summons Skeens)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3739 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4912 ELR AJB 864 42:0405id. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Olivia Sharp vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428441. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Budde, Francis)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3738 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4911 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ivelisse Rodriguez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428340. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3737 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4910 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melissa Pimentel vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428336. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3736 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4909 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Katrina Phillips vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428321. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3735 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4917 LMM 367 28:1332pl. CASE ORIGINALLY SKIPPED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jennifer Perrin vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428312. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE CORRECT COMPLAINT(smw). (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3734 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4908 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Faatimah McKee vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428302. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3733 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4907 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maria Gomez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428294. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3732 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4906 MHC 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sabine Auguste vs. ABP Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11428039. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Quentrice Lowe), #3 Exhibit B (Adrian Lowe), #4 Summons Proposed Summons ABP, #5 Summons Proposed Summons Morelli)(Lizana, Arnold)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3731 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4905 LMM JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Deborah Young vs. Credence Resource Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428225. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3730 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4904 AT AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Douglas Cofield vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC and South State Bank, National Association (Inc.). Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428133. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3729 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4903 TWT 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $79,910.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Radka)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3728 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4902 SDG LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tina Marie Smith vs. Trans Union LLC and Midland Mortgage Co., a division of MidFirst Bank. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11428050. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3727 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4900 ELR 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $22,500.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3726 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4898 LMM CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Luckylois Brooks vs. Security Credit Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426935. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3725 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4897 AT JKL 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Luckylois Brooks vs. All Debt Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426929. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3724 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4896 TWT 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GABRIEL BRATU vs. UR MENDOZA JADDOU. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426867. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Gabriel Bratus Naturalization certificate, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Gabriel Bratu and Ioana Galatas marriage certificate, #3 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-130, #4 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-485, #5 Exhibit Interview Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice of Interview Cancellation, #7 Exhibit USCIS.gov Case Processing Times, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons)(Alwan, Zainab) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3723 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4894 JPB CMS 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tesella Culpepper vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426647. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Dakroub, Jenna) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3722 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4893 WMR 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Edwin Lebron vs. M Towers, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426577. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Corporation, #4 Summons Individually)(Morgan, Charles) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3721 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4892 MHC 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Benjamin Pointer vs. LM General Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426511. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Liberty's State Court Answer Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Liberty's State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Liberty's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit Liberty's Federal Court Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Karabinos, Karen) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3720 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4891 LMM JSA 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ronald Massey vs. Universal Protection Service, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dawkins, Fateen) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3719 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4890 TWT 360 28:1332pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kenneth Barber vs. Purity Zinc Metals, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426035. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Benjamin) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3718 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4889 SCJ 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Johnson, James R. vs. Becerra, Hernan, as Trustee of The Becerra Family Trust. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11426238. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) (bc).
November 30, 2021 Filing 3717 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4887 WMR LTW 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED NOT ISSUED - IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tydious Mitchell vs. Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3716 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4880 MHC JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint WILLIAM HARRISON STARKS vs. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11425059. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McClelland, Joseph) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3715 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4879 LMM 350 28:1446wd. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, JOSHUA LAWSON vs. AQUA GULF XPRESS, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11425020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiella, Melody) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3714 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4878 TWT AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Freddie Moultry Jr., vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Inc.), as successor by merger to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424989. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3713 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4877 SDG LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melody Vanessa Hamilton vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and Webbank a/k/a and d/b/a Fingerhut. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424987. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3712 CIVIL ACTION NO. 4:21-CV-224-ELR 830 35:271 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brock USA, LLC vs. FieldTurf USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424967. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Form AO 120, #13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lea, Puja)CASE FILED IN ATLANTA DIVISION IN ERROR - CASE FORWARDED TO ROME DIVISION ON 11/30/21 BY BC. (bc). Modified on 11/30/2021 (jpa).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3711 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4876 JPB 850 15:0078. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Christopher Taylor vs. GreenSky, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424858. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogovin, Michael) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3710 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4875-WMR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Latosha Lovelace vs. At Home Stores, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424654. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Stevan) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3709 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4874-MLB 110 28:1335. THREE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Colonia Penn Life Insurance Company vs. Rael D. Jones. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11423916. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Easley, Brian) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3708 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4872-SCJ-CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Allison Myers vs. Hf Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424384. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3707 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4871-LMM 367 28:1332pl.NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tracy Mousa vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424348. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Seth) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3706 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4870-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Veronica James vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424248. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Joel) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3705 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4869-AT-WEJ 442 29:0626. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Markel Oden vs. Starbucks Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424150. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Feldman, Mitchell) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3704 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4868-AT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Dr. Cacelia Bryant vs. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424140. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A- Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Demand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D- Answer)(Hankins, James) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3703 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4867-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jodee Skaling vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11424011. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxx, Christopher) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3702 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4866-WMR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DEON BAKER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated vs. THE ANTHEM COMPANIES, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11423973. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sparks, John) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3701 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4865-TWT-AJB 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robin Houston vs. MeSun Health Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11423914. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Gardner, Jerilyn) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3700 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4864-WMR 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Adam Brady vs. Anel Diaz. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11423794. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dermer, Stephen) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3699 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0098-JPB-JCF 890 FRCP45mi. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Foreign Subpoena), Manjit Singh Gill vs. AGK Enterprises, Inc.. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number BGANDC-11423735. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacko Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bushnell, Vincent) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3698 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4863-MLB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Blanca Mejia vs. Georgi Boykov. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11423385. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - St Ct. Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Foxtran Corp Info., #4 Exhibit C - Def. Counsel's Sworn Statement)(Kiella, Melody) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3697 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4862-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jordan Glanda vs. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11422975. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John) (bc).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3696 CIVIL ACTION O. 1:21-CV-4860-MHC-RDC 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS FILED - NOT ISSUED - IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALANITA C. TANNER vs. KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John) (bc).
November 28, 2021 Filing 3695 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4859-TWT 448 20:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jane Doe vs. Emory University. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11421910. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Anderson, Lisa) (bc).
November 26, 2021 Filing 3694 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4855 SDG LTW 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TERRION HUDSON vs. WALMART INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11421445. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jermaine)(smw).
November 26, 2021 Filing 3693 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4854 SDG 320 28:1446lb. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Patrick Amadasun vs. Google LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11421237. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All State Court Papers)(Arocha, Kevin) CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3692 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4853 TWT 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jermaine Wesley Day vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11420778. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Parks, Jacquita)(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3691 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4847 SCJ 820 28:1338cp. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Angel Chevrestt vs. Diamond Diaspora Media, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11420703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph of Celeste Beatty, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Infringing Article)(Carson, Dorsey)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3690 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4846 SDG 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Michael Alexander vs. OFFICER J. LENCREROT, in his Official and Individual capacity. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11420595. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joiner, Amelia)(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3689 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4845 JPB CCB 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mark Herndon vs. Golden Key International Honor Society. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11420484. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kessler, Gary)(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3688 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4843 JPB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ronald Rayborn vs. Vitaliy Statsenko. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11419924. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Exhibit B-Police Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Cole, Brenton)(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3687 RESUBMISSION of #3684 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4841 WMR. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marques D. Corbitt vs. Joseph D. Noocha. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11419696. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-1 Selective Insurance Companys Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit A-2 Selective Insurance Companys Demand Exhibits, #4 Exhibit B Lower Court Pleadings)(Henderson, Roberta)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Selective Insurance Companys Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Selective Insurance Companys Demand Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Lower Court Pleading, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Certificate, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Roberta)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3686 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4842 MLB RGV 442 42:2000ot. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kenneth vs. Lennox. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11419442. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harris, Austin)SUMMONS IS NOT ON FORM. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE SUMMONS ON THE CORRECT FORM AND SUBMIT IT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3685 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4841 WMR. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3684 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal,. (Henderson, Roberta)(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3684 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4841 WMR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Marques D. Corbitt vs. Joseph D. Noocha. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11419696. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-1 Selective Insurance Companys Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit A-2 Selective Insurance Companys Demand Exhibits, #4 Exhibit B Lower Court Pleadings)(Henderson, Roberta)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3683 CIVIL ACTION NO 3:21-CV-0204-TCB-RGV 28:1444 220 NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Irene C. Street vs. Bank of America, N.A.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11419332. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Rhadans, Allison)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO NEWNAN 11/24/2021 BY SWB(smw). (dmb).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3682 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4839 TWT 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Carla Hall vs. Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11418094. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-N, #2 Exhibit Exhibits O-AA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDaniel, Melissa)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3681 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4837 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JODI STAUFFER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11417002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3680 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4836 JPB 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marlon Ray vs. MFinch & WPerry Solutions, Inc. d.b.a Maaco Auto Body Shop & Painting. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416980. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Van Remmen, Gordon)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3679 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4835 ELR AJB 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ardith Binns vs. Heal, Inc., d/b/a Healing Community Center. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416898. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Billips, Matthew)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3678 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4834 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint STANLEY J. DASH vs. ETHICON, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416732. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badaruzzaman, Asim)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3677 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4833 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ASHLEY RUMMEL vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416587. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3676 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4832 MLB 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Toan Ba Nguyen vs. Ur Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416446. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Diaz, Leslie)(smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3675 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4831 ELR 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Warbird Consulting Partners, LLC vs. PSN Services, LLC d/b/a PSN Affiliates. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416244. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SOW, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Payment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Demand Letter, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, John) Modified on 11/23/2021 (smw).
