Vista Acquisitions, LLC v. West Shore Walden LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vista Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC, John Doe 1, John Doe 2 and John Doe 3
Case Number: 1:2022cv00739
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/22/2022. (dob)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. (Cino, Jessica)
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ben-Oren, Zoe)
April 20, 2022 Filing 12 ---REFILED AT #13 W/ ATTACHMENTS---Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC. (Ben-Oren, Zoe) Modified on 4/21/2022 to add red text and terminate motion(tmf).
April 19, 2022 Submission of #9 MOTION to Dismiss Vista Acquisitions, LLC's Claims to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Vista Realty Partners Rezoning Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Staff Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Savannah MPC 9.21.21 Meeting Notes, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D H. Yellin Time Sheets, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E October 28 Letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F West Shore Walden Petition for Writ of Certiorari, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G September 17 2021 Tilbrook Email, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H 2022-01-19 Cease and Desist Letter to WSW, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I 2022.01.21 Motion to Dismiss and Request for Expedited Hearing, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J 2022-01.26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Meet a Fundamental Requirement, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K 2022.02.07 Order Granting Expedited Hearing - February 14, 2022, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L Attempts to Resolve Matter, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M 2022.02.12 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N West Shore Walden Florida Petition, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O Sanctions Motion in Florida West Shore Legacy case)(Cino, Jessica) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC. (Ashe, Robert)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Vista Acquisitions, LLC's Claims with Brief In Support by West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC. (Ashe, Robert)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery with Brief In Support by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Cino, Jessica)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court GRANTS the parties' #7 Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limits. Defendants shall move to dismiss the Complaint on or before April 1, 2022. Defendants' opening brief in support of their motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before April 1, 2022, and shall not exceed 35 pages. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before April 29, 2022, and shall not exceed 35 pages. Defendants' reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before May 20, 2022, and shall not exceed 20 pages. In the event the Court denies all or part of Defendants' motion to dismiss, Defendants shall file their Answer to the Complaint within 30 days following the entry of such order. The Court highly doubts Defendant West Shore needs the extension for the reasons stated. It appears Defendant West Shore simply did not get its briefing done on time. All parties are advised not to wait to the last minute to file for any further extensions. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2022. (jpk)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by West Shore Walden LLC, West Shore, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ben-Oren, Zoe) . Modified on 3/10/2022 to edit text and add MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages(tmf).
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. West Shore Walden LLC served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. (Cino, Jessica)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. West Shore, LLC served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Cino, Jessica)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
February 24, 2022 Filing Fee Paid: $ 402, receipt number GAN100136465 (kxm)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to West Shore Walden LLC. (kxm)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to West Shore, LLC. (kxm)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Vista Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vista Realty Partners Rezoning Application, #2 Exhibit B - Staff Report, #3 Exhibit C - West Shore City Council - Opposition to Rezoning, #4 Exhibit D - West Shore Walden Petition for Writ of Certiorari, #5 Exhibit E - September 17, 2021 Email, #6 Exhibit F - 2022-01-19 Cease and Desist Letter to WSW, #7 Exhibit G - Sanctions Motion in Florida West Shore Legacy case, #8 Exhibit H - 2022.01.21 Motion to Dismiss and Request for Expedited Hearing, #9 Exhibit I - 2022-01.26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Meet a Fundamental Requirement, #10 Exhibit J - 2022.02.07 Order Granting Expedited Hearing - February 14, 2022 9.00am, #11 Exhibit K - 2022.02.12 Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Acquisitions, LLC v. West Shore Walden LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Jamil A Favors
Represented By: Jessica Gabel Cino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Shore Walden LLC
Represented By: Kamal Ghali
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe, III
Represented By: Zoe Michal Ben-Oren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Shore, LLC
Represented By: Kamal Ghali
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ashe, III
Represented By: Zoe Michal Ben-Oren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?