Onyekwere v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Bright Ugochukwu Onyekwere
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Shineka Miller
Case Number: 1:2022cv01560
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleading shall be enlarged by 120 days, through and including 10/25/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 06/14/2022. (jkb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Complaint re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Shineka Miller. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grant, Nicole)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Grant, Nicole)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole P. Grant on behalf of Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Shineka Miller (Grant, Nicole)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on April 26, 2022. (ash)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Bright Ugochukwu Onyekwere. All Defendants. (Fogle, H.)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Kurt R. Erskine, #2 Summons issued as to Merrick B. Garland, #3 Summons issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, #4 Summons issued as to Shineka Miller)(kxm) Modified on 4/25/2022 (kxm).
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11750349) filed by Bright Ugochukwu Onyekwere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyekwere v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Ugochukwu Onyekwere
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Nicole P. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Nicole P. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Miller
Represented By: Nicole P. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?