Grant et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Elroy Tolbert, Theron Brown, Triana Arnold James, Eunice Sykes, Elbert Solomon and Dexter Wimbish
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey and Matthew Mashburn
Case Number: 1:2022cv00122
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 10301 Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying the #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Having determined that a preliminary injunction should not issue, the Court cautions that this is an interim, non-final ruling that should not be viewed as an indication of how the Court will ultimately rule on the merits at trial. Under the specific circumstances of this case, the Court finds that proceeding with the Enacted Maps for the 2022 election cycle is the right decision. But it is a difficult decision. And it is a decision the Court did not make lightly. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/28/2022. (ddm)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for all specific deadlines. The parties are encouraged to abide by their previously expressed commitments to coordinate with the parties in all of the redistricting cases (currently pending in the Northern District of Georgia) in terms of discovery, so as to limit redundancies and diminish discovery burdens. Except as modified herein, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, shall govern any remaining deadlines. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/28/2022. (ddm)
February 25, 2022 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. Discovery ends on 7/25/2022.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 18, 2022 Filing 82 Proposed Findings of Fact by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam)
February 18, 2022 Filing 81 Proposed Findings of Fact by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Arkansas State Conf. of the NAACP v. Arkansas Board of Apportionment)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Injunction Proceedings held on 2/14/2022 - P.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 17, 2022 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/11/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 17, 2022 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/10/2022, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript)
February 17, 2022 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/9/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 17, 2022 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/8/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 17, 2022 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/7/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 14, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 10. 2020, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 9, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 11, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 7, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 15, 2022 Filing 67 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 24-25, 2022, April 4-8, 2022, May 23-27, 2022, and July 5-8, 2022, by Joyce Gist Lewis. (Lewis, Joyce)
February 14, 2022 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing concluded on 2/14/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Alpha exhibit A53 admitted. John Morgan recalled,testified via Zoom. Defendants exhibits 43-47 admitted. Pendergrass/Grant exhibits 27-37, 41-54, 59, 61, 63-67 admitted. Alpha exhibits 50 and 51 admitted. Closing arguments heard. The matter was taken under advisement by the Court with ruling to follow. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COORDINATED ORDER directing the parties to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2022. Parties are further ORDERED to file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to CM/ECF and e-mail a word copy the Court's Courtroom Deputy (see order for contact information). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/14/2022. (ddm)
February 11, 2022 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing continued on 2/11/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' witness Gina Wright sworn and testified. Defendants' exhibits 1-37, 38, 41 admitted.Pendergrass/Grant exhibits 69 and 70 admitted. Defendants exhibit 41 admitted. Defendants witness John Morgan sworn and testified. Defendants' witness JohnAlford sworn and testified via Zoom. Defendants' exhibit 42 admitted Alpha exhibit 207.6 admitted. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the #63 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' answers to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before February 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/11/2022. (ddm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DOCKET ORDER granting #62 Unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/11/2022. (pdw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing continued on 2/10/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Pendergrass/Grant witness sworn and testified via Zoom. Pendergrass/Grant witness Dr. Maxwell Palmer sworn and testified. Alpha witness Lisa Handley sworn and testified.Alpha exhibit A52 admitted. Pendergrass/Grant witness Jason Carter sworn and testified. Alpha witness Adrienne Jones sworn and testified. Alpha exhibit A5 admitted. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2012 Districting Maps and Data, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2014 Districting Maps and Data, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2015 Districting Maps and Data)(Sparks, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing continued on 2/9/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' witness Lynn Bailey sworn and testified. Defendants' exhibits 38 and 7 admitted. Pendergrass/Grant witnesses Richard Barron and Nancy Boren sworn and testified. Pendergrass/Grant exhibit 68 admitted. Alpha Plaintiffs' witness Bishop Jackson sworn and testified. Blakeman Esselstyn recalled by Pendergrass/Grant Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 9, 2022 Filing 61 Declaration of Jonathan P. Hawley in Support of #60 Response filed by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - B. Esselstyn 2nd Supplemental Expert Report)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 2/9/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 9, 2022 Filing 60 RESPONSE re #59 Order, filed by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam)
