O'Neill v. NYU Langone Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Maura O'Neill
Defendant: NYU Langone Medical Center, New York-Presbyterian Queens, Lenox Hill Hospital, Grady Health System, Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Northside Hospital Forsyth and College Park Police Department
Case Number: 1:2022cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 127 USCA Order GRANTING reinstatement re: #117 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maura O'Neill. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-11212-A. (pjm)
June 16, 2023 Filing 126 NOTICE of Change of Address for Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
May 18, 2023 Filing 125 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), #117 Notice of Appeal, is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Maura O'Neill failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-11212-A. (pjm)
May 11, 2023 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Emery Tompkins on behalf of Grady Health System (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Jeffrey E. Tompkins)(Tompkins, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2023 Submission of #114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
April 20, 2023 Submission of #113 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
April 19, 2023 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint filed by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
April 17, 2023 Filing 122 USCA Acknowledgment of #117 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maura O'Neill. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 23-11212-A (pjm)
April 14, 2023 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint filed by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2023 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
April 13, 2023 Filing 119 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #117 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
April 13, 2023 Filing 118 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA- 11th Circuit re: #117 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maura O'Neill. (pjm)
April 13, 2023 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #112 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Set Aside Default, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoena, Order on Motion for Clarification, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion to Strike, by Maura O'Neill. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 100003000. (pjm)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave of Absence by Jeffrey Tompkins. IT IS ORDERED that this Court will excuse Mr. Tompkins from any need to make a personal appearance before the Court for the above-stated time period. However, counsel is not relieved from the filing deadlines for any briefs, motions, or other pleadings. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/12/2023. (ane)
April 13, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #116 Order. (ane)
April 10, 2023 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 22-26, 2023; May 30-June 8, 2023; August 31-September 6, 2023; November 15-21, 2023; and November 27-29, 2023 by Jeffrey Emery Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tompkins, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/11/2023 to add motion (ane).
March 31, 2023 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by Maura O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rsg)
March 14, 2023 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (ane)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: College Park Police Department is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4(m). New York-Presbyterian's #100 motion to strike the amended complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE the #69 amended complaint from the record. Beth Israel's #55 motion to set aside the Clerks entry of default is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to SET ASIDE the default that was entered as to Beth Israel on July 20, 2022, and to file Beth Israels motion to dismiss (Doc. 55-3) as of the date of this order. Plaintiff shall have until April 18, 2023, to file any response to the motion to dismiss and Beth Israel shall have until April 25, 2023, to file any reply. Beth Israel's motion for clarification is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #79 motion for an evidentiary hearing and issuance of a subpoena to process server Jason Garmon is DENIED. Northside's #51 motion to set aside the Clerks entry of default is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to SET ASIDE the default that was entered as to Northside on July 20, 2022. NYU Langone and New York-Presbyterian's #16 , #23 motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction are GRANTED. NYU Langone and New York- Presbyterian are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Their motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim are DENIED AS MOOT. NYU Langone's motion for a prescreening requirement is DENIED. Grady's #24 motion to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim is GRANTED. The Court must afford Plaintiff an opportunity to amend her complaint. Any amended complaint must be filed by April 4, 2023, and it must comply with the instructions set forth in this order. Northside's #50 motion to dismiss for insufficient service is GRANTED. The claims against Northside are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Northside's motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim is DENIED. Plaintiff's #58 motion to compel is DENIED AS PREMATURE. Plaintiff's #86 , #87 , #103 , motions for permanent injunction and motions for an evidentiary hearing are DENIED. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 3/14/2023. (ane)
March 14, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #112 Order. (ane)
December 2, 2022 Filing 111 Memorandum of Law in Further Support of #103 Motion to Enjoin filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
November 30, 2022 Filing 110 RESPONSE re #103 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
November 21, 2022 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition to #100 MOTION to Strike The Amended Complaint filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg) Modified on 11/23/2022 (sap).
