NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. et al v. SIEMENS CORP. et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER and TYLER BARRETTE
Defendant: SIEMENS CORP. doing business as SIEMENS USA and Siemens Industry, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03043
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Lead Case Number 1:22-cv-1229-MHC. 01229. The Clerk is DIRECTED toADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE Case No. l:22-cv-03043. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/8/2022. (dob)
September 8, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
September 7, 2022 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Charles)
August 18, 2022 Filing 57 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jason P. Johnston. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 56 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brian E. Johnson. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 55 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Rachel Paige Raphael. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 54 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Cheryl Falvey. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 53 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Toni Michelle Jackson. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 52 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Victoria S. Nugent. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 51 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Rachel K. Tack. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael J. Laird. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 49 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David A. Goodwin. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 48 Letter re:83.1 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Daniel C. Hedlund. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg) Modified on 8/18/2022 to correct text(cdg).
August 18, 2022 Filing 47 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Brian C. Gudmundson. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/10/2022. (lme)
August 3, 2022 Submission of #30 Motion to Dismiss, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bgt)
August 2, 2022 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Motion #31 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 27, 2022. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #42 Notice (Other), Response to Plaintiffs' Second Notice of Supplemental Information Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Information Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 3, 2022 Filing 41 RESPONSE re #40 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Later-Filed, Duplicative Proceedings in the Northern District of Georgia filed by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Consolidated Cases OF LATER-FILED, DUPLICATIVE PROCEEDINGS IN THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Jackson, Toni) Modified docket event/text on 6/6/2022 (zeg). Modified on 6/7/2022 (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 4, 2022 RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #39 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben Francisco Reyna on behalf of SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Reyna, Ruben).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/11/2022. (znm) Modified on 6/16/2022 (znm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben Francisco Reyna on behalf of SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Reyna, Ruben) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #37 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Information Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Supplemental Information Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
December 3, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Jackson, Toni) Modified docket event/text on 12/7/2021 (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to opposition to motion re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA filed by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 18, 2021 Filing 34 Memorandum in opposition to re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA filed by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Georgia)(Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 12/3/2021. (zcal) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Siemens' #33 Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline for Siemens' Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, it is ORDERED that the #33 Motion is GRANTED and that the deadline for Siemens to file any reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss is extended to December 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 16, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 32 Memorandum in opposition to re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint filed by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA by TYLER BARRETTE, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint by SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Siemens Industry, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint)(Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #29 Amended Complaint, the Court construes the filing of the #29 Amended Complaint as an unopposed motion to amend the #1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that that unopposed motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED the Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice as MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 19, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. with Jury Demand filed by NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., RICK KEYSER, ELECTRICALIFORNIA, Tyler Barrette.(Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rachel Raphael on behalf of SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. Substituting for attorney Chalana N. Damron (Raphael, Rachel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
September 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/15/2021. Reply due by 12/15/2021. (zcal) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Parties' Motion to Extend the Time to Oppose and Reply in Support of Siemens' Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that 1. the deadline for Plaintiffs to file any opposition to Siemens' Motion to Dismiss is extended to October 15, 2021, and 2. the deadline for Siemens to file any reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss is extended to December 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 3, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Rukiya F. Mohamed on behalf of SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Mohamed, Rukiya) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to Oppose and Reply regarding Siemens Motion to Dismiss by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of the Parties' #25 Motion for Extension of Deadlines, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by September 15, 2021, and Defendants shall file their Reply byOctober 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 26, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose and Reply in Support of Siemens' Motion to Dismiss by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gudmundson, Brian) Modified event on 8/19/2021 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goodwin on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Goodwin, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Hedlund on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Hedlund, Daniel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Frank Molinaro in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Johnson on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #20 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Goodwin, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that David A. Goodwin is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #19 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Hedlund, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Daniel C. Hedlund is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 23, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David A. Goodwin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8540098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel C. Hedlund, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8518629. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Kristine Tack on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Tack, Rachel) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Laird on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Laird, Michael) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Johnston on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Johnston, Jason) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #10 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel K. Tack, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Rachel K. Tack is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 2, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. After review of the Parties' #14 Joint Motion for Mediation and Extension of Deadlines, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. This case is hereby REFERRED to the District Court Mediation Program. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall have until August 16, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 2, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/16/2021. (zcal) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Gudmundson on behalf of ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Gudmundson, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #7 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian C. Gudmundson, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Brian C. Gudmundson is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 18, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #8 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason P. Johnston, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jason P. Johnston is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 18 , 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #9 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Laird, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Michael J. Laird is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 18, 2021. (lccjn1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Class Action Complaint, MOTION for Mediation by SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Toni). Added MOTION for Mediation on 5/14/2021 (zjf). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Anne Falvey on behalf of SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Falvey, Cheryl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chalana N. Damron on behalf of SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Damron, Chalana) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni Michelle Jackson on behalf of SIEMENS CORP., SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. (Jackson, Toni) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel K. Tack, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8435019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Laird, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8434881. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason P. Johnston, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8434658. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian C. Gudmundson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8434551. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SIEMENS CORP. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021; SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021 (Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.. (eg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. re #1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., RICK KEYSER, ELECTRICALIFORNIA. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., RICK KEYSER, ELECTRICALIFORNIA.(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SIEMENS CORP.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRICALIFORNIA, RICK KEYSER, NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SIEMENS CORP. d/b/a SIEMENS USA, SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8385858) filed by NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., RICK KEYSER, ELECTRICALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate Under LCvR 26.1)(Nugent, Victoria) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/2/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. et al v. SIEMENS CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SENTRY SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Jason P. Johnston
Represented By: Michael J. Laird
Represented By: Rachel K. Tack
Represented By: Victoria S. Nugent
Represented By: Brian E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTRICALIFORNIA
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Jason P. Johnston
Represented By: Michael J. Laird
Represented By: Rachel K. Tack
Represented By: Brian E. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria S. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK KEYSER
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Jason P. Johnston
Represented By: Michael J. Laird
Represented By: Rachel K. Tack
Represented By: Brian E. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria S. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER BARRETTE
Represented By: Victoria S. Nugent
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Brian E. Johnson
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Jason P. Johnston
Represented By: Michael J. Laird
Represented By: Rachel K. Tack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS CORP. doing business as SIEMENS USA
Represented By: Toni Michelle Jackson
Represented By: Cheryl Falvey
Represented By: Rachel Paige Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Toni Michelle Jackson
Represented By: Cheryl Falvey
Represented By: Rachel Paige Raphael
Represented By: Ruben Reyna
Represented By: Rukiya F. Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?