Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC et al v. Fuss
Plaintiff: Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC, Fredrick Bensch, Tilray, Inc. and Aphria Inc.
Defendant: Ray Scott Fuss
Case Number: 1:2022cv00024
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 1/14/2022, before Judge Amy Totenberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (srw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulated Protective Order signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/3/2022. (abm) Modified on 2/7/2022 to edit docket text (abm).
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent First Stipulated Protective Order. (Norris, Blaine)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, Standing Order (Radcliff, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, Standing Order (Jones, Todd)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order, Standing Order (Hyland, Amanda)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aphria Inc., Fredrick Bensch, Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC, Tilray, Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 7 - March 11, 2022, by Amanda Hyland. (Hyland, Amanda)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/19/2022. (vs)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2022. See transcript. Minute Order to follow. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch) (bgt)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only: As stated at the January 14, 2022 teleconference, the deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint in this matter is STAYED pending the resolution of the forthcoming motion to remand in a separate matter, Fuss v. Bensch et al., 1-22-cv-64. The Court shall endeavor to resolve the motion to remand in that matter by May 13, 2022. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/14/22. (hfm)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC, Tilray, Inc., Aphria Inc., Fredrick Bensch. Ray Scott Fuss waiver mailed on 1/5/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Hyland, Amanda)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ray Scott Fuss. (eop)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2022: #1 CORRECT PDF - Main Document) (eop). Modified on 1/4/2022 (eop).
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC, Tilray, Inc., Aphria Inc. and Fredrick Bensch. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11493820) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -1/27/96 $500 Invoice for Artwork, #2 Exhibit -B - 12/27/20 Email from Fuss's counsel, #3 Exhibit -C -1/19/21 Letter from Fuss's counsel, #4 Exhibit -D - 5/18/21 Letter from Fuss's counsel, #5 Exhibit -E -Formal Notice to Cease and Desist, #6 Exhibit -F -9/15/21 Letter from Fuss's counsel, #7 Exhibit -G - Fulton Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 4, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Register of Copyrights re #2 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC et al v. Fuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweetwater Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Brent M. Radcliff
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Bensch
Represented By: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Brent M. Radcliff
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilray, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Brent M. Radcliff
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aphria Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Brent M. Radcliff
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Scott Fuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?