Kelly et al v. Fulton County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Robert H. Kelly and Ricky L. Blalock
Defendant: Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Commissioner Marvin Arrington, Jr., Commissioner Natalie Hall, Commissioner Elizabeth Hausmann, Commissioner Bob Ellis, Commissioner Lee Morris, Chairman Robert L. Pitts, Richard Anderson and Kenneth Hermon, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01472
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ricky L. Blalock, Robert H. Kelly. (Williams, Mario)
June 1, 2022 Submission of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jkb)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Richard Anderson, Marvin Arrington, Jr., Bob Ellis, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Natalie Hall, Elizabeth Hausmann, Kenneth Hermon, Jr., Lee Morris, Robert L. Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of Filing and Payment of Removal Costs)(Boughey, Timothy)
May 12, 2022 Submission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jkb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed pending the ruling on the Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/11/2022. (dmb)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Motion to Remand with Brief In Support by Ricky L. Blalock, Robert H. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Ricky L. Blalock, Robert H. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit March 31, 2022 Order)(Williams, Mario)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Richard Anderson, Marvin Arrington, Jr., Bob Ellis, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Natalie Hall, Elizabeth Hausmann, Kenneth Hermon, Jr., Lee Morris, Robert L. Pitts. (Boughey, Timothy)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 19, 2022. (ash)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bob Ellis, Lee Morris, Fulton County Board of Commissioners, Natalie Hall, Marvin Arrington, Jr., Kenneth Hermon, Jr., Richard Anderson, Elizabeth Hausmann, Robert L. Pitts. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11736999) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit All Other Process, Pleadings, and Orders from the State Court Action, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Clerk of Fulton County Superior Co, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cavc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Fulton County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Kelly
Represented By: David Edward Betts
Represented By: Mario Bernard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Blalock
Represented By: David Edward Betts
Represented By: Mario Bernard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Marvin Arrington, Jr.
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Natalie Hall
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Elizabeth Hausmann
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Bob Ellis
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Lee Morris
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman Robert L. Pitts
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anderson
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hermon, Jr.
Represented By: Dominique Martinez
Represented By: Kaye Woodard Burwell
Represented By: Timothy M. Boughey
Represented By: Y. Soo Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?