Finn et al v. Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration et al
Plaintiff: Karen Finn, Dr. Jullian Ford, Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., New Georgia Project Action Fund, League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb and Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration and Janine Eveler
Case Number: 1:2022cv02300
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss or to Join Necessary Parties with Brief In Support by Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Join Necessary Parties, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Janine Eveler)(White, Daniel)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher David Shenton. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/28/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 28, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Christopher David Shenton as to Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb and New Georgia Project Action Fund regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
July 27, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher David Shenton Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Shenton added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (cdg)
July 25, 2022 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher David Shenton Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 21, 2022 Clerks Notation re #28 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb and New Georgia Project Action Fund. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
July 20, 2022 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Persons by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Winichakul, Pichaya)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jon Greenbaum. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/19/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 18, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11923769).. Attorney Jon M. Greenbaum added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
July 15, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Sofia Gold as to Hylah Daly and Jenne Dulcio regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sofia Fernandez Gold. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/15/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
July 13, 2022 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11923769).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Sofia Fernandez Gold Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sofia Fernandez Gold added appearing on behalf of plaintiffs (cdg)
July 12, 2022 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Sofia Fernandez Gold Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 6, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Loperfido Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11895366).. Attorney Jeffrey Loperfido added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
July 6, 2022 RETURN of #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher David Shenton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11895332). to attorney for correction re: admitted courts. (gas)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration Answer due 7/29/2022; Janine Eveler Answer due 7/29/2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/30/2022. (ane)
June 30, 2022 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Sofia Fernandez Gold Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888162). to attorney for correction re: admitted courts. (gas)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888154).. Attorney Julie Marie Houk added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb (gas)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888145).. Attorney Ezra David Rosenberg added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas Koff Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Douglas Koff added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Schochet Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Paul Schochet added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
June 30, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Paul Schochet, Savannah Price and Thomas Mott as to Hylah Daly, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Livingstone Mott Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Thomas Livingstone Mott added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (gas)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ezra David Rosenbeg; GRANTING #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Marie Houk; GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas Koff; GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Livingstone Mott; GRANTING #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Savannah Rose Price; and GRANTING #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Schochet. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/30/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
June 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Savannah Rose Price Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Savannah Rose Price added appearing on behalf of Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb (gas)
June 29, 2022 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(White, Daniel)
June 29, 2022 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey Loperfido Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11895366).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 29, 2022 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher David Shenton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11895332).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 28, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Walter White on behalf of Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration, Janine Eveler (White, Daniel)
June 27, 2022 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jon M. Greenbaum. Clerk to follow-up by 7/7/2022. (cdg)
June 27, 2022 Filing 19 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christopher Shenton. Clerk to follow-up by 7/7/2022. (cdg)
June 24, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Schochet Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Savannah Rose Price Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Livingstone Mott Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas Koff Pro Hac Vice.by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Sofia Fernandez Gold Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888162).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888154).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11888145).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 24, 2022 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas Koff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874785). to attorney for correction re: Petitioner's address. (cdg)
June 24, 2022 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Livingstone Mott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874828). to attorney for correction re: Petitioner's address. (cdg)
June 24, 2022 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Schochet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874840). to attorney for correction re: Petitioner's address. (cdg)
June 24, 2022 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Savannah Rose Price Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874838). to attorney for correction re: Petitioner's address. (cdg)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Claim of Unconstitutionality by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund (Winichakul, Pichaya) Modified on 6/24/2022 to edit text(ane).
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Schochet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874840).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 17, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Savannah Rose Price Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874838).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Livingstone Mott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874828).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas Koff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11874785).by Hylah Daly, Jenne Dulcio, Karen Finn, Jullian Ford, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb, New Georgia Project Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winichakul, Pichaya) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Jenne Dulcio, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Karen Finn, New Georgia Project Action Fund, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Hylah Daly, Jullian Ford, League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb. Janine Eveler served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Winichakul, Pichaya)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Jenne Dulcio, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Karen Finn, New Georgia Project Action Fund, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Hylah Daly, Jullian Ford, League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb. Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Winichakul, Pichaya)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Janine Eveler. (nmb)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration. (nmb)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jenne Dulcio, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Karen Finn, New Georgia Project Action Fund, Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc., Hylah Daly, Jullian Ford, League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BGANDC-11855535) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finn et al v. Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Finn
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Jullian Ford
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hylah Daly
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenne Dulcio
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeo Latino Community Development Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Georgia Project Action Fund
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Marietta-Cobb
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Caren E Short
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Erik Heard
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Ezra David Rosenberg
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Represented By: Julie Marie Houk
Represented By: Michael Joseph Tafelski
Represented By: Pichaya Poy Winichakul
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Christopher Shenton
Represented By: Jeffrey Loperfido
Represented By: Paul A Schochet
Represented By: Savannah Rose Price
Represented By: Sofia Fernandez Gold
Represented By: Thomas Livingstone Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Board of Elections and Registration
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Eveler
Represented By: Daniel Walter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?