November 23, 2021 Filing 3674 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4830 SCJ 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Young Contracting SE, inc. vs. Harco National Insurance Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11416174. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Pettigrew, Dawn)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3673 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4825 AT JSA 530 28:2254. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus, Kyree Brantley vs. Jermaine White. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number AGANDC-11415253.(Zell, Rodney)NO CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3672 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4824 AT 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Volvo Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC vs. David L. Houston. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11415113. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status Report from the Department of Defense Manpower Data Center, #2 Exhibit B - Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Modification, #5 Exhibit E - Default Notice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons)(Furr, Kathleen)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3671 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4823 TWT 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NAKIYA BENNETT, JR. vs. ENFORCERS PROTECTIVE SERVICE, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414921. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Enforcers Protective Service, LLC, #3 Summons to Lanar Briscoe)(Bridgers, Charles)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3670 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4822 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sophie Molinari vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414609. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barfield, William)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3669 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4821 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eileen Teller vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414575. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3668 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4820 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Samantha Payan vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414541. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3667 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4819 JPB RGV 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marshall Bell II And Felita Bell vs. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414520. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3666 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4818 LMM 367 28:1332pl. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Amy Blevins vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414505. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3665 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4817 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bhavini Solanki vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414436. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3664 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4816 WMR WEJ 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Keith Ransom vs. PDQ Services, INC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414374. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3663 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4815 MLB AJB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint David Sanchez vs. LVNV Funding, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414186. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3662 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4814 ELR 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nathaniel Howell vs. Lazer Spot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414093. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohan, Emily)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3661 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4813 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHERYL PRUITT vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11414057. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3660 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4812 LMM . SUBMISSION of additional TRO attachments re: #3659 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Lindsey) (smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3659 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4812 LMM 443 42:3613. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Anderson, Lindsey)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL. IFP AND MOTION FILED IN #3660 (smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3658 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4811 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Meridel Tilsen vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413691. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zimmerman, Genevieve)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3657 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4810 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARCEY C. MOSCA vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413577. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Patrick)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3656 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4809 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JULIE DURTHALER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., et al.TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413493. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Patrick)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3655 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4808 LMM 370 28:1446fr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Paul C. Parker vs. Arthur H. Haer. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Discovery, #3 Exhibit 3 - Acknowledgement of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Notice of Removal (State Court), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baugh, Christina)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3654 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4807 MHC 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint King, Cody vs. Fan, Jack H.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413437. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Jack H. Fan, #3 Summons as to Defendant Wei-Ling Fan)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3653 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4806 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EMMA SHAFFER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413266. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3652 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4805 TWT 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kevin Wasson vs. ARCPE Holding, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11413053. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 CIP)(Chaness, Bret)CIVIL COVER SHEET BLANK(smw).
November 22, 2021 Filing 3651 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0097 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Ascentium Capital LLC vs. Nerida LLC dba Kibitech Solutions. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number CGANDC-11412857. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furr, Kathleen)(smw).
November 21, 2021 Filing 3650 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4803 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARIBEL PRIETO vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411696. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3649 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PREPARED FOOD PHOTOS, INC. F/K/A ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICTIONS CO. INC. vs. BILT ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a J.R. CRICKETS NORTHLAKE. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411452. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Billy Williams, #4 Proposed Summons for Bilt Enterprises LLC Billy Williams - Registered Agent, #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright, #6 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Leath, Jayma)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3648 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sheila Sumpter vs. Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation D/B/A Grady Health System. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mew, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3647 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jeweltex Manufacturing Inc. Retirement Plan vs. GreenSky, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411366. (Rogovin, Michael)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3646 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Livingston vs. Terminus Trading & Provisions, Inc., D/B/A Revere Meat Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411242. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mew, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3645 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maura Blake vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411194. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3644 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4797 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KATHRYN HINRICHS vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11411045. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3643 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4796 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sarah Case vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410980. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3642 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4795 WMR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Wanda Torres vs. Alberto Carballo. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410872. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #5 Defendant Alberto Carballo's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Defendant Brito & Son Transport, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Capobianco, Andrew)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3641 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4794 MLB 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Immanuel Lowe vs. Lazer Spot Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410918. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Lazer Spot Inc.)(Hannon, Patrick)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3640 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4793 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jessica Nelson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410861. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3639 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4792 MHC LTW. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3506 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Paxton, Misty)DOCUMENTS FOR THE REST OF THE CASE IS FILED IN #3506 (smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3638 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4791 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sahara Garcia vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinde, Alfred)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3637 SKIPPED WRONG DOCUMENT SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3506 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Paxton, Misty)INCORRECT DOCUMENT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE CORRECT DOCUMENT.(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3636 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4790 LMM 365 28:1332pl. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Janice McMonigle vs. 11578243 Canada, Inc. d/b/a BlackOxygen Organics. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11410573. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Saint Onge, #3 Summons Summons Canada Inc, #4 Summons Summons Black Oxygen USA)(Wetherington, Matthew)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3635 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4789 SCJ 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, O.Zion, LLC vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11410530. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Answer)(Phillips, Jessica)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3634 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4788 AT 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. 2016 Ford Transit T-250 Van,VIN 1FTYR1CM4GKB33212. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3633 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4787 JPB 690 18:0981. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $257,120.00 in Funds Seized From Truist Bank Account Number XXXXXX8033 et al. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Radka) (smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3632 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4786 MLB 110 28:1332in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Star Indemnity & Liability Company vs. Stafford Logistics, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11409853. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(McCaffrey, Colleen)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3631 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4784 ELR 190 28:1335. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs. HENCEL GLOBAL IMPORTS LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11408963. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons Hencel Global Imports LLC, #3 Summons Henry Celestine, #4 Summons Dr. Jessica Lilly Hughes, #5 Summons Joni J. Goodrum, #6 Summons Aron C. Goodrum, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brunette, Elizabeth)(smw).
November 19, 2021 Filing 3630 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4783 TWT AJB 442 29:0626. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CARTER B. EDGE vs. NORTH AMERICAN ELECTRIC RELIABILITY CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11408817. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit Exh B - Right to Sue, #4 Summons, #5 Appendix Certificate of Interested Persons)(Reddy, K.)(smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3629 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4782 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PENNY HOWES vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ET AL. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11408216. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Copeland, Erin)(smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3628 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4781 SDG 190 28:1446dj. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407819. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ronald E. Morris, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet - Civil Cover Sheet)(Costolnick, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3627 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4780 SDG LTW 442 42:200ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Travis Toborg vs. Georgia Power Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11408032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Claim, #2 Exhibit B- EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Weldon, Jacob)(smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3626 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4779 LMM 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joanne DePalo vs. Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407987. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Consent Form), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc.), #4 Summons (Buffalo Wild Wings International, Inc.))(Parks, A.) Modified on 11/19/2021 (smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3625 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4778 SCJ 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Synasia Sanders vs. OS Restaurant Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407959. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Consent Form), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (OS Restaurant Services, LLC), #4 Summons (Outback Steakhouse International, L.P.), #5 Summons (Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC))(Parks, A.)(smw).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3624 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4776 AT 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, North Village Condominium Association vs. Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407658. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate, #5 Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Phillips, Jessica) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3623 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4775 TWT 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, THE BETTY COMPANY OF GEORGIA, INC. vs. CLAYTON COUNTY, GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407355. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10.20.21 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sheriff's Entries of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Respondent's Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Clerk of Superior Court, Clayton County), #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Petitioner, Appellant and Plaintiff, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maine, Dana) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3622 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4774 SDG 896 09:0001. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Atlas Equipment, LLC vs. Hyundai Construction Equipment Americas, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407360. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkins, Matthew) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3621 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4773 JPB 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gezaei Berhe Gebremichale vs. Merrick Garland. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407333. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appearance of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Summons Summons Garland, #9 Summons Summons Mayorkas, #10 Summons Summons Jaddou, #11 Summons Summons Miller, #12 Summons Summons Erskine)(Ruiz, Alexis) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3620 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4772 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maria De Anda Pena vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11407249. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hirsch, Andrea) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3619 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4771 WMR 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Derrica Merritt vs. Rollins, Inc. d/b/a Orkin Pest & Termite Control. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11406479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service)(Heller, Martin) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3618 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4770 ELR 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tu Thi Cam NGUYEN vs. UR MENDOZA JADDOU. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11406726. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Principal Plaintiffs passport biographical page, visa, and admission stamp, #2 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status for principal Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status for derivative Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit Approval notice for Form I-140 Immigrant Petition for Immigrant Worker, #5 Exhibit Approval notice for Principal Plaintiffs current and previous employment authorization cards, #6 Exhibit USCIS.gov Case Processing Times report for employment-based I-485s, #7 Exhibit December 2021 Visa Bulletin, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons)(Alwan, Zainab) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3617 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4769 LMM RDC 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONSES FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ake Cousar vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11406592. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request to Defendant Equifax, #3 Summons Request to Defendant Trans Union)(Dakroub, Jenna) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3616 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4768 TWT CCB 863 42:0405wc. THREE E-SUMMONS FILED NOT ISSUED - IFP. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PAMELA L. IVINS vs. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Motion IFP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to OGC / USAG / ASAO, #4 Summons USM 285 to OGC / USAG / ASAO)(Grist, Joel) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3615 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4767 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Maiwase Tembo vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11406272. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3614 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4766 SDG 710 29:216b. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Thang Cung vs. RAINTUNG ENTERPRISE INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11405756. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Martin, Thomas) (bc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 3613 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4765 JPB 365 28:1446pl. NO R-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lamont J. Walton vs. 3M Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11405645. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Gwinnett Magistrate Court Filings))(Martin, Robert) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3612 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4760 AT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Brittney Irving vs. John Fitzgerald Cruthirds. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11405140. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit CR England 1st RFAs, ROGs, RPDs to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff RESP RFAs, ROGs, RPDs, #4 Exhibit Letter to Opposing Counsel re 6.4, #5 Exhibit 10-19-2021 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff RESP ROGs 06-09-2021, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service upon C.R. England, Inc., #8 Exhibit Sheriff's Entry of Service u[on Cruthirds, #9 Exhibit Answer of Defendants, #10 Exhibit Rule 5.2 (RFAs, ROGs, RPDs) 05-07-2021, #11 Exhibit COS (RFAs, ROGs, RPDs 06-03-2021, #12 Exhibit Rule 5.2 (RFAs, ROGs, RPDs) 06-09-2021, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff Counsel Leave of Absence, #14 Exhibit COS (RFAs, ROGs, RPDs) 06-28-2021, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Quinn) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3611 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4759 WMR JKL 442 42:1981ra. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alexius Hightower vs. Capstone ISG, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11405142. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Capstone ISG, Inc.)(Webb, Robyn) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3610 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4758 MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blinkhorn, Jessica vs. Kim, Jae Chul, as Trustee of the Jae Chul Kim Trust. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11405110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3609 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4757 ELR JKL 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kelley Lenahan vs. FRC BALANCE LLC dba TRUE FOOD KITCHEN. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11405082. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stanford, E.) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3608 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4756 MHC 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS FILED/ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stahls' Inc. vs. Kolormatrix, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404921. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 AO120, #7 Corporate Disclosure)(Bowler, John) (bc).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3607 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4752 TWT. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional TRO attachments re: #3602 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,,,. (D'Cruz, Robert)DUPLICATE SUMMONS FILED IN #3606 WHERE IT WAS ISSUED(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3606 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4752 TWT. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. SUBMISSION of additional TROattachments re: #3602 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Homeland LLC, #2 Summons Summons for John Markley)(D'Cruz, Robert)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3605 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4755 TCB 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Karen Dubin vs. The TJX Companies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404635. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complatin, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Jackson Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Luskin, Robert)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3604 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4754 SDG 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint NXT Healthcare, Inc. vs. OCI Limited. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404511. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons OCI Limited, #3 Summons Oliver Chapman, #4 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons)(Wright, Cory)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3603 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4753 WMR 190 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IOU Central Inc d/b/a IOU Financial Inc. vs. Donnix Construction LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404515. (Attachments: #1 Summons Donnix, #2 Summons Doria, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3602 TRO - CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4752 TWT 190 28:1332bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404411. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verification of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Supplement Motion and Brief for Interlocutory Injunction, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Injunction, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Injunction, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Ijunction, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Injunction, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Injunction, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Injunction)(D'Cruz, Robert)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3601 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4751 MHC 190 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires Subscribing to Policy Numbers 106/IN/230/0/0, 28807G19, B080130181G19, B080131297G19, B080127577G19, B080130231G19, B080130291G19, B080130328G19, B080128807G19 and B080130331G19 DBD, as subrogee of Shariket Kahraba Hadjret En Nouss vs. General Electric International, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404189. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filing, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Filing, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Filing, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Filing, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Filing, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Filing, #9 Exhibit I - State Court Filing, #10 Exhibit J - State Court Filing, #11 Exhibit K - State Court Filing, #12 Exhibit L - State Court Filing, #13 Exhibit M - State Court Filing, #14 Exhibit N - State Court Filing, #15 Exhibit O - State Court Filing, #16 Exhibit P - State Court Filing, #17 Exhibit Q - State Court Docket, #18 Declaration of William K. Whitner, #19 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of William K. Whitner, #20 Civil Cover Sheet, #21 Disclosure Statement)(Whitner, William)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3600 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4750 MLB JKL 480 15:1681 . TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Wilson vs. TransUnion, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404089. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc., #3 Summons TransUnion LLC)(Sand, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3599 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4749 ELR 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jude Ijeh vs. SunTrust now Truist. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11404037. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, Sarah)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3598 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4747 MHC 350 28:1346pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mark Wilkerson vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403689. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Partridge, Brittany)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3597 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4746 LMM 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sharnice N. Edwards vs. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403596. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A- Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B- Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex. C- Answer)(Hankins, James)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3596 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4745 SCJ CMS 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED . Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dionicio Fuentes Mireles Jr., vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Sterling Jewelers Inc. (Delaware) a/k/a and d/b/a Jared The Galleria of Jewelery. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403551. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3595 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4744 AT JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ronald Stephen Russell vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Truist Bank Inc. f/k/a Branch Banking and Trust a/k/a BB&T. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403538. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3594 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4743 TCB JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Fernickus Miguel Kinslow vs. Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403531. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3593 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4742 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Randi Williams vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403392. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Joel)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3592 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4741 TWT 791 28:1441er. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, VALERIE PORTER vs. CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11403288. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sheriff's Entry of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - ERISA NOR (Gwinnett Magistrate Court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coppage, Kenton)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3591 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4740 WMR 110 28:1332in. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Divine Faith Ministries Accounting Department vs. GuideOne Elite Insurance Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11402714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons)(Massey, James)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3590 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4739 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kendrick Murphy vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals, et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11402374. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Sheet)(Dweck, Morris)(smw).
