Kennington v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Duane Kennington
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00329
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Duane Kennington. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC waiver mailed on 2/21/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Duane Kennington. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver mailed on 1/28/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Berry, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Clerks Notation re: #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 01/28/2022. (cmb)
January 28, 2022 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Eric Duane Kennington. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Eric Duane Kennington. (Berry, Matthew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Duane Kennington. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11547618) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennington v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Duane Kennington
Represented By: Christopher Neil Armor
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?