November 21, 2022 Submission of #100 MOTION to Strike The Amended Complaint (No response filed), and #103 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and for Hearing to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
November 17, 2022 Filing 108 REPLY in Support re #87 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin and Hearing Request filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg) Modified on 11/21/2022 (sap).
November 17, 2022 Filing 107 REPLY in Support re #86 and #103 MOTIONS for Permanent Injunction and for Hearing filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg) Modified on 11/21/2022 (sap).
November 17, 2022 Submission of #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #23 MOTION to Dismiss, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #79 MOTION for Hearing, #83 MOTION for Clarification (No response filed), #86 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, and #87 MOTION for Permanent Injunction to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
November 14, 2022 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 105 RESPONSE re #103 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Boorman, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Filing 104 REPLY BRIEF of #79 MOTION for Hearing and Subpoena filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane) Modified on 11/17/2022 (sap).
November 1, 2022 Filing 102 REPLY BRIEF re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2022 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
November 1, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION to Strike The Amended Complaint by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
November 1, 2022 Filing 99 REPLY BRIEF re #50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Sutherland, Teddy)
November 1, 2022 Filing 98 REPLY BRIEF re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Boorman, Michael)
October 31, 2022 Filing 103 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Hearing Request by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
October 25, 2022 Filing 97 RESPONSE re #87 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Scrudder, Henry)
October 25, 2022 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing, #87 MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2022 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Hearing re #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default , #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
October 20, 2022 Filing 94 RESPONSE re #79 MOTION for Hearing re #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default , #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by Maura O'Neill. (Sutherland, Teddy) Modified on 10/20/2022 to correct filing relationship (tas).
October 20, 2022 Submission of #58 MOTION to Compel to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
October 18, 2022 Filing 93 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to New York Presbyterian Hospital Queen's #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
October 18, 2022 Filing 92 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to NYU Langone Hospitals' #16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
October 18, 2022 Filing 91 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS from Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
October 18, 2022 Filing 90 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #50 MOTION TO DISMISS From Northside Hospital, Inc. filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
October 13, 2022 Filing 89 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #88 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Lenox Hill Hospital pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ane)
October 13, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #89 Clerks Entry of Dismissal. (ane)
October 12, 2022 Submission of #88 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (ane)
October 11, 2022 Filing 88 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Lenox Hill Hospital pursuant to FRCP 41.a.1.i by Maura O'Neill (ane)
October 11, 2022 Filing 87 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin and Hearing Request by Maura O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ane)
October 11, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION for Permanent Injunction against Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation and all Northside Hospital, Inc. and MOTION for Hearing by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
October 10, 2022 Filing 85 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 28-30, 2022, December 22-23, 2022, January 3-6 and January 9-10, 2023, March 6-15, 2023, April 20-25, 2023, by Tiffany Carter Sellers. (Sellers, Tiffany)
October 10, 2022 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
October 7, 2022 Filing 83 MOTION for Clarification by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff will have until October 18, 2022 to submit opposing papers to the Motions to Dismiss filed by Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/7/2022. (ane)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff will have until October 18, 2022 to submit opposing papers to the Motions to Dismiss filed by Northside Hospital, Inc. and New York-Presbyterian Queens. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/7/2022. (ane)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff will have until October 18, 2022 to submit opposing papers to the Motions to Dismiss filed by NYU Langone Hospitals. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/7/2022. (ane)
October 7, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #80 Order, #81 Order, #82 Order. (ane)
October 6, 2022 Filing 79 MOTION for Hearing re #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default , #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena, by Maura O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason Garmon, #2 Exhibit B - Subpoena)(rsg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response re: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss and #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response re: #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #72 NOTICE of Intent to Reply in Support of 55 MOTION to Set Aside Default as Necessary, filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
September 26, 2022 Filing 74 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
September 26, 2022 Filing 73 Memorandum of Law in Support of #58 MOTION to Compel filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
September 21, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Intent to Reply in Support of #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default as Necessary by Mount Sinai Beth Israel (Atkinson, Austin) Modified on text on 9/22/2022 (ane).