February 8, 2022 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing continued 2/8/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court heard argument regarding SCOTUS ruling issued 2/7/2022 in Alabama cases. Court adjourned for three hours to allow counsel time to prepare for presentation of evidence. Defendants witness Mark Barnes sworn and testified. Pendergrass/Grant witness Blakeman Esselstyn sworn and testified. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 7, 2022 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2022 re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction hearing began. Opening statements heard. Pendergrass/Grant plaintiffs' exhibits 1-26, 38-40,53, 55-58, 60, 62, 66 admitted. Alpha plaintiffs' exhibits A1-A18, A22, A37, A46-A49 admitted. Pendergrass/Grant witness Dr. William Cooper sworn and testified. Dr. William Cooper recalled by Alpha plaintiffs. Alpha plaintiffs' exhibit 47 admitted. (Court Reporter V. Zbrowski & M. Brock)(pdw)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - In light of the Supreme Court's decision this Court hereby ORDERS the parties to arrive to court tomorrow morning prepared to discuss whether this Court should continue to hold the current hearing regarding Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary injunctions. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/7/2022. (pdw)
February 7, 2022 Filing 58 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
February 4, 2022 Filing 56 STIPULATION re #44 Order, Joint Stipulated Facts for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam)
February 4, 2022 Filing 55 Expert Report of Gina Wright by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 54 Expert Report of Lynn Bailey by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 53 Expert Report of John R. Alford, Ph.D. by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 COURT'S NOTICE REGARDING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED TO COMMENCE ON FEBRUARY 7, 2022 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 1907: As part of the Court's COVID-19 safety protocols, a maximum of 24 non-party observers will be permitted to attend. A maximum of 7 members of press will be permitted to sit in the jury box; however, entrance to and egress from the jury box will be limited to prior to start of court and during breaks only. COURTROOM 2105 WILL BE USED FOR OVERFLOW SEATING, WITH A LIVE AUDIO STREAM PROVIDED.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 COORDINATED ORDER regarding Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' witnesses and exhibits #48 . The Court declines to rule on these objections prior to the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court instructs Defendants to raise their objections to a specific exhibit when Plaintiffs move to introduce the exhibit into evidence. At that time, the Court will rule on the Defendants' objection to that particular exhibit. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER directing Defendants to file on the docket expert reports by Lynn Bailey, Gina Wright, and Dr. John Alford by no later than 12:00 p.m. (EST) on Friday, February 4,2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 2/04/2022 - 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM: Graham W. White, Michael B. Jones, Kevin J. Hamilton, Abha Khanna Adam M. Sparks, Joyce Gist Lewis, and Jonathan. P. Hawley, and their accompanying staff, Patricia Marino, Benjamin Winstead and Patina Clarke. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Submission of #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER AMENDMENT to #50 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom: the parties will NOT be permitted to bring additional tables into the Courtroom. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)(pdw)
February 2, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Lewis, Joyce) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 2, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Witnesses and Exhibits by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger re #44 Order, (Tyson, Bryan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #39 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief Joined by Georgia in Merrill v. Milligan)(Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 2/1/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
January 31, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger re #44 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31, #26 Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit 33, #28 Exhibit 34, #29 Exhibit 35, #30 Exhibit 36, #31 Exhibit 37)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 31, 2022 Filing 45 Witness List by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Lewis, Joyce)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 COORDINATED ORDER issued for purposes of perfecting the record as to the February 7-14, 2022 coordinated in-person hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for specifics on pre-hearing deadlines, stipulations, hearing schedule and covid-19 mitigation protocols. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants' request for certification of this ruling for immediate appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is denied. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Graham W. White. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/1022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Osher. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/ 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 26, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE Of Filing PARTIES CONSOLIDATED PRESENTATION SCHEDULE by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish re #30 Order,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,, Set Submission Deadline,,,,,, (Lewis, Joyce)
January 25, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE Of Filing of Supplemental Authority by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Caster v. Merrill Order (01/24/22))(Sparks, Adam)
January 21, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Strickland, Frank)
January 20, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 36 Second Declaration of Jonathan P. Hawley in Support of #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Suppl. Expert Report of Blakeman B. Esselstyn, #2 Exhibit 2 - Suppl. Expert Report of Dr. Orville Vernon Burton)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 1/21/2022 to edit docket entry (ddm).
