Durand et al v. Raffensperger
Plaintiff: Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Brian Carney and Elizabeth Rodenroth
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Case Number: 1:2022cv01784
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Stoy, Lee)
May 17, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth, Brian Carney. Brad Raffensperger waiver mailed on 5/6/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Sells, Bryan)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/11/2022. (tas)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing of Exhibits and Exhibit List by Brian Carney, Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P1: SB 472 video links, #2 Exhibit P2: Transcript of Senate Committee Hearing on SB 472, #3 Exhibit P3: Transcript of Senate Floor Debate on SB 472, #4 Exhibit P4: Transcript of House Committee Hearing on SB 472, #5 Exhibit P5: Transcript of House Floor Debate on SB 472, #6 Exhibit P6: SB 472 Bill History, #7 Exhibit P7: SB 472 text, #8 Exhibit P8: Echols declaration of intent, #9 Exhibit P9: Echols fundraising report, #10 Exhibit P10: Durand declaration of intent, #11 Exhibit P11: Durand fundraising report, #12 Exhibit P12: PSC 2012 districts map packet, #13 Exhibit P13: PSC 2012 districts with 2020 data, #14 Exhibit P14: SB 472 map packet, #15 Exhibit P15: 2020 population count by county name, #16 Exhibit P16: GHDC alternative map packet, #17 Exhibit P17: GHDC map overlay, #18 Exhibit P18: House redistricting guidelines, #19 Exhibit P19: demonstrative SB 472 calculations, #20 Exhibit P20: demonstrative GHDC calculations, #21 Exhibit P21: Durand campaign announcement, #22 Exhibit P22: Durand campaign literature, #23 Exhibit List)(Sells, Bryan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2022 TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(jkl)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Defendant's Exhibits for Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Brad Raffensperger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Ellis and Attachment (OSAH Initiating Forms), #2 Exhibit OSAH Notice of Hearing, #3 Exhibit 2022 Senate Bill 472 Legislative History, #4 Exhibit Sample Ballots, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Gina Wright with Attachments)(Vaughan, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED by Brian Carney, Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth. (Sells, Bryan)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/9/22. (jkl)
May 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee M. Stoy, Jr on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Stoy, Lee)
May 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Marie Wilson Vaughan on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Vaughan, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Plaintiffs must notify the Defendant of the lawsuit and provide Defendant with notice of the hearing. (adg)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (McGowan, Charlene)
May 6, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction, case incorrectly filed under seal re #1 Complaint. (tas)
May 6, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to counsel for Brian Carney, Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth re #4 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (adg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Plaintiffs must notify the Defendant of the lawsuit and provide Defendant with notice of the hearing. (adg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (tas)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED by Brian Carney, Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth. (tas)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patty Durand, Elizabeth Pinder, Elizabeth Rodenroth, Brian Carney. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11781946) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 5, 2022 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durand et al v. Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Durand
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Pinder
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carney
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rodenroth
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Wilson Vaughan
Represented By: Lee M. Stoy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?