September 20, 2022 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
September 13, 2022 Submission of #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to Northside Hospital Forsyth, and #55 MOTION to Set Aside Default as to Mount Sinai Beth Israel to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
September 12, 2022 Filing 70 REPLY BRIEF re #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Sutherland, Teddy)
September 12, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #67 Order. (ane)
September 9, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed First Amended Complaint by Maura O'Neill (ane)
September 9, 2022 Filing 68 STIPULATION Regarding Service by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part O'Neill's #60 Motion for Extension of Time. O'Neill shall have until October 11, 2022, to file her responses to the pending motions to dismiss. Her request to extend the time to file an amended complaint as a matter of course under Rule 15 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/9/2022. (ane)
September 8, 2022 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Persons And Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin) Modified text on 9/13/2022 (ane).
September 8, 2022 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Atkinson, Austin)
September 8, 2022 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2022 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Sutherland, Teddy)
August 31, 2022 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Mount Sinai Beth Israel (Atkinson, Austin)
August 31, 2022 Filing 61 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Compel filed by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Harris, Erika)
August 29, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION to Extend Time by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
August 29, 2022 Filing 59 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #51 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
August 25, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Compel by Maura O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Affidavit In Support)(ane)
August 25, 2022 Filing 57 Stipulation Regarding Service by Maura O'Neill. (ane)
August 25, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Address for Maura O'Neill (ane)
August 19, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Deborah Korzenik, #3 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support)(Atkinson, Austin)
August 10, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Kathryn Welf on behalf of Northside Hospital Forsyth (Welf, Sophia)
August 10, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Teddy Lee Sutherland on behalf of Northside Hospital Forsyth (Sutherland, Teddy)
August 9, 2022 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northside Hospital Forsyth identifying Corporate Parent Northside Health Services, Inc. for Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Scrudder, Henry)
August 9, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant Northside Hospital, Inc.'s Memo in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Scrudder, Henry) Modified on 8/10/2022 to edit motion relief. (aaq).
August 9, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Northside Hospital Forsyth. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Scrudder, Henry)
August 5, 2022 Filing 49 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked as: RTS No Mail Receptacle. Mail sent to Maura O' Neill re #42 Order on Motions. (rsg)
August 4, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Aaron Atkinson on behalf of Mount Sinai Beth Israel (Atkinson, Austin)
August 4, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Winks on behalf of Mount Sinai Beth Israel (Winks, Tiffany)
July 26, 2022 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Persons by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2022 Filing 45 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Aug 24-29, 2022 Sept. 30, 2022, Oct. 3-4, 2022, Nov. 9-15 and 28-29, 2022, Dec. 21-23, 2022, by Jeffrey Emery Tompkins. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2022 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by NYU Langone Medical Center identifying Other Affiliate NYU Langone Health System for NYU Langone Medical Center. (Boorman, Michael)
July 21, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE Of Filing Stipulation Regarding Service by Email by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER summarizing the rulings in this order as follows: O'Neill's motion for an extension of time to respond to the pending motions to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. (Doc. #26 .) O'Neill SHALL HAVE until August 8, 2022, to file her responses to the motions to dismiss (Doc. 16, 20, 23, 24). The hospital defendants'motion to stay certain case deadlines pending this Court's ruling on their motions to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. (Doc. #36 .) The requirements for the parties to conduct the Rule 26(f) early planning conference, file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and exchange initial disclosures are STAYED pending the Court's ruling on the pending motions to dismiss. The deadline for the parties to complete the Rule 26(f) early planning conference is STAYED until 16 days after the Court issues its ruling on the pending motions to dismiss. The deadline for the parties to serve their initial disclosures and file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan is STAYED until 30 days after the Court issues its ruling on the pending motions to dismiss. Defendants Grady Health System and NYU Langone Medical Center are ORDERED to file their certificates of interested persons and corporate disclosure statements within 7 days of the entry date of this order. O'Neill's motion for the Clerk's entry of default is GRANTED IN PART. (Doc. #38 .) The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter default as to Mount Sinai Beth Israel and Northside Hospital Forsyth. The motion for entry of default as to NYU Langone Medical Center is DENIED. O'Neill is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by August 8, 2022, why her claims against College Park Police Department should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 07/20/2022. (rsg)
July 20, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #42 Order on Motions, Clerks Entry of Default. (rsg)
July 20, 2022 Clerks Entry of Default as to Mount Sinai Beth Israel, Northside Hospital Forsyth. (rsg)
July 5, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
July 5, 2022 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
July 5, 2022 Submission of #36 MOTION to Stay Proceedings to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
June 22, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE re #38 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 05.06.22 service)(Harris, Erika)
June 10, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Maura O'Neill. (rsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2022: #1 Font Compliance Certification) (adg).
