Sellers v. Gaugh
Plaintiff: Vanessa Sellers
Defendant: John Gaugh and Hidden Creek Transportation, LLC
Petitioner: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00196
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Hidden Creek Transportation, LLC.(Cox, Sean) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 18, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by John Gaugh.(Cox, Sean) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 17, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO CAP DAMAGES AT THE POLICY LIMITS AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE BY DEFENDANT HIDDEN CREEK TRANSPORTATION LLC by Vanessa Sellers. (Maheri, Elisabeth)
March 11, 2022 Filing 23 Withdrawal of Motion by Vanessa Sellers re Submission to District Judge, #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Maheri, Elisabeth) Modified on 3/14/2022 to edit docket text(tas).
March 10, 2022 Submission of #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (ash)
March 9, 2022 Filing 22 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/24/2022 - 6/1/2022, by Sean Cox. (Cox, Sean)
March 4, 2022 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Gaugh, Hidden Creek Transportation, LLC filed by Vanessa Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Parties Consent to Amending the Complaint)(Maheri, Elisabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 28, 2022 Filing 20 Request to File Original Discovery Def's 1st RPD's and ROG's to PL by John Gaugh.(Dunaway, Preston)
February 18, 2022 Filing 19 Initial Disclosures by John Gaugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Witness List, #2 Exhibit Document List and Descriptions, #3 Exhibit Copy of Insurance Agreement)(Dunaway, Preston)
February 17, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Godsey, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Godsey, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Insurance Corporation. (Godsey, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 15 First Initial Disclosures by Vanessa Sellers.(Maheri, Elisabeth)
February 14, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Maheri, Elisabeth)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Brian Dossena (Godsey, John)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Dunaway, Preston)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery shall be on a six-month discovery track and end on 8/17/2022. See order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 8, 2022. (ash)
February 9, 2022 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
February 8, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Vanessa Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint)(Maheri, Elisabeth) Modified on 2/9/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order. (Dunaway, Preston)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by John Gaugh. (Cox, Sean)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/03/2022. (jkb)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. As a senior judge of the Northern District of Georgia, I decline assignment of this case. The Clerk is directed not to substitute another case for this action. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/2/2022. (abm) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket text (abm).
February 2, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-00196-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (abm)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/23/2022 - 3/5/2022, 4/20/2022 - 5/6/2022, 5/10/2022 - 5/18/2022, by Sean Cox. (Cox, Sean)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by John Gaugh. (eop)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by John Gaugh.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and CROSSCLAIM against John Gaugh with Jury Demand by Alfa Insurance Corporation. ( Discovery ends on 6/17/2022.) (Filed in State Court 10/8/21 and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by John Gaugh. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11522410) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, UM Carrier - Answer, #2 Exhibit -B -Affidavit of Service -John Gaugh, #3 Exhibit -C-Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Gaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Sellers
Represented By: Elisabeth Tafere Maheri
Represented By: James Moir Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gaugh
Represented By: Preston Dunaway
Represented By: Sean Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Creek Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Sean Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Brian M. Dossena
Represented By: John Gregory Godsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?