MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company et al
Plaintiff: MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company, Caryn Blanc and Allan Parker
Case Number: 1:2022cv02754
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Filing 15 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 7, 2022, October 8, 2022, October 9, 2022, October 10, 2022, October 11, 2022, October 12, 2022, October 13, 2022, by Casey Douglas Baker. (Baker, Casey)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING the #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time through 9/16/22 to File Reply in Support of the #3 Motion to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to the #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/29/22. (jpa)
August 29, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction, #10 MOTION to Amend the Complaint by Caryn Blanc, Allan Parker, Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Baker, Casey)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Goselin, John)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction filed by MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jeff Morley, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Delaware Division of Corporations, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Feliciano Email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - TESS -Triangle Group, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - TESS -TRICAP INTERNATIONAL, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - California Statement of Information, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G -Corsi Email)(Goselin, John)
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend the Complaint by MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Goselin, John)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time through 8/19/2022 to File Response to the #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/16/22. (jpa)
August 15, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction by MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time through 8/16/2022 to File a Response the #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/29/22. (jpa)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Motion to Dismiss re: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction by MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goselin, John)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Errata to Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 3-1) by Caryn Blanc, Allan Parker, Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction (Baker, Casey)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/19/2022. (lme)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Caryn Blanc, Allan Parker, Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief - Declaration of Allan Parker, #3 Exhibit 2 to Brief -- Declaration of Caryn Blanc)(Baker, Casey)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit 2 to the Consent Notice of Removal by Caryn Blanc, Allan Parker, Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Baker, Casey)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 Consent NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company, Caryn Blanc, Allan Parker. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11923578) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments to Consent Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC v. Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASIS Staffing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: John H. Goselin, II
Represented By: Kindu A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Group Companies, Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Casey Douglas Baker
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caryn Blanc
Represented By: Casey Douglas Baker
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Parker
Represented By: Casey Douglas Baker
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?