November 17, 2021 Filing 3589 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4738 AT 190 28:1332bc. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint IOU Central Inc d/b/a IOU Financial Inc. vs. United Apothecary Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11402208. (Attachments: #1 Summons United Summons, #2 Summons Riddle Properties Summons, #3 Summons George Summons, #4 Summons Robert Summons, #5 Summons Jarred Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3588 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4734 LMM JSA 751 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Catherine Danforth vs. WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CGANDC-11401815. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Smith, Ian)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3587 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0096 WMR JSA 890 frcp45d. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Foreign Subpoena), Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC vs. NTE Carolinas II, LLC. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11401595. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A - Subpoena to GDS Associates, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint (Duke Energy Carolinas v NTE Carolinas II, 3:19-cv-515 WDNC), #5 Exhibit D - Answer, 2nd Amended Counterclaims and Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Stipulated Protective Order and Supplemental Protective Order, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Deposition of Stephanie Clarkson, #8 Exhibit G - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 6-18-2021, #9 Exhibit H - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 6-25-2021, #10 Exhibit I - GDS Responses and Objections to NTE Subpoena, #11 Exhibit J - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 7-7-2021, #12 Exhibit K - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 7-19-2021, #13 Exhibit L - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 7-23-2021, #14 Exhibit M - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 7-29-2021, #15 Exhibit N - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 8-4-2-2021, #16 Exhibit O - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 8-9-2021, #17 Exhibit P - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 10-4-2021, #18 Exhibit Q - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 10-8-2021, #19 Exhibit R - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 10-18-2021, #20 Exhibit S - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 11-2-2021, #21 Exhibit T - Email from RConstantine to KSmall, 11-2-2021, #22 Exhibit U - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 11-3-2021, #23 Exhibit V - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 11-5-2021, #24 Exhibit W - Email from KSmall to RConstantine, 11-8-2021, #25 Exhibit X - Email from RConstantine to KSMall, 11-5-2021, #26 Exhibit Y - GDS Associates LinkedIn profile page)(Baysinger, Bryan)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3586 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4733 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carly Pershyn vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11401427. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kristina)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3585 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4732 ELR 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ARCTURUS INTERNATIONAL LLC vs. DARLENE GELLER-STOFF. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11401327. (Attachments: #1 Summons SUMMONS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FORM, #4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST PERSONS)(Brown, Bruce)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3584 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4731 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sabrine Aros vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11401348. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kristina)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3583 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4729 MHC 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cynthia Williams vs. Risk & Insurance Consultants, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11400318. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Initiation Form, #2 Summons)(Fuchs, Dean)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3582 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4728 SCJ 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cordero, Alexander vs. Cafe Dominican Restaurant, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11400313. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Cafe Dominican Restaurant, Inc, #3 Summons as to Defendant Retail Shopping Center LLC)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3581 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4727 LMM 367 28:1332pl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PATRICK BUSH vs. LAZERSPOT, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11400088. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Charles)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3580 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4726 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Sarah Jewitt vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11399876. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Def. Teva Pharm., #3 Summons Summons to Def. Teva Women's, #4 Summons Summons to Def. Teva Branded, #5 Summons Summons to Def. Cooper Companies, #6 Summons Summons to Def. CooperSurgical)(Patel, Shreedhar)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3579 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4725 MLB 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jessica Lorton vs. WBY, Inc. d/b/a Follies. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11399830. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons WBY Inc. Summons, #3 Summons Steven Youngelson Summons, #4 Summons Surrey White Summons, #5 Exhibit Jessica Lorton Consent to Join, #6 Exhibit Rikki Sampson Consent to Join, #7 Exhibit Jazmin Patrick Consent to Join, #8 Exhibit Hewan Liben Consent to Join)(Graham, Mitchell)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3578 CIVIL ACTION 1:21-CV-4724 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cherisse Samuels vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11399774. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kristina)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3577 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4723 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tabitha Tincher vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11399569. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kristina)(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3576 SKIPPED CASE 2255. Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus, Travis Sentall Robinson vs. United States. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number AGANDC-11399555. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Brief in support of 2255, #3 Exhibit Attachment 1 to brief, #4 Exhibit Attachment 2 to brief)(Strickland, Sydney)CASE SKIPPED BECAUSE ITS A 2255. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE IT IN THE CRIMINAL CASE(smw).
November 16, 2021 Filing 3575 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4722 RWS 367 28:1332pl. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kimberly Larson vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11399340. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Warriner, Clell)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3574 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4718 TCB 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Megan Diggs vs. International Follies, Inc. d/b/a The Cheetah Lougne/ Alluvia Restaurant. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11398069. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Consent Form))(Lizana, Arnold)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3573 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4717 TWT LTW 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Morgan Hall vs. Styl Residential. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397980. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Mixon, J.)SUMMONS FOR RICHARD WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE IS NO ADDRESS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE CORRECTED SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3572 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4716 SDG RDC 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sherry L.. Ridgway vs. Rad Source Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397870. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stanford, E.) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THERE ARE TWO ADDRESSES FOR THE DEFENDANTS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3571 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4715 TWT 485 47:0227. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Melissa Carson vs. The Home Depot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haskins, Sidney)NO CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3570 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4714 MHC WEJ 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ashley Davis vs. HireRight, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397263. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Ian)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3569 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4713 LMM 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nechelle Fisher vs. Global Concessions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397399. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Mays, John)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3568 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4712 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Baily vs. Johnson & Johnson. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397201. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Diamond, Maria)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3567 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4708 AT AJB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marilyn Fussell vs. Stallings Financial Group, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3566 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4707 JPB LTW 480 15:13692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Darius Tremayne Bray vs. Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11397032. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3565 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4706 MLB CMS 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JULIE JACKSON vs. ACCELERATE 360, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11396922. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Artur)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3564 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4705 TWT 840 15:1125. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CCA and B, LLC vs. Adrianna Weikel. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11396413. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TM Regs, #2 Exhibit B - Copyrighted Works, #3 Exhibit C - Copyright Regs, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshots, #5 Exhibit E - 2018 Test Buy, #6 Exhibit F - 2020 Test Buy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Form AO120, #9 Form AO121, #10 Summons Proposed, #11 Cert of Int. Persons)(Cooper, Jason)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3563 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4704 MLB 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RECRUITMENT ALLEY, LLC vs. AGENTHR, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11395845. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "B")(McCarthy, Brendan)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3562 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4703 LMM 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TONY TOLBERT vs. THE SALVATION ARMY, a Georgia Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11395754. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Sparks, John)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3561 Qui TamCIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4702 SCJ 375 31:3729. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11395295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Jason)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3560 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4701 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ashley Merson vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394744. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3559 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4700 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tanele Greene vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394722. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3558 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4699 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jacqueline Coral vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394700. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 14, 2021 Filing 3557 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4697 AT 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JEREMY MANCINI BATES vs. VERIZON CONNECT FLEET USA LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394332. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons VERIZON CONNECT FLEET USA LLC, #3 Summons VERIZON CONNECT INC.)(Feldman, Mitchell) (smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3556 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4696 TWT 485 47:0227. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DARLENE BAUMANN vs. AMERISAVE MORTGAGE CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394102. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koval, Steven) (smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3555 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4695 SDG 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jay P. Evans Investment Properties, LLC vs. Republic-Franklin Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11394070. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Def. Special Answer and Defenses, #5 Def. Jury Demand, #6 Def. Motion to Dismiss, #7 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment)(Scott, Gailya)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3554 CIVIL ACTION 1:21-CV-4694 JPB 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, TRG Holdings G&H, LLC vs. Ashokkumar Patel. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11393855. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1: Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2: Notice of Removal in Kentucky Case, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Tate, Thomas)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3553 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4693-WMR 840 15:1114. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ELEMENTS FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. ELEMENT WEALTH ADVISORS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11393567. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Faris, James) (smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3552 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4692-MLB-JKL 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sabrya Khudhair vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Appeals Counsel Extension of Time Granted, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3551 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4691 ELR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nasim Rahimi vs. ACE American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11393305. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, David)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3550 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4689-MHC 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EN DONG vs. SUPER HIBACHI DULUTH, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11393040. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Barto, Brittany)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3549 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4688-LMM 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint King, Cody vs. Raunak Enterprises Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11392757. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Raunak Enterprises Inc, #3 Summons as to Defendant June Properties Inc)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3548 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4687-LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shellita Garrett vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11392694. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC)(Kassan, Randi)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3547 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4686-SCJ 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cesar Hidalgo vs. Sysco Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11392318. (Attachments: #1 Errata A-State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Cole, Brenton)(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3546 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4685-TWT-CMS 853 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jahnia Aamonie Valero vs. Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Motion to Proceed in Forma Paupres)(Comerford, Ida) SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3545 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4682-SDG 360 28:1441wd. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Melissa Bartolomei, as Surviving Child of Theresa Jarboe-Bartolomei, deceased vs. Retiree Housing of Atlanta, Inc. f/k/a Teamster Retiree Housing of Atlanta, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390992. