Bozin v. Key Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Daniel Bozin, James McNichol, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk and Jessica McNichol
Defendant: Key Bank, N.A. and Overby-Seawell Co.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00506
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Geoffrey A. Belzer re #36 Standing Order. (ceo)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/5/23. (ceo)
February 15, 2023 Filing 35 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Geoffrey A. Belzer. Clerk to follow-up by 2/27/2023. (kkh)
February 2, 2023 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01536. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 2, 2023 Filing 33 Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 3056 Keybank Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of Georgia and assigned to the Honorable Stephen D. Grimberg. (P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Filing 32 Address Change Notice by James J. Pastore, Jr filed by on behalf of Key Bank, N.A.. (Pastore, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Staying Case: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Oppose the Stay, Defendants' Motion to Stay, and Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint are all GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint shall be set by the Court following the conclusion of the Panel Action, if necessary. Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate is hereby HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the outcome of the Panel Action. This Court will rule on the Motion to Consolidate following the conclusion of the Panel Action, if necessary. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/3/2023. Related Documents #21 , #22 , #23 , #25 , #26 , #27 . (S,SR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2023: #1 Signed Order) (S,SR). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Filing 30 Reply in support of #25 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Overby-Seawell Co.. (Belzer, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
December 12, 2022 Filing 29 Reply in support of #23 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Key Bank, N.A.. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 28 Opposition to #25 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, #23 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Daniel Bozin, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk, James McNichol, Jessica McNichol. (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 27 Motion for leave INSTANTER to File Response to Motion to Stay filed by Daniel Bozin, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk, James McNichol, Jessica McNichol. Related document(s) #23 . (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 25, 2022 Filing 26 Motion for extension of time to answer Amended Complaint, until a ruling on motion for stay filed by Defendant Overby-Seawell Co.. (Belzer, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 25, 2022 Filing 25 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Defendant Overby-Seawell Co.. (Belzer, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 24 Response to #21 Motion to consolidate cases filed by Key Bank, N.A.. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 11, 2022 Filing 23 Motion to stay action pending disposition of motion for transfer and centralization pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Defendant Key Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 11, 2022 Filing 22 Motion for extension of time to Answer Amended Complaint, until a ruling on motion for stay filed by Defendant Key Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to consolidate cases filed by Daniel Bozin, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk, James McNichol, Jessica McNichol. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kristin D. Kiehn for Key Bank, N.A. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #20 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/30/2022. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 20 Motion for attorney Kristin D. Kiehn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11639007, filed by Defendant Key Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristin D. Kiehn)(Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 19 Supplement to Motion for attorney Michael Joseph Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11631832, - Declaration of Michael Bloom, filed by Key Bank, N.A.. Related document(s) #14 . (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 18 Supplement to Motion for attorney James J. Pastore Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11631797, - Declaration of James Pastore Jr., filed by Key Bank, N.A.. Related document(s) #13 . (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Daniel Bozin, James McNichol, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk. filed on behalf of Daniel Bozin, James McNichol, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James J. Pastore, Jr for Key Bank, N.A. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/27/2022.(S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael Joseph Bloom for Key Bank, N.A. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #14 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/27/2022. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Daniel Bozin, James McNichol, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk. Overby-Seawell Co. waiver sent on 9/26/2022, answer due 11/25/2022 filed on behalf of Daniel Bozin; James McNichol; Kristi Burk; Patricia Burk (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Daniel Bozin, James McNichol, Kristi Burk, Patricia Burk. Key Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 9/23/2022, answer due 11/22/2022 filed on behalf of Daniel Bozin; James McNichol; Kristi Burk; Patricia Burk (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Michael Joseph Bloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. With Declaration - does not contain original signature. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11631832, filed by Defendant Key Bank, N.A.. (Slater, James) Modified text on 9/26/2022 (O,K). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 13 Motion for attorney James J. Pastore Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. With Declaration - does not contain original signature. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11631797, filed by Defendant Key Bank, N.A.. (Slater, James) Modified text on 9/26/2022 (O,K). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 23, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for Key Bank, N.A. filed by Key Bank, N.A.. (Slater, James) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 First Amended complaint against Key Bank, N.A., Overby-Seawell Co. and adding new party plaintiff(s) James McNichol, Jessica McNichol, Kristi Burk and Patricia Burk. Filed by Daniel Bozin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit1 - Notice Letter) (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr filed by on behalf of Daniel Bozin. (Zimmerman, Thomas) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey D. Blake filed by on behalf of Daniel Bozin. (Blake, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit and Letter of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11610100, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Bozin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dann, Marc) Modified text on 9/13/2022 (M,TL). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jeffrey D. Blake for Daniel Bozin. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/12/2022. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for Daniel Bozin. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 9/12/2022. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Jeffrey D. Blake to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit and Letter of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11604915, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Bozin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Dann, Marc) Modified text on 9/8/2022 (M,TL). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Overby-Seawell Co. on 9/7/2022, filed on behalf of Daniel Bozin Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Key Bank, N.A. on 9/6/2022, filed on behalf of Daniel Bozin Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/6/2022. (G,CA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
September 6, 2022 Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. Judge David A. Ruiz terminated. (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
August 31, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Key Bank, N.A., Overby-Seawell Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 Supplement - Page 2 of Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Daniel Bozin. (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
August 30, 2022 Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
August 30, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (F,AW) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Key Bank, N.A. Filing fee paid $402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11592487. Filed by Daniel Bozin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons on KeyBank, #4 Proposed Summons on OSC) (Dann, Marc) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/2/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bozin v. Key Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bozin
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Marc Edward Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McNichol
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Burk
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Marc Edward Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Burk
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Marc Edward Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McNichol
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Marc Edward Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lisa M. Ghannoum
Represented By: James J. Pastore, Jr
Represented By: James A.. Slater
Represented By: Kristin D. Kiehn
Represented By: Michael Joseph Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overby-Seawell Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?