Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC et al v. ADT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC and Jason Guven
Defendant: ADT, LLC doing business as ADT Security Services and Wil Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2022cv00433
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 Case transferred to Gwinnett County State Court via electronic transfer. (vs)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/8/2022. (vs)
April 8, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (vs)
March 30, 2022 Submission of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
March 28, 2022 Filing 13 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Audio Transcript, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Stacy-Ann Weise)(Gieser, Caroline) Modified on 3/29/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 25, 2022 Submission of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADT, LLC. (Gieser, Caroline)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #4 Motion to Remand. Defendant ADT LLC may supplement its Response within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/17/2022. (jeh)
March 9, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason Guven and Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief BIS of Opp to Def MTD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Ptf's Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Emails)(Cathey, Matthew) Modified on 3/10/2022 to edit text (jra).
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Its Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand with Brief In Support by ADT, LLC. (Gieser, Caroline) Modified on 3/10/2022 to edit text (jra).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiffs shall have until March 9, 2022 in which to file their Response. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/3/2022. (jeh)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ADT, LLC. (Gieser, Caroline)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC & Jason Guven (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cathey, Matthew) Modified on 3/2/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief ADT'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit ADT/GUVEN CONTRACT)(Gieser, Caroline)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Jason Guven & Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief Ptf's BIS of Mtn to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Ptf's Complaint for Damages, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - e-mails)(Cathey, Matthew) Modified on 2/17/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Adam Cathey on behalf of Jason Guven (Cathey, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ADT Inc. for ADT, LLC. (tas)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ADT, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11564011) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Proceedings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC et al v. ADT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Guven Fine Jewelry, LLC
Represented By: Dennis T. Cathey
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Dowdy
Represented By: Matthew Adam Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Guven
Represented By: Dennis T. Cathey
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Dowdy
Represented By: Matthew Adam Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC doing business as ADT Security Services
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wil Sanchez
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?