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbits A-F)(O'Brien, Jay)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3544 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4681-WMR 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sylvia Swanson vs. Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Realty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390781. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Medical Center Blvd Docs, #4 Exhibit State of Secretary Cert- Walmart Inc., #5 Exhibit State of Secretary Cert- Walmart Stores East, LP, #6 Exhibit State of Secretary Cert- Walmart Realty, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand Letter)(McKinley, Hall)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3543 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4680-ELR 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anita C. Cooke vs. Randy Brashears. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390663. (Attachments: #1 Summons Brashears, #2 Summons Mayfield, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wiggins, Cary)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3542 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4679-MHC 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint EL TORRO INVESTMENTS, LLC vs. APRIL LIEBERMAN. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390617. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operating Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bushnell, Vincent)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3541 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4678-LMM 365 28:1446pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cedricka London vs. Crown Equipment Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390567. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boorman, Michael)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3540 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4677-JPB 410 15:0002. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Times Journal, Inc vs. Google, Inc and Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390503. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sumner, Michael)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3539 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4676-SCJ 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lamont McLeod vs. Douce Lulu LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390498. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McCollister, Julie)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3538 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4675-MLB 410 15:0002. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Neighbor Newspapers, Inc vs. Google, Inc and Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sumner, Michael)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3537 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4674-AT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brown, Yvonne vs. Sky King, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390287. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3536 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4673-AT-CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Bamughan Gold-Tabi A.K.A. Hellen B. Gold vs. Carter-Young, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390240. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel) (smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3535 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4672-TCB-JKL 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nathifa Gouveia vs. Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390236. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3534 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4671-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kelsey Gustafson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390219. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxx, Christopher)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3533 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4670-SDG-CMS 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Donica L. Solomon vs. Experian Information Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3532 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4669-WMR-JCF 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jamaal Russ vs. LVNV Funding, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390210. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brennan, Daniel)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3531 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4668-MLB 140 28:1332ni. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jeffrey Kolton vs. Jason Bedasse. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390204. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Default, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons for Jason Bedasse, #6 Summons Summons for Corlex Capital, LLC)(Kunkes, Craig) Modified on 11/12/2021 (smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3530 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4667-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Leona Ison vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11390124. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3529 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4666-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shannon Brommer vs. Ethicon. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11389863. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrama, Martin)(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3528 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4665-MHC-JSA 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Eve Lovell Crump vs. Andrew Saul. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 In Forma Pauperis)(Ginsberg, Jonathan)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 11, 2021 Filing 3527 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4664-TWT-AJB 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joy Green vs. Country Inn & Suites by Radisson, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11389736. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Miller, Adian)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3526 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4663-LMM 190 28:1332bc. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PUFFCUFF, LLC vs. QUALITY PLASTIC PRODUCTS, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11389339. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Flake, Andrew)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3525 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4662-ELR 160 28:1332ss. NINE E-SUMMONS ISSUED .Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sunil Shah vs. Robin Raina. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11389277. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Ebix, #4 Summons Hamil, #5 Summons Herter, #6 Summons Raina, #7 Summons Bhalla, #8 Summons Eckert, #9 Summons Keller, #10 Summons Benz, #11 Summons Hebard)(Dees, Marshall)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3524 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4661-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Pat Ricket vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11388425. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Policastro, Eric)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3523 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4659-WMR 350 28:1332mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Andreii Pavliuk vs. Estate of Anthony Timothy Reese. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11387909. (Attachments: #1 Summons Estate of Anthony Timothy Reese, #2 Summons United Financial Casualty Company, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Loren, James)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE NOT ON THE FORMS CORRECTLY. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS ON THE FORMS CORRECTLY(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3522 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4658-MLB-AJB 864 42:0405id. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CHRISTOPHER ROBIN DUPUY vs. KILOLO KIJAKAZI ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion, #2 Affidavit IFP Affidavit, #3 Affidavit IFP Short Form, #4 Affidavit IFP Long Form, #5 Exhibit to Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons AUSA NDGA, #8 Summons GEN COUNSEL, #9 Summons REGION IV, #10 Summons US ATTY GENERAL)(Atkins, Pamela)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3521 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4657-ELR-JSA 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HOWARD EDWARD MILLS, JR vs. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11387443. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons EFX, #3 Summons Proposed Summons XPN, #4 Summons Proposed Summons TU)(McClelland, Joseph)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3520 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4656-CAP-LTW 442 29:0626. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Richard Jones vs. Graycor Southern, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11387376. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right To Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(McDonald, Robert)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS NOT MADE OUT TO THE DEFENDANT. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3519 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4655-SDG-RDC 442 42:2000ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jonathan A. Azar vs. City of Chamblee, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11387230. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, and Affidavit of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quinn, Megan)(smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3518 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4654-MHC 370 28:1332fr. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robert Orminston vs. Julie Freeman. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11387036. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons in Civil Action - Julie Freeman, #3 Summons Summons in Civil Action - Chris Freeman)(Poole, Todd) Modified on 11/10/2021 (smw).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3517 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4653-SCJ-LTW 863 42:0405wc. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gale Hudgins Jr vs. Commissioner Social Security Administration. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11386795. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons)(Rogers, David)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3516 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4648-LMM 370 28:1332fr. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint UBS Financial Services Inc. vs. Daniel Motherway. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11385618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Daniel Motherway, #3 Summons to Tara Baquero)(Le Jeune, Danielle)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3515 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-CV-4647-AT 710 29:0216b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint James Randy Phillips vs. Gurhari Hospitality, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11385407. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Stephens, Jeremy)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3514 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4646-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Malinda Robinson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11385432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3513 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0094-MHC-AJB 890 frcp45b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Motion to Quash), Highguard Capital, L.P. vs. United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11385238. (Kuglar, Craig) CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3512 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4645-CAP-AJB 480 15:1681. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dana Abouem vs. Ally Financial, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11384829. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Love, John) (smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3511 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4644-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Janice Pavik vs. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11384573. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3510 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4643-JPB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stokes, K. Scott vs. our Extra Attic, Windward, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11384490. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) Modified on 11/9/2021 (smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3509 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4642-MLB 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JOHN L. ROWELL vs. UR MENDOZA JADDOU. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11384067. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff John L. Rowells United States birth certificate, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs John L. Rowell and Marisol Mejia Rowells marriage certificate, #3 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-130, #4 Exhibit Receipt for Form I-485, #5 Exhibit Interview Notice, #6 Exhibit USCIS.gov Case Processing Times, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons)(Alwan, Zainab)(smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3508 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4641-WMR-CCB 791 29:2601. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint TANYA REED vs. HEALTHCARE STAFFING, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11383925. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Roberts, Victor) (smw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3507 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4633-TWT 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, TANYA REEVES PITTSON vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11382648. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bingham, William) (smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3506 SKIPPED CASE NO COMPLAINT. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alicia Thomas vs. Maury Cobb Attorney at Law, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11382330. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Corporate Disclosure)(Paxton, Misty) NOTIFIED ATTORNEY THAT THERE WAS NO COMPLAINT FILED(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3505 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4632-SDG 465 05:0702. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blanca Martinez Rios vs. Kirt Thompson, Director. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11382060. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Merrick Garland, #2 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #3 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Georgia, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dantzler, James)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3504 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4631-SDG-CCB 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anthony J. Harris vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Appeals Counsel Extension of Time Granted, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3503 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4630-AT 791 29:1132. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Anthony Middendorff vs. ExpressJet Airlines, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11380876. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Douglas)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3502 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4629-TWT 440 42:1983cv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sharif Hassan vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11380725. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Norins, Clare)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3501 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4627-MLB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Blinkhorn, Jessica vs. SWK, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11380164. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3500 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4626-WMR 422 28:1443. NO. E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ebony Appling vs. Robb Pitts. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11379812. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A - Amended Complaint, #3 Ex. B - Docket Filings)(Martinez, Dominique)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3499 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4625-CAP-JKL 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Glen Deangelo Hemphill vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Informa Pauperis form)(Humphries, Joel)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3498 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4621-SDG 110 28:2201in. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company vs. Atlanta Area Council, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11379058. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part One, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part Two, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part Three, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part Four, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part Five, #7 Exhibit Exhibits C - G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibits I - P, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, David)(smw).
November 8, 2021 Filing 3497 CIVIL ACTION 1:21-CV-4620-RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mary Orse vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11379209. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinsman, Robert)(smw).
