Nguyen v. Prehired Recruiting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nghia Nguyen and Nghia Nathan Nguyen
Defendant: Prehired Recruiting, LLC, Prehired, LLC and Joshua Jordan
Case Number: 1:2022cv02894
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #11 MOTION for Extension of Time through 9/22/22 to File a Response to Defendants' #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/30/22. (jpa)
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by Nghia Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bertucci, Michael)
August 22, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Bertucci Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael R. Bertucci added appearing on behalf of Nghia Nguyen (cdg)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Order Granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Bertucci by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/22/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
August 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) with Brief In Support by Joshua Jordan, Prehired Recruiting, LLC, Prehired, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Nguyen ISA, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Kolber, Daniel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Bertucci Pro Hac Vice.by Nghia Nguyen. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 10, 2022 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Bertucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11981609). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address must be local. Our database reflects an out of state address. (cdg)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael R. Bertucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11981609).by Nghia Nguyen. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 5, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael R. Bertucci. Clerk to follow-up by 8/15/2022. (cdg)
August 3, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Nghia Nguyen. Prehired, LLC served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Nghia Nguyen. Prehired Recruiting, LLC served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Nghia Nguyen. Joshua Jordan served on 7/30/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/25/22. (jpa)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joshua Jordan, Prehired Recruiting, LLC, Prehired, LLC. (ane)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nghia Nguyen. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11944812) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Website Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B- Website Screenshot, #3 Exhibit C- Website Screenshot, #4 Exhibit D- Website Screenshot, #5 Exhibit E- Website Screenshot, #6 Exhibit F- Website Screenshot, #7 Exhibit G- Website Screenshot, #8 Exhibit H- Website Screenshot, #9 Exhibit I- Website Screenshot, #10 Exhibit J- Lawsuits filed by Prehired, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Prehired Recruiting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nghia Nguyen
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi Bowman
Represented By: Michael R. Bertucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nghia Nathan Nguyen
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi Bowman
Represented By: Michael R. Bertucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prehired Recruiting, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hackner Kolber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prehired, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hackner Kolber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jordan
Represented By: Daniel Hackner Kolber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?