Goodnow et al v. Premiere Global Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Goodnow, Audra Terrazas and Timothy Steffens
Defendant: Premiere Global Services, Inc., American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd., Audio Telcommunications Technology II LLC and Doe Corps 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv02184
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint, by American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Corbitt, Canon)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion For Extension of Time For Defendants To Respond. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint is due 7/29/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/18/2022. (jeh)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Consent Motion For Extension of Time For Defendant's To Respond re #5 Amended Complaint, by American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd., Premiere Global Services, Inc., and Audio Telecommunications Technology II, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbitt, Canon) Modified on 7/18/2022 to edit text(jra).
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Audra Terrazas, Kimberly Goodnow, and Timothy Steffens.(Stephens, Jeremy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/24/2022 to edit text (jra).
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan L. Arbeit. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/21/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
June 17, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Bryan L. Arbeit Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11867070). Attorney Bryan L. Arbeit added appearing on behalf of Kimberly Goodnow, Audra Terrazas (cdg)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Bryan L. Arbeit Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11867070). with Brief In Support by Kimberly Goodnow, Audra Terrazas. (Stephens, Jeremy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd., Audio Telcommunications Technology II LLC, Premiere Global Services, Inc. (ane)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Audra Terrazas, Kimberly Goodnow. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11837443) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodnow et al v. Premiere Global Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Goodnow
Represented By: Bryan L. Arbeit
Represented By: Jeremy Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Terrazas
Represented By: Bryan L. Arbeit
Represented By: Jeremy Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Steffens
Represented By: Bryan L. Arbeit
Represented By: Jeremy Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premiere Global Services, Inc.
Represented By: Canon T. Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Teleconferencing Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Canon T. Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audio Telcommunications Technology II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corps 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?