November 6, 2021 Filing 3495 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4619-JPB 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cassandra Ellerbee vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378296. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Jack Wright)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 6, 2021 Filing 3494 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4618-WMR 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mykah Knitig vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378295. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Kermit Ward)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 6, 2021 Filing 3493 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4617. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Heidi Howard vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378294. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Kermit Ward)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 6, 2021 Filing 3492 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4616-SCJ 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Drew Mindell vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378292. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Davis)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3491 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4615-ELR 820 28:1338cp. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alwand-Vahan Jewelry Ltd. vs. Lustour, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378234. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Form AO 121)(Andersen, Evan)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3490 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4614-ELR-JKL 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nancy Mospanyuk vs. AXS Mobility Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378186. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons)(Forrest, Michael)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3489 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4613-MHC-CMS 442 42:2000ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mary C. Terrell vs. City of Forest Park, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378111. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buckley, Edward)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3488 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4612-AT 450 49:14705. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Dawn Gallman vs. Allied Van Lines, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378116. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons to Allied, #4 Exhibit Civil Case Filing Form, #5 Exhibit Sheriff's Entry of Service, #6 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(McMickle, Scott)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3487 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4611-TWT-LTW 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Grace L. Williams vs. Express Lien, Inc. dba Levelset. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11378078. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forestner, David)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3486 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4610-CAP 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, BARBARA FULTON vs. JOHN DOE. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377911. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/ Court docket along with the Complaint for Damages and all filings in Defendants possession, #2 Exhibit B/ Service of Process Transmittal and Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C/ Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D/ Affidavit of Wm. Daniel Floyd, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, William)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3485 CIVIL ACTIONS NO. 1:21-CV-4608 SDG 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Travius Hooks vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377862. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate, #4 Declaration, #5 Notice of Filing, #6 Answer)(Segel, Melissa)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3484 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4607 JPB RDC 480 15:1697. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Crystal Kay vs. Witness Riches, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377648. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Services Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Witness Riches, LLC, #4 Summons Great American Insurance Company)(Hurt, James)SUMMONS WERE DUPLICATE FOR GREAT AMERICAN. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE SUMMONS FIR RICHES IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3483 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4606 MLB 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jennelle Y. Booker vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377614. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate, #4 Answer, #5 Declaration, #6 Notice of Filing)(Segel, Melissa)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3482 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4605 ELR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Janice Black vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377520. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Discovery, #5 Declaration, #6 Answer)(Vigilant, Kristen)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3481 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4604 LMM 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Holt, Dakota vs. The Fred C. Nienaber Living Trust). Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377536. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig) (smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3480 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4603 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sarah Wright vs. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377509. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3479 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4601 MHC 110 28:2201in. FOURTEEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE vs. CIMERRING PROPERTIES GROUP, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377372. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Summons Buckingham, #22 Summons Cimerring Properties, #23 Summons Cindy Cimerring, #24 Summons CPInvestors, #25 Summons Hanoch Michael Cimerring, #26 Summons Hass Spring Valley, #27 Summons MMG Management, #28 Summons Seven Oaks, #29 Summons Sherikia Ivey, #30 Summons SV Apts, #31 Summons SV ManagerCo, #32 Summons SV Member, #33 Summons Yaakov Cimerring, #34 Summons Yisroel Cimerring)(Fields, Paul)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3478 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4600 TWT 110 28:2201in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint (Underlying Action), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Colony v. Henry Properties, et al)(Lavin, Parker)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3477 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4599 CAP 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Quayshawn Long vs. Natasha Renee Grooms. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11377314. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand, #3 Exhibit Sheriff's Entry of Service - Grooms, #4 Exhibit Sheriff's Entry of Service - CR England, #5 Exhibit Answer of Defendants, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Quinn)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3476 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4598 SDG CMS 863 42:0405ww. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alicia M. Landrum vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Appeals Counsel Extension of Time Granted, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Motion for In Forma Pauperis)(Comerford, Ida)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3475 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4597 JPB 440 28:1443. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, London R. Bouvier vs. City of Covington, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376914. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, William)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3474 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4596 MHC 840 15:1114. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Savannah Bourbon Company LLC vs. Savannah Seltzer LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Savannah Seltzer LLC, #4 Summons to Stafford, #5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Seigel, Mark)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3473 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4595 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Julie Sczesnik vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3472 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4594 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lakesha Latimore vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376460. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3471 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4593 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nicole Braidis vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376072. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3470 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4592 MLB CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Laura Gray vs. Transworld Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376394. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gray Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Kirsten)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3469 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4591 AT JSA 442 42:2000ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint DERICK B. WILSON vs. SOUTHERN AIDS COALITION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hall, Anthony)(smw).
November 5, 2021 Filing 3468 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4590 ELR 160 28:1332ss. NINE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Daniel Lilienfeld vs. Robin Raina. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11376081. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Ebix, #4 Summons Hebard, #5 Summons Benz, #6 Summons Keller, #7 Summons Eckert, #8 Summons Bhalla, #9 Summons Raina, #10 Summons Herter, #11 Summons Hamil)(Dees, Marshall)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3496 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE(abm) Modified on 11/8/2021 Order docketed in error(abm). Modified on 11/8/2021 (rlh).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3467 TRO - IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED SKIPPED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT. PER ATTORNEY CASE WILL NOT BE FILED Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Lindsey)ATTORNEY IS BEING CONTACTED(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3466 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4588 SCJ 365 28:1332wd. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gregory Jerome Jones vs. Ningbo Liqi Electrical Appliances Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11375168. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Issued to Ningbo Liqi Electrical Appliances Co, Ltd., #3 Summons Issued to Geneva Industrial Group, Inc., #4 Summons Issued to Walmart, Inc fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., #5 Summons Issued to Walmart Stores East, LP)(Panayotopoulos, Nicholas)SUMMONS FOR NINGBO WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT DOES NOT HAVE A COMPLETE ADDRESS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3465 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4587 SDG 850 15:0078. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Susan Finger vs. Echo Global Logistics, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11375179. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogovin, Michael)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3464 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4586 JPB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Sonja Self vs. The Kroger Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11375011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Jury Demand for Twelve, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Settlement Demand, #5 Exhibit E - All Pleadings Filed, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements)(Paul, Dorothy)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3463 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4585 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Karen Delgado Torres vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374987. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3462 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4584 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kammeron Martin vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374958. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3461 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4583 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rosario Martinez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374891. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (bc).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3460 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4582 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lerdy Prra vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374813. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (bc).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3459 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4580 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Erica Abbott vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374669. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (bc).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3458 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4579 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ivette Rodriguez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374564. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (bc).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3457 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4578 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS FILED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Natasha Clark vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374475. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert) (bc).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3456 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4576 LMM 840 15:1125. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Belnick, LLC vs. Emeco Industries, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11374406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - slipsheet for Settlement Agreement to be filed under seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9.28.2018 Communication, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sample Take Down Notices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dorvee, Stephen)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3455 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4574 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Katherine Matheson vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11373974. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3454 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4573 WMR 465 05:0551. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint RUIZ vs. MAYORKAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373923. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Summons Mayorkas, #10 Summons Jaddou, #11 Summons Zuchowski, #12 Summons Garland, #13 Summons Erskine, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3453 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4572 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marina Mendoza vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373944. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3452 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4571 SDG RGV 442 29:0626. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Susan Ridling vs. City of Forest Park, GA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373834. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Hayes, Rudjard) CIVIL COVER SHEET IS BLANK(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3451 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4570 CAP RGV 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gary Howard vs. MHT USA LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373747. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3450 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4569 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nicole Koch vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373667. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3449 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4568 MLB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, ZACHORY WILLINGHAM vs. LEONARD MCCULLEY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373594. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Kalfus, Shawn)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3448 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4567 LMM 367 28:1332pl. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kristy Brigham vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373559. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3447 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4566 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ashley Gilley vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373524. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3446 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4565 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Allison Stone vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373480. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3445 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4564 SCJ 440 42:1983cv. SEVEN E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sheila Martin vs. City of South Fulton. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373418. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons South Fulton, #3 Summons South Fulton Police, #4 Summons Clayton Co Sheriff, #5 Summons Officer Hawkins, #6 Summons Officer Hurst, #7 Summons Officer Parrish, (8) Summons Clayton County, #9 Summons John Doe)(Marks, Aaron)SUMMONS FOR JOHN DOE WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS NOT MADE OUT TO A NAMED PERSON. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE CORRECTED SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3444 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4563 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Patrycja Glowacz vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3443 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4562 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jaime Verrill vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11373314. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3442 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4560 AT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Cuhran Packer vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11372677. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit All State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Certificate from State of Georgia, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal)(McKinley, Hall)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3441 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4559 TWT 710 29:0216b. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Samuel Mann vs. Emergent Technologies Group, L.L.C.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11372536. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mann Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - M. Hamby Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - N. Hamby Consent to Join, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Trunnell Consent to Join, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Proposed Summons for Emergent Technologies Group, L.L.C., #7 Summons Proposed Summons for Pearcey)(Forrest, Michael)(smw).
