UBS Financial Services Inc. et al v. Smith
Petitioner: UBS Financial Services Inc. and UBS Credit Corp.
Respondent: Bruce D. Smith
Case Number: 1:2022cv03410
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09 Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Submission of #1 Petition for Arbitration to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Michael Braun's #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/1/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
September 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Braun Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12033511).. Attorney Michael F. Braun added appearing on behalf of UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services Inc. (kkh)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Braun Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12033511).by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services Inc.. (Schwartz, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/26/2022. (jkl)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by UBS Credit Corp., UBS Financial Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm arbitration award filed by UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Credit Corp.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12019737) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UBS Financial Services Inc. et al v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UBS Credit Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael F. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruce D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?