January 20, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam)
January 20, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Paradise, Loree Anne)
January 20, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Jacoutot, Bryan)
January 20, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel C. Osher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11515237).. Attorney Daniel C Osher added appearing on behalf of Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish (nmb)
January 20, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Graham W. White Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11515268).. Attorney Graham W. White added appearing on behalf of Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish (nmb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file an additional five pages, for a total of 20 pages, in their forthcoming reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/19/2022. (rsg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 COORDINATED ORDER advising that for any and every case in which the Court does not grant the motion to dismiss and does not thereafter grant a request for interlocutory appeal or a request to stay, the Court will hold a coordinated, in-person preliminary injunction hearing regarding the pending motions for preliminary injunction in those cases. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties collectively will have up to six (6) days to present evidence and arguments. The presenting parties may choose not to use all six days. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, it will take place in the Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse (courtroom to be determined) and begin at 9:00 A.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2022. If the parties opt to use all six days, the hearing will take place each following business day from 9:00 A.M. to 5:00 P.M. until the overall conclusion of the hearing at 5:00 P.M. on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2022. The parties shall file with the Court a consolidated presentation schedule by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 26, 2022. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties in cases with still-pending motions for preliminary injunction shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2022. The proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be specific to each case and motion. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/19/2022. (ddm)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abha Khanna. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Hawley. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina A. Ford. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of John Morgan, #2 Exhibit B - Dec. of Michael Barnes)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam)
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (McGowan, Charlene)
January 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Sara Tindall Ghazal, Anh Le, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger (Tyson, Bryan)
January 13, 2022 Filing 20 Declaration of Jonathan P. Hawley in Support of #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Expert Report of Blakeman B. Esselstyn, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Dr. Maxwell Palmer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Expert Report of Dr. Orville Vernon Burton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Dr. Loren Collingwood, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Annie Lois Grant, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Quentin T. Howell, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Elroy Tolbert, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Theron Brown, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Triana Arnold James, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Eunice Sykes, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Elbert Solomon, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Dexter Wimbish, #13 Exhibit 13 - GPB Article (11/09/21), #14 Exhibit 14 - Athens Banner-Herald Article (11/15/21), #15 Exhibit 15 - GPB Article (11/10/21), #16 Exhibit 16 - GPB Article (11/12/21), #17 Exhibit 17 - Albany Herald Article (11/09/21), #18 Exhibit 18 - U.S. News & World Report (11/09/21), #19 Exhibit 19 - Albany Herald Article (11/11/21), #20 Exhibit 20 - AJC Article (12/30/21), #21 Exhibit 21 - 2021 Committee Guidelines, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2021-2022 Guidelines House LCRC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Dunne Letter (03/20/92), #24 Exhibit 24 - Reynolds Letter (02/11/82), #25 Exhibit 25 - AJC Article (09/30/16), #26 Exhibit 26 - CNN Article (05/02/17), #27 Exhibit 27 - Appen Media Group Article (03/15/17), #28 Exhibit 28 - AJC Article (04/15/17), #29 Exhibit 29 - AJC Article (01/16/17), #30 Exhibit 30 - Washington Post Article (11/05/18), #31 Exhibit 31 - Slate Article (11/06/2018), #32 Exhibit 32 - USA Today Article (05/10/2018), #33 Exhibit 33 - Salon Article (01/04/21), #34 Exhibit 34 - ABC News Article (07/28/20), #35 Exhibit 35 - CNN Article (10/17/20), #36 Exhibit 36 - AJC Article (10/26/21), #37 Exhibit 37 - 2021-2022 GLBC Members Webpage, #38 Exhibit 38 - Governing Article (01/13/21), #39 Exhibit 39 - NCSL Article (12/01/20), #40 Exhibit 40 - NGA - Former GA Governors, #41 Exhibit 41 - AJC Article (12/01/21), #42 Exhibit 42 - U.S. Senate Webpage - Georgia Senators, #43 Exhibit 43 - WUGA Article (11/19/2021), #44 Exhibit 44 - House Study Committee on Maternal Mortality Final Report, #45 Exhibit 45 - AJC Article (12/01/21), #46 Exhibit 46 - 2022 State Elections & Voter Registration Calendar, #47 Exhibit 1B - Attachments to Expert Report of Blakeman B. Esselstyn)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 1/13/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