November 4, 2021 Filing 3440 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4558 WMR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Blythenia Weatherspoon vs. Joshua Kenneth Empie. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11372261. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State record (Schneider), #4 Exhibit D - Secretary of State record (Old Republic), #5 Civil Cover Sheet D - Civil Cover Sheet)(Pate, William)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3439 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4555 MLB CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robin Dickinson vs. Credit Control, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371906. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3438 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4554 LMM JSA 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Darrell Hoxie vs. Transworld Systems, Inc., d/b/a TSI. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371902. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3437 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4553 SCJ RGV 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Robin Dickinson vs. Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371898. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3436 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4552 TWT 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Gerald Walton vs. Marten Transport, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371865. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Marten Transport Answer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Pangrac Answer, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - ACE American Answer)(Shires, Kevin)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3435 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-CV-4551 CAP 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Newrez LLC dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing vs. Alliant National Title Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371663. (Schneider, Jeffrey)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3434 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4550 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HEATHER HOCKER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3433 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4548 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JERRICA HARTLINE vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371575. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3432 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4547 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Nicole Reed vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371509. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kauffman, Randal)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3431 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4546 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HEATHER E. HAMILTON vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371508. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3430 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4545 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARIA BRAVO vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11371128. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parafinczuk, Justin)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3429 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4544 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brandae Jenkins vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370798. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3428 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4543 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hanan Souliman vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370694. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Robert)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3427 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4542 WMR 365 28:1332pl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Arthur J. King, Jr. vs. Monsanto Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370553. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashby, Andrew)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3426 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4541 MLB 360 28:2201dj. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, William Hix vs. Acrisure Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370512. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fulton Superior, GA, Case No. 2021-CV-355199, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zachman, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3425 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4540 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stan Kubec vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370439. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Policastro, Eric)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3424 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4535 CAP 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SAI ABHIRAM BETHI vs. ANTONY J. BLINKEN. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11370061. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (I-130 Approval Notice), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (DS-260 Confirmation), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C (DS-260 Interview Notice), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D (December Refusal), #6 Exhibit Exhibit E (Plaintiffs First Response)., #7 Exhibit Exhibit F (August Request for Additional Evidence), #8 Exhibit Exhibit G (Plaintiffs Second Response), #9 Exhibit Exhibit H (Reopen Notice), #10 Exhibit Exhibit I (June 2021 Confirmation), #11 Exhibit Exhibit J (Current Case Status), #12 Exhibit Exhibit K (Email Inquiries to Defendants), #13 Summons Summons AG, #14 Summons Summons AUSA, #15 Summons Summons Batchelder, #16 Summons Summons Blinken, #17 Summons Summons DOS, #18 Summons Summons Jane Doe)(Kuck, Charles)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE DEFENDANT IS A JANE DOE. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY THAT SUMMONS CAN NOT BE ISSUED TO A JANE DOE(smw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3423 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4534 TWT 110 28:2201in. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company vs. James Fowler. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11369991. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Parish Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons - James Fowler, #5 Summons Summons - Robert Parish)(Valz, Frederick)(smw).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3422 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4533 MLB 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Meeka Douglas vs. Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11369893. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A- Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B- Notice of Removal)(Luskin, Robert)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3421 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4532 AT 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Melvin Odir Chirinos-Anariba vs. AEI Painting Contractors, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11369062. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Brandon)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3420 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4531 SDG LTW 445 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PharmD vs. Emory University. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11368879. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bunch, Gary)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3419 Qui Tam CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4530 MLB 376 31:3729. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11368251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Jason)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3418 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4529 JPB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Estrada vs. Panera, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11367692. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pope, Matthew)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3417 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4528 WMR 446 42:12101. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Britton, Tiawan vs. Metro Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11367702. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Defendant Metro Group, LLC, #3 Summons as to Defendant ownsend & Ghegan Properties)(Ehrlich, Craig) (smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3416 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4527 MHC RDC 442 42:1981ra. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JOSEPH DIBENEDETTO vs. AT&T SERVICES, INC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11367570. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Steven)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3415 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4526 LMM CCB 751 29:2601. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rachel Bizzell vs. Clayton County Board of Commissioners. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11367179. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stephens, Jeremy)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THE ATTORNEYS ADDRESS IS MISSING. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3414 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4525 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ALICIA A. BUSH vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11366981. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3413 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-CV-4524 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PAULINE FETTERS vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11366954. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3412 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4523 SCJ RDC 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Claudia Calcelia vs. National Credit Systems, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11366947. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 2, 2021 Filing 3411 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4522 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint BRANDON ALLEN vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11366889. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Jason)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3410 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4520 AT JCF 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Angerine LaTras Smith vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and The Bank of Missouri. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11365495. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3409 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4517 CAP. RESUBMISSION of #3408 Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, KASZIA HOOD vs. TRAVEON DEONTE TAYLOR. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Stone, Matthew). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Stone, Matthew)ALL DOCUMENTS ARE CORRECT IN #3409 (smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3408 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4517 CAP 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, KASZIA HOOD vs. TRAVEON DEONTE TAYLOR. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Stone, Matthew)WRONG LOWER COURT COMPLAINT. CORRECT COMPLAINT FILED IN #3409 (smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3407 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4516 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Liliana Studer vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364897. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oxx, Christopher)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3406 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4515 WMR 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jennifer Lee vs. Brandon Thomas. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364894. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ND Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Legacy Mgt Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit C - Protective Insurance Registration, #5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Demand, #6 Exhibit E - State Ct Notice of Filing Removal, #7 Exhibit F - Answer of Defendants)(Matthews, Zachary)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3405 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4514 MLB 110 28:1332in. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jamie-Denise Tyler vs. Mid-Century Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364785. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Shamis, Andrew) (smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3404 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4513 SDG 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Lavato Smith vs. Vignesh Theetharappan. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11364718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2021-09-29 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2021-08-16 Ltr fr OC to Assurant, #3 Exhibit C - 2021-10-18 Aff of Svc - Theetharappan, #4 Exhibit D - SOS Registration, #5 Exhibit E - 2021-11-01 Notice of Removal with Exh, #6 Exhibit F - Pleadings, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aquino, Luciana)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3403 Qui Tam CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4512 MHC 871 26:7609. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364717. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to File Under Seal (SPMK III VT, LLC)), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Petition to Quash Summons (SPMK III VT, LLC), #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons Acting U.S. Attorney NDGA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luechtefeld, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3402 Qui Tam CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4511 MHC 871 26:7601. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364666. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to File Under Seal (Relevium II, LLC)), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Petition to Quash Summons (Relevium II, LLC), #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons Acting U.S. Attorney NDGA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luechtefeld, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3401 Qui Tam CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4510 MHC 871 26:7609. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364591. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to File Under Seal (Henssler CPAs & Advisers, LLC), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Petition to Quash Summons (Henssler CPAs & Advisers, LLC), #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Acting U.S. Attorney NDGA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luechtefeld, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3400 Qui Tam CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4509 MHC 871 26:7609. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364438. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to File Under Seal (G.W. Henssler CPAs), #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petitioner's Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Petition to Quash Summons (G.W. Henssler CPAs and Advisers, LLC), #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Acting U.S. Attorney NDGA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luechtefeld, Jeffrey)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3399 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4507 LMM 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Maria Rodriguez vs. Mark Allen Cheadle. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364309. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Marten Transport SOS Info, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Marten Transport Services SOS Info, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Marten Transport SOS Information, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff Settlement Demand, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Cheadle Answer to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Marten Logistics Answer, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Marten Services Answer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Marten Transport Answer, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - ACE American Answer)(Shires, Kevin)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3398 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4506 SCJ 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Stokes, K. Scott vs. FRD Mansell Square LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364163. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3397 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4505 AT 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Estrada vs. Old Navy, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11364133. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pope, Matthew)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3396 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4504 TCB 446 42:12101. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Estrada vs. Dillard's, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11363993. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pope, Matthew)(smw).
November 1, 2021 Filing 3395 CIVIL ACTION NO 1:21-CV-4503 TWT WEJ 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Samantha Thomas vs. National Check Resolution, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11363734. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Request for Waiver of Service)(Coalson, Jennifer)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3394 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4497 MLB JKL 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tomika Glass vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11361815. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Dakroub, Jenna)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3393 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4496 LMM 710 29:0201fl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint CADY ARNOLD vs. CAPSHAW MARKETING, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11361353. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, Gary)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3392 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4493-MLB 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, David Speed vs. Marriott International, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11360410. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Affidavit of Process Server filed by Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit A copy of the Notice of Filing Notice of Removal submitted to the Clerk of State Court of Gwinnett County, State of Georgia)(Manfredi, Michael) (smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3391 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4492-MHC-CCB 530 28:2254. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Habeas Corpus, Brawny McCullough vs. Annettia Toby. Filing fee $ 5, receipt number AGANDC-11360212. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief)(Yurachek, Mark)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3390 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4491-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jaquelina Shavers vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. et al.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11360109. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3389 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4489-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sherrin Martinez vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11359716. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3388 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4488-MHC-CMS 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Gerald Philippe Harris vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11359416. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3387 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4483-LMM 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Surafel Assefa vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358888. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Frasier)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3386 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4482-SCJ 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Atlas Ursen vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358884. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Hogan)(Cepar, Drago) (smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3385 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4481-AT 440 42:1983cv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Ingrid Lawrence Smyrna vs. Georgia State Trooper Brandon Byrd. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358660. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marschalk, Barbara)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3384 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4480-TWT 440 42:1983cv. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Madeline Marthone vs. City of Atlanta. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358611. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Atlanta, #3 Summons Noziere, #4 Summons Walker)(Cepar, Drago)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3383 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4479-CAP-JSA 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Monique Irish vs. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358516. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Carter, Marques)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3382 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4478 JPB 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ricardo Haro vs. Rodney Bryant. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358440. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Retraction Demand, #3 Summons (Proposed), #4 Summons (Proposed), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, G.)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3381 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4477 WMR 440 42:1983cv. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jeffrey Ozubko vs. Trent Denninger. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358330. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Denninger, #3 Summons Pearson)(Cepar, Drago) (smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3380 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4476 MLB 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HEATHER TURNER vs. WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358207. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Childers, Charles) SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY HAVE MORE THAN ONE ADDRESS ON IT. NOTIFIED THE ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3379 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4475 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Perry Whaley, individually and on behalf of the estate of Alvester Whaley vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Adam)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3378 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4474 LMM 710 29:0216b. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Walter Brown vs. Steak N Shake Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11358015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Parks, Allan) (smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3377 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4471 SCJ 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Julius G. Sheppard II vs. International Business Machines Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357866. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Waivers of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Justin)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3376 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0087 LMM LTW 890 frcp27. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Petition to Perpetuate Testimony). Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11357842. (Attachments: #1 Brief iso Petition to Perpetuate Testimony of James H. Cantrell, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint JSRE v. GRE, #3 Exhibit B - Answer JSRE v. GRE, #4 Exhibit C - Gee Affidavit re: JHC Depo, #5 Exhibit D - Order on Motion to Stay (4/11/2018), #6 Exhibit E - Order on Status of Stay (1/22/2019), #7 Exhibit F - GRE Expert Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Supplemental Response to Interrogatories)(Branch, Kevin) CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3375 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4470 AT 485 47:0227. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Sarah Mack vs. Confluence Group II, LLC d/b/a Orangetheory Fitness Cumberland. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357794. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shamis, Andrew)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT IS NOT ON THE CORRECT FORM. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS ON THE CORRECT FORM IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3374 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4467 CAP JSA 863 42:0405wc. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Mozell Costner vs. Social Security Administration. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357425. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #3 Summons Attorney General summons, #4 Summons General Council summons, #5 Summons SSA Regional summons, #6 Summons US Attorney summons)(Rogers, David)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3373 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4466 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HEATHER CALLAHAN vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357406. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rheingold, David)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3372 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4465 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Ricky Graves vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357315. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giovannone, Andrea)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3371 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4464 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Soledad Covarrubias vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357258. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hirsch, Andrea)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3370 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4463 MLB LTW 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Debra Leedom vs. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Office Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Summons Attorney General)(Piemonte, George)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3369 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4462 TCB 440 28:1442. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, State of Georgia vs. Kristopher Hutchens. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11357075. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Samuel, Donald)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3368 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4460 ELR LTW 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elaine Meggs vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356924. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3367 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4459 MHC RDC 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dennese Anesia Johnson vs. Equifax Information Services LLC, and First Premier Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356886. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3366 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4458 TWT 110 28:1335. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Metropolitan Life Insurance Company vs. Linda Hamilton. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356822. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Brendan)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3365 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4457 TCB 440 28:1442. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, State of Georgia vs. Daniel Mackenzie. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356530. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Criminal Indictment, #2 Exhibit B - Summary Charge History, #3 Exhibit C - Presidental Threat Protection Act 2000, #4 Exhibit D - Warrant for Robinson, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Certification, #7 Exhibit G - Judgment, #8 Exhibit H - Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Exhibit I - Order granting Summary Judgement, #10 Exhibit J - Letter)(LoRusso, Lawrence)CIVIL CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3364 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4456 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Celia Munoz vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356491. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC)(Kassan, Randi)(smw).
