Eudy v. GCM Coastal, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Eudy
Defendant: GCM Coastal, LLC and Susan S. Geyer
Case Number: 1:2022cv02418
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINAL JUDGMENT: The Court hereby enters final judgment in conformity with this Court's July 24, 2023, Order granting summary judgment to Plaintiff Jane Eudy [Doc. #27 ]. The parties have stipulated as to the amount of damages and interest owed to Plaintiff [Doc. #33 ]. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Jane Eudy in the amount of $17,160,000.00 against Defendants GCM Coastal, LLC, and Susan S. Geyer, as Trustee for the SSG 2003 Trust. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/19/2023. --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--(tmf)
September 19, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
September 18, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #27 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Jane Eudy. (Smith, Andrew)
September 18, 2023 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark H. Cohen: Telephone Conference held on 9/18/2023. A second telephone conference was conducted at the request of the Court to discuss the Proposed Consent Order for Substitution of Attorney #28 . Stuart Geyer's signature was not dated, and the Court wanted to know when Mr. Geyer signed the proposed order. Attorney Christy confirmed that Mr. Geyer signed the proposed order on September 1, 2023 and there are no issues with him representing Mr. Geyer. The Court will enter the order for Substitution of Counsel. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Judith Wolff)(tmf)
September 18, 2023 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark H. Cohen: Telephone Conference held on 9/18/2023. A telephone conference was conducted at the request of the Court to discuss the resolution of the judgment. The parties will file a stipulation regarding the amount to be enter in the judgment. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Judith Wolff)(tmf)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney John Anthony Christy for GCM Coastal, LLC added. Attorney Ray Stallings Smith, III terminated. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/18/2023. (tmf)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney John Anthony Christy for Susan S. Geyer added. Attorney Ray Stallings Smith, III terminated. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/18/2023. (tmf) Modified on 9/18/2023 to edit text(tmf).
September 8, 2023 Filing 28 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Consent Order Substituting Counsel. (Christy, John)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE PROCEEDING : Telephone conference set for 9/18/2023 at 10:30 AM in No Courtroom before Judge Mark H. Cohen. Connection Instructions: Please call 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 2921179#, As participant push #, Security Code: #5514. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (lme)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Jane Eudy's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. #19 ] is GRANTED. The Court will enter final judgment after the matter of damages and interest is resolved. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that, within the next twenty-one (21) days, counsel for the parties are directed to meet and confer, either in person or telephonically, to attempt to reach an agreement on the amount owed by Defendants to Plaintiff, including interest. If an agreement cannot be reached, counsel are DIRECTED to notify the Court's Courtroom Deputy after this good faith negotiation and the Court will set up a conference call to discuss further steps. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/24/2023. (tmf)
July 10, 2023 Filing 26 Response to Statement of Material Facts re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Amended 07-10-2023 filed by GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer. (Smith, Ray)
June 2, 2023 Filing 25 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 9-11, June 15-18, June 22-25, June 30 - July 5, September 29 - October 1, October 19-23, by Ray Stallings Smith, III. (Smith, Ray)
January 31, 2023 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jane Eudy. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy, #2 Ex. 1 to Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy, #3 Ex. 2 to Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy, #4 Ex. 3 to Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy, #5 Ex. 4 to Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy, #6 Ex. 5 to Reply Declaration of Jane Eudy)(Victor, Justin)
January 19, 2023 Submission of #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
January 17, 2023 Filing 23 Response to Statement of Material Facts re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer. (Smith, Ray)
January 17, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer. (Smith, Ray)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting [2 #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion Extending the time for defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Defendants shall have up through and including Tuesday, January 17, 2023, to submit their Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/30/2022. (tmf)
December 30, 2022 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion Extending the time for defendants to respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment re: #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer. (Smith, Ray)
December 13, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Jane Eudy. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Jane Eudy, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Andrew) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Order Granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Burrows by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/14/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
September 23, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer.(Smith, Ray)
September 23, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ray Stallings Smith, III on behalf of GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer (Smith, Ray)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Order Granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah E. Catterson by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
September 16, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Burrows Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12069750). Attorney Michael Burrows added appearing on behalf of Jane Eudy (pdt).
September 16, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah Elizabeth Catterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12069775). Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Catterson added appearing on behalf of Jane Eudy (pdt)
September 16, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #16 Initial Disclosures by GCM Coastal, LLC.(Haliburton, Preston) Modified on 9/16/2022 to edit event(tmf).
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by GCM Coastal, LLC.(Haliburton, Preston) Modified on 9/16/2022 to edit event(tmf).
September 15, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah Elizabeth Catterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12069775).by Jane Eudy. (Victor, Justin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 15, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Burrows Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12069750).by Jane Eudy. (Victor, Justin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 12/8/2022. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/9/2022. (tmf)
August 8, 2022 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Susan S. Geyer.(Haliburton, Preston) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 8, 2022 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by GCM Coastal, LLC.(Haliburton, Preston) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jane Eudy. (Victor, Justin)
August 5, 2022 Submission of #8 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GCM Coastal, LLC, Susan S. Geyer filed by Jane Eudy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Victor, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Jane Eudy SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/21/2022. (tmf)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Susan S. Geyer.(Haliburton, Preston) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by GCM Coastal, LLC. Discovery ends on 12/5/2022.(Haliburton, Preston) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 6, 2022 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/28/2022. (tmf)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Susan S. Geyer. (ane)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to GCM Coastal, LLC. (ane)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jane Eudy. (ane)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jane Eudy. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11871867) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eudy v. GCM Coastal, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Eudy
Represented By: Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith
Represented By: Justin Kyle Victor
Represented By: Michael Burrows
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Catterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCM Coastal, LLC
Represented By: Preston Haliburton
Represented By: Ray Stallings Smith, III
Represented By: John Anthony Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Geyer
Represented By: Preston Haliburton
Represented By: Ray Stallings Smith, III
Represented By: John Anthony Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?