June 9, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NYU Langone Medical Center.(Harris, Erika)
June 9, 2022 Submission of #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposing Papers to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
June 7, 2022 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Brief In Support by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Erika)
June 6, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Maura O'Neill. (rsg)
May 17, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Grady Health System. (Tompkins, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Boorman, Michael)
May 16, 2022 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Persons by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
May 16, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE re #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Stone, Parks)
May 12, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #25 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. (sap)
May 6, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NYU Langone Medical Center.(Boorman, Michael)
May 6, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Janae Harris on behalf of NYU Langone Medical Center (Harris, Erika)
May 5, 2022 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Maura O'Neill (cavc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Maura O'Neill (cavc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposing Papers re #18 , #20 , #23 , #24 and Amended Complaint by Maura O'Neill. (cavc)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/4/2022. (sap)
April 25, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Grady Health System. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation's Motion to Dismiss)(Tompkins, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by New York-Presbyterian Queens. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of its Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Declaration In Support of Motion To Dismiss(Executed Affidavit of Parks K. Stone with Declaration of Vanessa M. Murphy, Esq.))(Stone, Parks)
April 22, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brantley Cole Rowlen on behalf of Lenox Hill Hospital (Rowlen, Brantley)
April 21, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Parker on behalf of Lenox Hill Hospital (Parker, Steven)
April 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lenox Hill Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mark A Gloade)(Parker, Steven) Modified on 4/22/2022 to edit docket text (cavc).
April 21, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenox Hill Hospital.(Parker, Steven)
April 21, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenox Hill Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mark A Gloade, #2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss)(Parker, Steven)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenox Hill Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mark A Gloade)(Parker, Steven)
April 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for Prefiling Screening Requirement with Brief In Support by NYU Langone Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Boorman, Michael) Modified on 4/21/2022 to edit docket text (cavc).
April 18, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re Case Reassigned. (abm)
April 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. Judge J. P. Boulee no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-00011-SEG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. Northside Hospital Forsyth served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. Grady Health System served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. Mount Sinai Beth Israel served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. NYU Langone Medical Center served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. Lenox Hill Hospital served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Maura O'Neill. New York-Presbyterian Queens served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (abm)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to NYU Langone Medical Center. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lenox Hill Hospital. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mount Sinai Beth Israel. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Northside Hospital Forsyth. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New York-Presbyterian Queens. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Grady Health System. (lwb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to College Park Police Department. (lwb)
February 15, 2022 NOTICE: Effective immediately, all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Boulee should be directed to 404-215-1410 or CRD_JPB@gand.uscourts.gov. (lwb)
February 15, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re Notice (Other). (lwb)
January 27, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maura O'Neill re #2 Standing Order. (cmd)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION FOR CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE J. P. BOULEE. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/26/2022. (cmd)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Maura O'Neill. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100135268) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Font Compliance Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill v. NYU Langone Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Langone Medical Center
Represented By: Erika Janae Harris
Represented By: Michael R. Boorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Queens
Represented By: Parks Kalervo Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenox Hill Hospital
Represented By: Brantley Cole Rowlen
Represented By: Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Health System
Represented By: Jeffrey Emery Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Represented By: Austin Aaron Atkinson
Represented By: Tiffany R. Winks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Hospital Forsyth
Represented By: Henry E. Scrudder, Jr.
Represented By: Sophia Kathryn Welf
Represented By: Teddy Lee Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Park Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?