October 28, 2021 Filing 3363 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4452 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shandra Shepard vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356265. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #5 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC, #6 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc.)(Kassan, Randi)(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3362 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4451 CAP CCB 480 15:1692. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rose Thomas vs. Direct Recovery Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Ante=Litem Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bowen, Daniel)(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3361 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4450 SCJ 830 28:1338pt. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Swirlate IP LLC vs. Cooperative Choice LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11356014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,154,961, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 7,567,622, #3 Exhibit C - Prosecution History Excerpt, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Form AO 120 Report, #6 Summons, #7 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Alexander, Cortney)(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3360 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4449 SDG 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Darrell Morgan vs. American Airlines, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11355993. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Errata Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 4)(Bryan, Marquetta) (smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3359 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4448-WMR 360 28:1441pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Paul Lockhart vs. Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11355342. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A- Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. B- Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex. C- Notice of Removal)(Hankins, James)(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3358 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4447-SCJ 710 29:201fl. NO E SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint PAULA MURPHY vs. EAGLE EYE PROTECTION, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11355129. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Dodson, Penn)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT HAS TWO DEFENDANTS ON IT. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3357 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4445-TWT 110 28:1441in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc. vs. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11355042. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Special Appointment of Process Server, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Allred, William)(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3356 2:21-CV-232-RWS-JCF (15:1692/480) FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Nathan Leon Roberts vs. Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11354495. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Covell, Matthew)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO GAINESVILLE 10/27/2021 BY SWB (smw). Modified on 10/28/2021 (ddm).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3355 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4442-CAP 440 28:1441cv NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Senior Design Group, LLC vs. Gwinnett County, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11354474. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Thomas)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3354 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4441 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Pamela K. Walker vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11354118. (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel)(Hutton, Andrew)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 26, 2021 Filing 3353 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4439 SDG 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Seon Mi CHAE vs. Ur Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11353100. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Diaz, Leslie)(smw).
October 26, 2021 Filing 3352 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4437 AT 690 18:0981. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint UNITED STATES OF AMERICA vs. $1,253,353.77 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM CAPITAL ONE ACCOUNT NUMBER ENDING 1542 HELD IN THE NAME OF DETRA LEWIS. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sneed, Sekret)(smw).
October 26, 2021 Filing 3351 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4435 LMM 367 28:1332pl. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Karisma Middleton vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11350755. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coopersurgical, Inc., #3 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #4 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #5 Summons The Cooper Companies, Inc., #6 Summons Teva Women's Health, LLC)(Kassan, Randi) (smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3350 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4431-TWT 350 28:2671. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Reginald Banks vs. United States of America. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11350096. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons US Atty NDGA, #5 Summons US Atty General)(Williamson, John)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3349 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4430-SDG 880 18:1836b. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint FLOORCOVERINGS INTERNATIONAL, LTD. vs. KEITH THOMAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11350008. (Attachments: #1 Summons (AST Floors, LLC ), #2 Summons (Keith Thomas), #3 Summons (Kelly Thomas), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schneider, Jean-Alain)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3348 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4429-JPB-JSA 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Tara Sheray Burch vs. Equifax Information Services LLC and LendingClub Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11349950. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3347 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4428-MHC-JSA 550 42:1983pr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Steven Lee Cargle vs. Reginald Scandrett. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11349854. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, IFP order and process, #2 Civil filing form)(Waymire, Jason)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3346 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4427-LMM-RGV 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Karen Rena Collum vs. Equifax Information Services, LLC and Credit Acceptance Corporation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11349562. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3345 MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NO. 1:21-MI-0086 UNA 890 28:1963. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Miscellaneous (Registration of Judgment from another district), Neutron Depot, LLC vs. Bankrate, Inc.. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-11349307. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rezac, John)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3344 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4425-TWT 690 18:0981. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. Assorted Jewelry. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cynthia)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3343 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4424-LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GRETHEL SARAVIA vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348761. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schumacher, Matthew)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3342 TRO - Qui Tam IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4423 MLB 840 15:1051. THREE HUNDRED TWENTY-EIGHT. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348716. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Summons, #4 Form AO120, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Motion for Ex Parte TRO, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Ex Parte TRO, #8 Declaration of Stella Padovani, #9 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Sladkus, #10 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Ex Parte TRO, #11 Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), #13 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), #14 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #16 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(Hanlon, Carrie)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3341 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4422 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KELLIE L. KISER vs. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348715. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schumacher, Matthew)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3340 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4421 CAP LTW 863 42:0405wc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GREGORY LESLIE vs. KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Motion to File IFP, #3 IFP Application, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons Defendant, #6 Summons US Atty)(Hogan, John)SUMMONS WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DOCKET CLERK UPON IFP APPROVAL(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3339 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4420 AT 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elite Integrated Medical, LLC vs. New World Communications of Atlanta, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348286. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: (Article Published 11-19-2018), #2 Exhibit Ex. B: (Article Published 05-22-2019), #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Interested Person and Corporate Disclosure)(Hornsby, D.)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3338 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4419 SDG 110 28:2201in. FOUR E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY vs. ANTHONY COLLINS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348136. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ORIGINAL COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B - SHERIFF'S SERVICE NOTORIOUS, #3 Exhibit C - UL DOCKET, #4 Exhibit D - DISMISSAL OF R&S, #5 Exhibit E - AMENDED COMPLAINT, #6 Exhibit F - POLICY, #7 Exhibit G - JUNE 9, 2021 ROR, #8 Exhibit H - AUGUST 31, 2021 ROR, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons COLLINS, #11 Summons HOLLOWAY, #12 Summons R & S, #13 Summons SOUTHERN PRIDE)(Mandell, Samantha)(smw).
October 25, 2021 Filing 3337 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4418 WMR AJB 442 42:2000ra. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Rene Cisneros vs. Cutting Edge Stone, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11348079. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Cutting Edge, #3 Summons to Koop)(Billips, Matthew)(smw).
October 23, 2021 Filing 3336 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4417 MLB LTW 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jacquelyn Williams vs. Paschal's Restaurant, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347329. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Paschal's, #3 Summons Concessions)(Bowen, Sandra)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3335 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4416 TCB. SUBMISSION of additional attachments re: #3334 Case Initiating Documents-Complaint,. (Gentes, Ryan)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3334 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4416 TCB 830 28:2201dj. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Advance Medical Designs Inc vs. Corbin Clinical Resources LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347244. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 10,064,081, #2 Exhibit B - Aug 12 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Oct 5 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Dec 7 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Jan 14 2021 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Sep 30 2021 Letter, #7 Summons Proposed, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gentes, Ryan)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3333 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4415 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Annastacia Piprude vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347232. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3332 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4414 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Shannon Overton vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347226. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3331 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4412 MLB 190 28:1332bc. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kambio Telecom, LLC vs. FX1 Mobile, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347157. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons FX1, #4 Summons David Lee, #5 Summons John Lee)(Hopkins, J.)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3330 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4411 LMM 365 28:1446pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Kenya Oliver vs. Wheels Labs Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347096. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - St Ct Case Docs, #3 Exhibit B - Aff. Jonathan Viner, #4 Exhibit C - All other Pleadings, #5 Exhibit D - St Ct. Notice of Removal)(Horowitz, Andrew)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3329 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4410 SCJ AJB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dolvin Thigpen, vs. Revco Solutions, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347153. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3328 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4409 AT LTW 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Albert Kinnebrew vs. Elevate Recoveries, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11347136. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3327 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4408 TWT 625 21:0881. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint United States of America vs. $32,900.00 in United States Currency. No payment received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Norman)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3326 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4407 RWS 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Dillard Powell vs. Ethicon, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11346848. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulte, Richard)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3325 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4406 ELR JKL 442 42:2000sx. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint GEORGINNA LOCKETT vs. CITY OF ATLANTA, GEORGIA. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11346618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Legare, Cheryl)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3324 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4405 SDG 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Javonne Harris vs. Jordan Peak. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11346492. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court of DeKalb County Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Annual Registration (Insituform Technologies, LLC), #3 Exhibit Annual Registration (Aegion Corporation), #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beane, Rebecca)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3323 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4403 JPB 360 28:1332pi. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Zeporah Moore vs. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11346211. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Walmart)(Hines, Matthew)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3322 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4402 WMR 196 28:1332bc. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SMOOTHIE KING FRANCHISES, INC. vs. BEST SMOOTHIE INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11346166. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Best Smoothie, #3 Summons to Victome)(Jett, John)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3321 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4399 ELR 110 28:1446in. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Central Georgia Internal Medicine, LLC vs. Southern Insurance Company of Virginia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11345781. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.), #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal (Superior Ct.), #4 Supplement Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Certificate)(Kendall, Michael)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3320 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4394 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Marta vs. Rawicz. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344908. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kincel, Gerald)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3319 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4393 SDG 110 28:2201in. NINE SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Owners Insurance Company vs. Luke Electric, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344791. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Strickland Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - SolAmerica's 3rd Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Cross-Claim of Safari, #5 Exhibit D - SolAmerica Contract with Luke, #6 Exhibit August 19, 2021 letter, #7 Exhibit F - Luke Policy, #8 Summons Jennifer Strickland, #9 Summons Luke Electric, #10 Summons Safari Energy, #11 Summons Shannon Strickland, #12 Summons SolAmerica Energy, #13 Summons Terrell Solar I, #14 Summons Terrell Solar II, #15 Summons Walter Riles, #16 Summons William Stovall)(Dietrichs, Mark)(smw).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3318 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4392 LMM JKL 442 42:2000rl. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LAURA D. BROOMFIELD vs. COSTAR REALTY INFORMATION,INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344664. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit A. EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit B. EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Martin, Thomas)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3317 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4391 JPB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, DOUGLAS JEFFERSON vs. RANDY SERATT. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344429. