Alfa Insurance Corporation v. Kingdom Builders Covenant Church
Plaintiff: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Kingdom Builders Covenant Church doing business as Excel Church
Counter Claimant: Kingdom Builders Covenant Church
Case Number: 1:2023cv00191
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 1/15/2024. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/12/2023. (dob)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, denying without prejudice #31 Motion for Protective Order. The parties are DIRECTED to review and comply with the provisions of the Courts Standing Order and the Local Rules concerning protective order requests. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/7/23. (hfm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's RPDs by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church. (Boohaker, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by Alfa Insurance Corporation of Intent to Serve Non-Party Subpoenas & RPDs (Karabinos, Karen)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, VACATING and STRIKING the 32 Protective Order. Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order is reinstated and defendants shall have through and including November 24, 2023, to file a response brief. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/14/23. (hfm)
November 10, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Protective Order by Alfa Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F)(Karabinos, Karen) Modified on 11/14/2023 (hfm).
November 2, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
October 26, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Boohaker, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church.(Boohaker, David)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 1/15/2024. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/21/2023. (dob)
September 21, 2023 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church, Kingdom Builders Covenant Church. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Second Joint Motion to Extend Discovery)(Boohaker, David)
September 8, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
September 5, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
August 16, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Alfa Insurance Corporation Notice of Intent (Karabinos, Karen)
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alfa Insurance Corporation 30(b)(6) filed by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church, Kingdom Builders Covenant Church (Boohaker, David)
August 3, 2023 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church, Kingdom Builders Covenant Church. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Joint Motion to Extend Discovery)(Boohaker, David)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 10/16/2023. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/3/23. (hfm)
July 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Boohaker, David)
July 26, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alfa Insurance Corporation 30(b)(6) filed by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church, Kingdom Builders Covenant Church (Boohaker, David)
July 25, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 08/01/2023-08/08/2023, 10/02/2023-10/06/2023, by David Louis Boohaker. (Boohaker, David)
June 5, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
April 24, 2023 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2023. Scheduling Hearing re discovery. See Transcript. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(dob)
April 19, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Mutual Insurance Company for Alfa Insurance Corporation. (Karabinos, Karen)
April 17, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church. (Boohaker, David)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church.(Boohaker, David)
April 17, 2023 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures by Alfa Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment E - 1, #2 Attachment E - 2)(Karabinos, Karen)
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests to Defendant by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
April 17, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Alfa's Notice to Produce to Defendant by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen)
April 17, 2023 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Alfa Insurance Corporation. (Karabinos, Karen)
April 6, 2023 Filing 7 Alfa's ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Alfa Insurance Corporation.(Karabinos, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 17, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 8/14/2023.), COUNTERCLAIM against Alfa Insurance Corporation with Jury Demand by Kingdom Builders Covenant Church.(Boohaker, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 3/22/23-3/24/23, 4/14/23-4/16/23, 6/15/23-6/18/23,10/20/23-11/4/23, by Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos. (Karabinos, Karen)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alfa Insurance Corporation. Kingdom Builders Covenant Church waiver mailed on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Karabinos, Karen)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Plaintiff (Karabinos, Karen)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/25/2023. (dob)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alfa Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC- 12318561) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A pt 1, #2 Exhibit A pt 2, #3 Exhibit A pt 3, #4 Exhibit A pt 4, #5 Exhibit A pt 5, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfa Insurance Corporation v. Kingdom Builders Covenant Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfa Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Karen Kirkpatrick Karabinos
Represented By: Kevin P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Builders Covenant Church doing business as Excel Church
Represented By: David Louis Boohaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kingdom Builders Covenant Church
Represented By: David Louis Boohaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?