ML Healthcare Services, LLC v. Lal et al
Petitioner: ML Healthcare Services, LLC
Respondent: Satish K. Lal and Satish K. Lal M.D.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02963
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09 Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service by U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/02/2022. (jkb)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-02963-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 8/2/2022. (tcc)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Service By U.S. Marshal by ML Healthcare Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cobb, James)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Cameron Roberts and Exhibits A - I Thereto by ML Healthcare Services, LLC re #1 Petition for Arbitration,,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cameron Roberts, #2 Exhibit A to Roberts Dec. - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B to Roberts Dec. - Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit C to Roberts Dec. - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit D to Roberts Dec. - Appointment of Arbitrator, #6 Exhibit E to Roberts Dec. - Amended Arbitration Demand, #7 Exhibit F to Roberts Dec. - Proof of Service, #8 Exhibit G to Roberts Dec. - April 3, 2022 Order Scheduling Hearing, #9 Exhibit H to Roberts Dec. - Notice of Hearing, #10 Exhibit I to Roberts Dec. - Final Award)(Cobb, James)
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Satish K. Lal M.D. (tas)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Satish K. Lal. (tas)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm arbitration award filed by ML Healthcare Services, LLC.(Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11954226) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Roberts Dec Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Appointment of Arbitrator, #5 Exhibit E - Amended Arbitration Demand, #6 Exhibit F - Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit G - April 3 2022 Order Scheduling Hearing, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit I - Final Award, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ML Healthcare Services, LLC v. Lal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ML Healthcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Cameron Blaine Roberts
Represented By: James William Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Satish K. Lal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Satish K. Lal M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?