Thomas v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Albert C. Thomas
Defendant: Brian Kemp, Deborah Gonzalez, John W. Donnelly, Caryl Deems, Linda Winston, Terry E. Barnard and Arianna Brown
Case Number: 1:2022cv01475
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 USCA Acknowledgment of #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert C. Thomas. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-11638-GG. (pjm)
May 17, 2022 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #7 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 22-11638-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert C. Thomas. (pjm)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Albert C. Thomas to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath re Contact Information (kxm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Clerk's Judgment and #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Albert C. Thomas. (pjm) Modified on 5/16/2022 to change the file date to 5/5/2022 (bgt).
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the action be DISMISSED without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted (anc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS Plaintiffs' Complaint #3 WITHOUT PREJUDICE as failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Because the Complaint is dismissed, Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel #4 is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/26/2022. (anc)
April 26, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (anc)
April 26, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Albert C. Thomas re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order. (anc)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Albert C. Thomas. (anc)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Albert C. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(anc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TERMINATE the present reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge and SUBMIT the case to the District Judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/20/2022. (anc)
April 20, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Albert C. Thomas re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (anc)
April 20, 2022 Submission of #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #3 Complaint for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e), to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (anc)
April 19, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (eop)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Albert C. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint - Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryl Deems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arianna Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?