January 13, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Sparks, Adam)
January 13, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Graham W. White Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11515268).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel C. Osher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11515237).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11515172).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Christina A. Ford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511099). Attorney Christina Ashley Ford added appearing on behalf of Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish (cdg)
January 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511098). Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton added appearing on behalf of Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish (cdg)
January 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan P. Hawley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511100). Attorney Jonathan Patrick Hawley added appearing on behalf of Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish (cdg)
January 12, 2022 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg: Rule 16 conference held via Zoom in Alpha Phi Alpha v. Raffensperger, 1:21-cv-5337-SCJ; Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia, 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Pendergrass v. Raffensperger, 1:21-CV-5339-SCJ; Common Cause et al v. Raffensperger, 1:22-cv-00090-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Grant v. Raffensperger, 1:22-CV-0122-SCJ (Court Reporter Viola Zbrowski)(pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their amended motion for a preliminary injunction, if any, by no later than 2:00 PM EST on January 13,2022. Defendant shall file their response, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 18, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 20, 2022. Signed Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 14,2022.Plaintiffs shall file their response, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM onJanuary 18, 2022. Defendants shall file their reply/ if any, by no later than 5:00 PM on January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file an additional ten pages, for a total of 35 pages, to the memorandum in support of their forthcoming motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (ddm)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file an additional ten pages, for a total of 35 pages, to the memorandum in support of their forthcoming motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (ddm)
January 12, 2022 Submission of #8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (eop)
January 12, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING: RULE 16 CONFERENCE set for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg. Topic: Rule 16 Conference: 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ, 1:22-0090-ELB-SCJ-SDG; 1:22-CV-0122-SCJ. Connection Instructions: Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605120572 Passcode: 851671 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# or +16468287666,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 551 285 1373 or +1 669 216 1590 Webinar ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 International numbers available: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abdGvu42dG Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 SIP: 1605120572@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 851671 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan P. Hawley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511100).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Christina A. Ford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511099).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. Hamilton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511098).by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert, Dexter Wimbish. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Memorandum of Law In Support by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert and Dexter Wimbish. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Theron Brown, Annie Lois Grant, Quentin T. Howell, Triana Arnold James, Elbert Solomon, Eunice Sykes, Elroy Tolbert and Dexter Wimbish. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Edward Lindsey. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Le. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara Tindall Ghazal. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (eop)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elbert Solomon, Quentin T. Howell, Dexter Wimbish, Elroy Tolbert, Annie Lois Grant, Eunice Sykes, Theron Brown and Triana Arnold James. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11510043) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Lois Grant
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin T. Howell
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elroy Tolbert
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Brown
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triana Arnold James
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Sykes
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Solomon
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Wimbish
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Christina Ashley Ford
Represented By: Daniel C Osher
Represented By: Graham W. White
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Hawley
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Tindall Ghazal
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lindsey
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?