Owners Insurance Company v. Black et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Jason Black, Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc., Charity Sinegal, Glenn Davis, Joshua Jones, David Duran and Matthew Hill
Case Number: 1:2022cv00664
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Clerks Notation re #20 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
April 13, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc., Charity Sinegal, Glenn Davis, Joshua Jones, David Duran, and Matthew Hill (Tady, Aaron) Modified on 4/14/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 1, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM against Owners Insurance Company with Jury Demand by David Duran, Glenn Davis, Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc., Joshua Jones, Matthew Hill, and Charity Sinegal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barton, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/5/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 22, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #1 COMPLAINT by Jason Black. Discovery ends on 8/19/2022.(Wilkins, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/23/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. David Duran served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Matthew Hill served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Joshua Jones served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Jason Black served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Glenn Davis served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Charity Sinegal served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Tuz, Nicholas)
February 24, 2022 Clerks Notation re #10 Leave of Absence by Michael C. Kendall. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Michael C. Kendall on these dates. (jeh)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Tuz, Nicholas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Charity Sinegal. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joshua Jones. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Hill. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to David Duran. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Glenn Davis. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jason Black. (lwb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11600725) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Nicholas B Tuz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Black
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremont Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Sinegal
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Davis
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jones
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duran
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hill
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?