Wilder v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Defendant: Raymond Shedd
Counter Defendant: Judy Wilder
Counter Claimant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00438
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Auto-Owners Insurance Company of Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Anesthesia Consultants of Athens, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Athens Diagnostic Center, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Athens Orthopedic Clinic, #4 Exhibit Subpoena to Athens Spine Center, #5 Exhibit Subpoena to St. Mary's Health Care System, #6 Exhibit Subpoena to United Healthcare Community Plan of Georgia, Inc.)(Mandell, Samantha)
March 30, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Auto-Owners Insurance Company's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Judy Wilder by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Mandell, Samantha)
March 30, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Stipulated Protective Order. (Mandell, Samantha)
March 28, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Requests For Production and First Requests to Admit To Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Judy Wilder by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Mandell, Samantha)
March 28, 2022 Filing 20 Initial Disclosures by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Mandell, Samantha)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #17 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/15/2022. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/17/2022. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/21/2022. (anc)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mandell, Samantha)
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Judy Wilder. (Schulman, Shea)
March 8, 2022 Filing 16 Withdrawal of Motion #10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Plaintiff/Counter Defendant filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mandell, Samantha)
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Judy Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Auto-Owners Insurance Company's Counterclaim)(Schulman, Shea)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/7/22. (bnw)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Production of Documents to Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Judy Wilder.(Schulman, Shea)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories to Auto-Owners Insurance Company by Judy Wilder.(Schulman, Shea)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Plaintiff/Counter Defendant by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mandell Declaration)(Mandell, Samantha)
March 7, 2022 Submission of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (kxm)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Judy Wilder. (Schulman, Shea)
February 24, 2022 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond Shedd to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
February 21, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mandell, Samantha)
February 17, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Raymond Shedd filed by Judy Wilder.(Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (Originally Contained #7 Motion to Remand (kxm)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Judy Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law iin Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Response to Auto Owners' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Raymond Shedd)(Schulman, Shea)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shea Schulman on behalf of Judy Wilder (Schulman, Shea)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Discovery ends on 7/11/2022.), COUNTERCLAIM against Judy Wilder by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Mandell, Samantha) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Raymond Shedd with Brief In Support by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Mandell, Samantha)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mandell, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Judy Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Samantha Rose Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Shedd
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Samantha Rose Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?