Thigpen et al v. Nissan Motor Co., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen, James J. Dalton, II, Pieter Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Nina A. Teeuwissen, Lia N. Teeuwissen and Jevonte J. Smith
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., LTD., Nissan North America, Inc., Saddle Creek Transportation Inc., Orlando Ozell Johnson, Zurich American Insurance Company, Poch Staffing Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5 and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv02999
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle Prod Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Submission of #28 MOTION TO DISREGARD AFFIDAVIT re #27 Reply Brief re #14 Motion to Remand, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (slc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISREGARD AFFIDAVIT #27 Reply Brief, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cover Letter)(Henry, Lillian)
November 3, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Consent of Removal by Nissan Motor Co., LTD. (Henry, Lillian) Modified on 11/4/2022 to edit text (gas).
November 3, 2022 Filing 32 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Co., LTD.. (Henry, Lillian)
November 3, 2022 Filing 31 Nissan Motor Co., Ltd's ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Nissan Motor Co., LTD..(Henry, Lillian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 3, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISREGARD AFFIDAVIT #27 Reply Brief, filed by James J. Dalton, II, Jevonte J. Smith, Lia N. Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Nina A. Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wetherington, Matthew)
November 2, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoenas by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Subpoenas to Non-Parties)(Henry, Lillian) Modified on 11/3/2022 to edit text (gas).
October 31, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISREGARD AFFIDAVIT #27 Reply Brief, by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Henry, Lillian)
October 31, 2022 Submission of #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (slc)
October 26, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James J. Dalton, II, Jevonte J. Smith, Lia N. Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Nina A. Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wetherington, Matthew)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand . Plaintiffs shall file their Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand no later than 10/26/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/30/2022. (jkb)
September 29, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply by James J. Dalton, II, Jevonte J. Smith, Lia N. Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Nina A. Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wetherington, Matthew)
September 21, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cedric Jordan Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Orlando Johnson Declaration)(Henry, Lillian)
September 9, 2022 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Persons by Poch Staffing Inc.. (Horowitz, Andrew)
September 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri Leigh Bernal on behalf of Orlando Ozell Johnson, Saddle Creek Transportation Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company (Bernal, Terri)
September 8, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #10 Crossclaim by Orlando Ozell Johnson.(Kiella, Melody) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 7, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #9 Crossclaim by Saddle Creek Transportation Inc..(Kiella, Melody) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.s deadline to file its response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is extended to 09/21/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/06/2022. (jkb)
September 2, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Henry, Lillian)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 5/23/2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 08/31/2022. (jkb)
August 31, 2022 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and #15 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
August 29, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiff's Statement on Jurisdiction)(Henry, Lillian)
August 24, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jevonte J. Smith, Lia N. Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen(Surviving Parents of Maya E. Teeuwissen), Lisa Teeuwissen(Administrators of the Estate of Alexander Pieter Smith), Nina A. Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen(as Administrators of the Estate of Alexander Pieter Smith), Pieter Teeuwissen(Surviving Parents of Maya E. Teeuwissen), David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen. (Wetherington, Matthew)
August 24, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by James J. Dalton, II, Jevonte J. Smith, Lia N. Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Lisa Teeuwissen, Nina A. Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, Pieter Teeuwissen, David Thigpen, Regina Thigpen. (Wetherington, Matthew)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/06/2022, 9/07/2022, 9/08/2022, 9/09/2022, 9/10/2022, 9/11/2022, 9/12/2022, 9/13/2022, 9/14/2022, 9/15/2022, 10/21/2022, 10/22/2022, 10/23/2022, 10/24/2022, 11/09/2022, 11/10/2022, 11/11/2022, 11/12/2022, 11/13/2022, 11/14/2022, 11/23/2022, 11/24/2022, 11/25/2022, 11/26/2022, 11/27/2022, 11/28/2022, 12/16/2022, 12/19/2022, 12/23/2022, 12/24/2022, 12/25/2022, 12/26/2022, 12/27/2022, 12/28/2022, 12/29/2022, 12/30/2022, 12/31/2022, 1/01/2023, 1/02/2023, 1/03/2023, 3/06/2023, 3/07/2023, 3/08/2023, 3/09/2023, 3/10/2023, 4/13/2023, 4/14/2023, 4/15/2023, 4/16/2023, 4/17/2023, 4/28/2023, 4/29/2023, 4/30/2023, 5/01/2023, 5/26/2023, 5/27/2023, 5/28/2023, 6/30/2023, 7/01/2023, 7/02/2023, 7/03/2023, 7/04/2023, 7/05/2023, 7/06/2023, 7/07/2023, 07/08/2023, 7/09/2023, 7/10/2023, by Jason Digges Darneille. (Darneille, Jason)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Darneille, Jason)
August 23, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Progressive Casualty Insurance Company for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Darneille, Jason)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Orlando Ozell Johnson with Jury Demand by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Darneille, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 Defendant Poch Staffing's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Saddle Creek Transportation Inc. with Jury Demand by Poch Staffing Inc..(Horowitz, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Kiella, Melody)
August 11, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Brannen, Franklin)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/3/2023.(Henry, Lillian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing by Orlando Ozell Johnson, Saddle Creek Transportation Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed State Court Answer, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Kiella, Melody)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 1, 2022. (ash)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service , as to Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Wetherington, Matthew)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., LTD. for Nissan North America, Inc. by Nissan North America, Inc..(Henry, Lillian)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11958890) filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thigpen et al v. Nissan Motor Co., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thigpen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Thigpen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Dalton, II
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pieter Teeuwissen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Teeuwissen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina A. Teeuwissen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lia N. Teeuwissen
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jevonte J. Smith
Represented By: Eli Cohen
Represented By: Matthew Q. Wetherington
Represented By: Robert Neil Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., LTD.
Represented By: Franklin P. Brannen, Jr.
Represented By: Lillian Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin P. Brannen, Jr.
Represented By: Lillian Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddle Creek Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Melody C. Kiella
Represented By: Terri Leigh Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ozell Johnson
Represented By: Melody C. Kiella
Represented By: Terri Leigh Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Terri Leigh Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poch Staffing Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Digges Darneille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?