Bivins v. Franklin et al
Plaintiff: Ramona Thurman Bivins
Defendant: Felicia Franklin, Alieka Anderson, Gail Hambrick and Clayton County, Georgia
Case Number: 1:2022cv04149
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Persons by Felicia Franklin. (Tracy, Melissa)
December 12, 2022 Filing 25 Defendant Felicia Franklin's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Felicia Franklin.(Tracy, Melissa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion to Stay All Discovery. All discovery in this case, including disclosures and planning conferences pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and L.R. 26.1, shall be stayed pending the final resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/5/2022. (tas)
December 5, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay all discovery with Brief In Support by Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sabzevari, Arash)
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support)(Daughdril, Kirsten)
November 29, 2022 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ramona Thurman Bivins. (Tate, Andrew)
November 29, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Persons by Alieka Anderson. (Farmer, Randall)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Alieka Anderson. Discovery ends on 4/21/2023.(Farmer, Randall) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant Felicia Franklin's #17 Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Felicia Franklin shall have through and including December 12, 2022 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. All defenses are hereby reserved. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/18/2022. (bgt)
November 17, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Felicia Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time for Responsive Pleadings)(Jarrard, Kenneth) Modified on 11/18/2022 - Incorrect judge initials in caption. QC email sent. (bgt).
November 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Angeleah Tracy on behalf of Felicia Franklin (Tracy, Melissa) Modified on 11/18/2022 - Incorrect judge initials in caption. QC email sent. (bgt).
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Reynolds Hancock on behalf of Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick (Hancock, Jack)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arash A. Sabzevari on behalf of Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick (Sabzevari, Arash)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Searle Daughdril on behalf of Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick (Daughdril, Kirsten)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Clayton County, Georgia Answer due 12/5/2022; Gail Hambrick Answer due 12/5/2022. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/14/2022. (tas)
November 14, 2022 Submission of #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re: #1 Complaint, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Clayton County, Georgia, Gail Hambrick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, John) Modified on 11/14/2022 to edit event (tas).
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Ramona Thurman Bivins. Clayton County, Georgia served on 10/26/2022, answer due 11/16/2022. (Tate, Andrew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Ramona Thurman Bivins. Gail Hambrick served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (Tate, Andrew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Ramona Thurman Bivins. Alieka Anderson served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Tate, Andrew)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Ramona Thurman Bivins. Felicia Franklin served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022. (Tate, Andrew)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/18/2022. (tas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Clayton County, Georgia. (gas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gail Hambrick. (gas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alieka Anderson. (gas)
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Felicia Franklin. (gas)
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ramona Thurman Bivins. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12137844) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bivins v. Franklin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Thurman Bivins
Represented By: Andrew Ready Tate
Represented By: Edward D. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Franklin
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Jarrard
Represented By: Melissa Angeleah Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alieka Anderson
Represented By: Dasha Michelle Jackson
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Hambrick
Represented By: John Douglas Bennett
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Represented By: Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton County, Georgia
Represented By: John Douglas Bennett
Represented By: Jack Reynolds Hancock
Represented By: Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Represented By: Arash A. Sabzevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?