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C - Commonwealth Kentucky 2021 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D - State of Georgia Annual Registration, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - Auto-Owners Commercial Auto Policy, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F - Defense Correspondence with Plaintiff)(Kiella, Melody)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3316 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4390 WMR 190 28:1446bc. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Bruce Smith vs. Amanda Goldman. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344358. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Interested Persons)(Schwartz, Jeffrey)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3315 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4389 MLB 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, ANAND NATARAJAN vs. ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344339. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Stone, Matthew)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3314 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4388 ELR 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Thuy Minh Lang vs. Ur M. Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344309. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt for Plaintiffs Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status, #2 Exhibit Receipt for Plaintiffs Form I-824, Application for Action on an Approved Application or Petition, #3 Exhibit Approval Notice of Plaintiffs Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status, #4 Exhibit USCIS Historical Average Processing Times, #5 Exhibit USCIS.gov Case Processing Times for the Texas Service Center, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Echols, Eli)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3313 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4387 MHC 440 42:1983cv. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARCO ANDRE vs. NASIRE ELTAYEB. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons Summons _Carter, #3 Summons Summons _ Eltayeb, #4 Summons Summons _ Walmart)(Foster, Keith)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3312 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4386 LMM 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Cecil Marnell Carey vs. Alejandro Mayorkas. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11344000. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 appearance of counsel, #3 Summons Mayorkas - proposed summons, #4 Summons Jaddou - proposed summons, #5 Summons Miller - proposed summons, #6 Summons Garland - proposed summons, #7 Summons Erskine - proposed summons, #8 Exhibit A I-130 Receipt Notices, #9 Exhibit B USCIS Website Case Status, #10 Exhibit C USCIS Website I-130 Processing Time)(Cohen, Marshall) (smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3311 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4385 TWT 830 35:0271. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC vs. Xorbia Technologies, Inc. d/b/a Big Tickets. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11343876. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Proposed AO 120)(Eader, Granison) (smw)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3310 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4384 CAP 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Thanh N. BUI vs. Ur Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11343654. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Diaz, Leslie)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3309 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4382 ELR 465 08:1329. FIVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint SEBKHI vs. MAYORKAS. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11343305. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Summons Mayorkas, #8 Summons Jaddou, #9 Summons Thompson, #10 Summons Garland, #11 Summons Erskine, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogle, H.)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3308 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4381 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Katherine Lowe vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11342979. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammers, Robert)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3307 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4380 MLB 422 28:0158. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 21-55484-wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 10/20/2021 from Order entered 10/15/2021 by Appellant Mattie James Rosetta James. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 1265911. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc #48, #2 Appealed Order doc #45, #3 Docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3306 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4376 LMM 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Andrew Hansen vs. Pro Roofing & Siding LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11342341. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Pro Roofing)(Van Remmen, Gordon)(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3305 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4373 SCJ CMS 442 42:2000ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Carey Manders vs. Altisource Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11342145. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ume-Nwagbo, Nwabundo)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 21, 2021 Filing 3304 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4372 TWT CCB 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Brianca F. McNeal vs. ARS National Services, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11341838. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3303 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4371 SDG 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Tyler Pagliocchini vs. Balfour Beatty Communities LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11341722. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Cert of Int Persons & Corp Disclosure Stmt, #3 Exhibit Leave of Absence)(Levy, Susan)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3302 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4370 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Olivia Whitehead vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11341610. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Porter, Timothy)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3301 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4369 JPB 360 28:146pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jessica Thomas vs. GWR Georgia Property Owner LLC dba "Great Wolf Lodge". Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11340980. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Affidavits of Service, #2 Exhibit Answers of Defendants, #3 Exhibit Affidavit in Support (Craig Johnson), #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nanninga, Matthew)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3300 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4368 WMR 465 08:1329. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Lyudmila vs. Alejandro. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11340902. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Mayorkas, #3 Summons Summons for Jaddou, #4 Summons Summons for Miller, #5 Exhibit List, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - LPR Card, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B - Birth Certificate for Plaintiff's son, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C - I-130 Receipt Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D - Filed I-130 Form, #10 Exhibit Exhibit E - Naturalization Certificate, #11 Exhibit Exhibit F - Request to Change I-130 to Consular Processing, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G - First USCIS E-Request, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H - Transfer Notice for I-130 Petition, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I - Second USCIS E-Request, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J - Third USCIS E-Request, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K - Ombudsman Request to USCIS, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L - Fourth USCIS E-Request, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M - Senator's Request, #19 Exhibit Exhibit N - Email Response from USCIS, #20 Exhibit Exhibit O - Processing Times Charts for USCIS Service Centers, #21 Exhibit Exhibit P - Historical National Average Processing Times, #22 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Department of State Visa Bulletin for October 2021)(Clements, Jackeline)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE THEY ARE SIGNED AND DATED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3299 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4367 MLB 370 28:1332fr. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint JEGE LLC vs. DARREN INDYKE. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number CGANDC-11340541. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties)(Banks, Jeff)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3298 Civil Action No. 1:21-CV-184 TCB 350 28:1332mv FILED IN WRONG DIVISION. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Jonathan Matthew Muse vs. David Lee Carrick. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11340733. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report, #2 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karega, Che)DOCUMENTS FILED IN INCORRECT DIVISION SHELL CASE. DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO NEWNAN ON 10/20/2021 BY SWB (smw). Modified on 10/21/2021 (jkb).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3297 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4366 MHC 350 28:1446mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Jalen J. Bass vs. Stevens Transport, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BGANDC-11340730. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sykes, Samuel)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3296 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4365 SCJ 440 42:1983cv. TWELVE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Warren Cortiss vs. City of Covington, Georgia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11340099. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Marsha Burgess, NP, #13 Summons Tracy Carstaphen, Psych NP, #14 Summons City of Covington, Georgia, #15 Summons Deputy Dustin Wooten, #16 Summons Marcus Graham, MHP, #17 Summons Lesley Lindsay, LPN, #18 Summons NaphCare, INC., #19 Summons Officer Brandon Davis, #20 Summons Officer Kinsley Nichols, #21 Summons Officer Matthew Holbrook, #22 Summons Stephen Perry, LPN, #23 Summons Leanza Warren, MHC)(Hewitt, Melvin)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3295 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4364 SCJ JKL 480 15:1681. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LISA A. VINGI vs. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11339866. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons EFX, #3 Summons Proposed Summons XPN, #4 Summons Proposed Summons TU)(McClelland, Joseph)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3294 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4363 AT 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint LINH THANH VO vs. UR MENDOZA JADDOU. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11339618. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Principal Plaintiffs passport biographical page, visa, and admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Receipt for Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status for principal Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C: Receipts for Forms I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status for additional Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit D: Approval Notice for Form I-140 Immigrant Petition for Immigrant Work, #5 Exhibit E: Principal Plaintiffs current and previous employment authorization cards;, #6 Exhibit F: USCIS.gov Case Processing Times report for employment-based I-485s;, #7 Exhibit G: November 2021 Visa Bulletin, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons)(Alwan, Zainab) (smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3293 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4362 TWT 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint HUY NGUYEN vs. UR MENDOZA JADDOU. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11339568. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs passport biographical page, visa, and admission stamp, #2 Exhibit B: Receipt for Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status, #3 Exhibit C: Receipt for Plaintiffs Form I-824, Application for Action on an Approved Application or Petition, #4 Exhibit D: Approval Notice for Form I-140 Immigrant Petition for Immigrant Work, #5 Exhibit E: Approval Notice of Plaintiffs Form I-485, Application for Adjustment of Status, #6 Exhibit F: USCIS.gov Case Processing Times, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons)(Alwan, Zainab)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3292 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4361 CAP 710 29:0216b. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elvis Belem vs. 3AC Restaurant, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338850. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Defendant 3AC Restaurant LLC)(Hannon, Patrick)(smw).
October 20, 2021 Filing 3291 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4360 SDG 350 28:1332mv. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ELIZABETH SWANSON vs. ASTRAL CARRIER, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338643. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovell, John)SUMMONS WILL NOT BE ISSUED BECAUSE IT HAS MORE THAN ONE ADDRESS. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO RESUBMIT THE SUMMONS IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3290 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4357 MLB CMS 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Isaac McFadgen vs. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338181. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3289 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4356 MHC JCF 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Joseph Faulkner vs. Stenger & Stenger, P.C.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338175. (Berry, Matthew)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3288 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4355 LMM JSA 480 15:1681. TWO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Kerrie Power vs. Equifax Information Services LLC. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338077. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Equifax Information Services LLC, #3 Summons to Midland Mortgage)(Sand, Jeffrey)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3287 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4354 TWT 465 08:1329. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Hien Thu TRAN vs. Ur Jaddou. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11338060. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Diaz, Leslie)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3286 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4352 CAP 360 28:1446pi. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Noemi Rentas vs. Denny's. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11337388. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Answer)(DeCusati, Albert)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3285 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4351 SDG 791 29:1132. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michelle Felton vs. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11337049. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Def)(Warncke, Jeffrey)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3284 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4345 ELR RDC 863 42:0405ww. THREE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Michael Lee Rice vs. Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11335940. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comerford, Ida)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3283 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4344 MHC 350 28:1332mv. THREE E-SUMMON ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Alice F. Bennett vs. Alexander Price. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11335795. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Alexander Price, #3 Summons Defendant Transam Trucking, Inc., #4 Summons Defendant Carolina Casualty Insurance Company)(McAleer, Charles)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3282 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4343 LMM AJB 480 15:1681. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Elizabeth Anne Youngblood vs. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11335840. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 3281 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4342 SCJ LTW 480 15:1692. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint ANDREA A. REED vs. I.Q. DATA INTERNATIONAL, INC.,. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11335746. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Matthew)(smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3280 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4341 TWT 896 09:0009. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint AU Card, LLC vs. Megan Burton. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11334988. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eileen H. Rumfelt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)(smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3279 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4340 AT JSA 442 42:2000ra. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint MARQUISE FOSTER vs. SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11334911. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit RTS)(Mixon, J.)CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3278 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4339 SDG 440 42:1983cv. ONE E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint KHADIJAH VIGIL vs. OFFICER DAHLQUIST. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11334812. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Foster, Keith) (smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3277 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4338 LMM 367 28:1332pl. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Complaint Erin McCarthy vs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, INC.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11334844. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koo, Min)(smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3276 CIVIL ACTION NO. 1:21-CV-4337 WMR 290 28:1446dj. NO E-SUMMONS ISSUED. Case Initiating Documents-Notice of Removal, Stuart W. Terrell vs. Bruce Henry Bonafiglia. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AGANDC-11334781. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Summons, Discovery Requests, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Docket, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Shelfer, Jennifer)0CIVIL COVER SHEET NOT FILED. NOTIFIED ATTORNEY TO FILE THE DOCUMENT IN THE OPEN CASE(smw).
October 18, 2021 Filing 3275