Boutorabi et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Parisa Boutorabi and Mohammad Reza Bootorabi
Defendant: Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Chip Laitinen, Stephanie Zakhem and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2022cv01015
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 4/27/2022 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi. All Defendants. (Farkhondeh, Tara)
April 22, 2022 Clerks Approval re #17 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11662600. (Levine, Kenneth)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M Calvert on 4/20/2022. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/20/2022. (cavc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Victoria M Calvert for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-01015-VMC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/19/22. (bnw)
March 25, 2022 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Jane Doe, Chip Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Stephanie Zakhem. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mayorkas, #2 Summons Laitinen, #3 Summons Jaddou, #4 Summons Garland, #5 Summons Erskine, #6 Summons Blinken)(cavc)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to U.S. Attorney (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to Stephanie Zakhem (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to Chip Laitinen (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to UR M. Jaddou (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to Alejandro Mayorkas (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to Merrick Garland (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi as to Antony J. Blinken (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Blinken. (cavc) Modified on 3/24/2022 (cavc).
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi. (Farkhondeh, Tara)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/23/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
March 23, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Tara Farkhondeh Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tara Farkhondeh added appearing on behalf of Mohammad Reza Bootorabi, Parisa Boutorabi (cdg)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Tara Farkhondeh Pro Hac Vice.by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Levine, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 18, 2022 RETURN of #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Tara Farkhondeh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11662600). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission of Tara Farkhondeh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11662600).by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Levine, Kenneth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Mohammad Reza Bootorabi and Parisa Boutorabi. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11652377) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boutorabi et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parisa Boutorabi
Represented By: Kenneth S Levine
Represented By: Tara Farkhondeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Reza Bootorabi
Represented By: Kenneth S Levine
Represented By: Tara Farkhondeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Laitinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?