United States of America v. Newman et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James Clayton Newman, Jr., Brian Edward Newman, Tonya Bullard, Judy Yeager, Martin L. Fierman, Jones & Walden, LLC, Integrated Power Solutions, Inc., Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc., City of Covington, GA and Marcus Jordan
Case Number: 1:2023cv00158
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tonya Bullard.(Grodzicki, Joseph)
March 8, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Priority Between United States and Jones & Walden, LLC by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2023. Discovery ends on 6/21/2023. Motions due by 8/7/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2023. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/7/23. (jra)
March 7, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: United States' Initial Disclosures by United States of America.(Lanier, Christina)
March 7, 2023 Filing 25 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
March 2, 2023 Clerks Entry of Default as to Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc., Integrated Power Solutions, Inc., Brian Edward Newman, & James Clayton Newman, Jr. (jra)
March 1, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against James Clayton Newman, Jr.; Brian Edward Newman; Integrated Power Solutions, Inc; and Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc. with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
February 27, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Priority Between United States and City of Covington by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
February 15, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #21 Stipulation filed by United States of America (Lanier, Christina)
February 15, 2023 Filing 21 Stipulation of Priority by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
February 15, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Marcus Jordan waiver mailed on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 15, 2023 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Judy Yeager (jra)
February 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Judy Yeager ONLY filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Cancellation of Writ)(Lanier, Christina)
February 10, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tonya Bullard. (Grodzicki, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Tonya Bullard. Discovery ends on 7/10/2023.(Grodzicki, Joseph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 10, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. City of Covington, GA waiver mailed on 2/6/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 9, 2023 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Integrated Power Solutions, Inc. served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 9, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Brian Edward Newman served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. James Clayton Newman, Jr served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 8, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc. served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 Stipulation of Priority by United States of America. (Lanier, Christina)
January 31, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Tonya Bullard served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Clayton Newman, Jr. (jra)
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Lanier, Christina)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Martin L. Fierman waiver mailed on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jones & Walden, LLC waiver mailed on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Lanier, Christina)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by United States of America (Lanier, Christina)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tonya Bullard, City of Covington, GA, Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc., Martin L. Fierman, Integrated Power Solutions, Inc., Jones & Walden, LLC, Marcus Jordan, Brian Edward Newman, James Clayton Newman, Jr., and Judy Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Summons CITY OF COVINGTON, GA, #2 Summons MARCUS JORDAN AS NEWTON COUNTY, GA COMMISSIONER OF TAXES, #3 Summons MARTIN L. FIERMAN, #4 Summons BRIAN EDWARD NEWMAN, #5 Summons TONYA BULLARD, #6 Summons JONES & WALDEN, LLC, #7 Summons CLARKS GROVE NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC., #8 Summons INTEGRATED POWER SOLUTIONS, INC., #9 Summons JUDY YEAGER)(jra)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons to Brian Edward Newman, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Tonya Bullard, #3 Summons Proposed Summons to Judy Yeager, #4 Summons Proposed Summons to Martin L. Fierman, #5 Summons Proposed Summons to Inegrated Power Solutions, Inc., #6 Summons Proposed Summons to Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc., #7 Summons Proposed Summons to Jones & Walden, LLC, #8 Summons Proposed Summons to City of Covington, GA, #9 Summons Proposed Summons to Marcus Jordan, Newton County Comm'r of Taxes)(Lanier, Christina)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/12/2023. (bnp)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Newman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Neeli Ben-David
Represented By: Christina T. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Clayton Newman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Edward Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Bullard
Represented By: Joseph Kelsey Grodzicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin L. Fierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones & Walden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Power Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark's Grove Neighborhood Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Covington, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?