Jones v. Pulte
Plaintiff: Brandon Jones
Defendant: William J. Pulte
Case Number: 1:2023cv01228
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Submission of #16 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay this Action to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap)
July 19, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #16 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay this Action filed by William J. Pulte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hord, Julia)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #13 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case will proceed on a four-month discovery track that will begin thirty days after Defendant's answer is filed in the event the case is not stayed or dismissed. Initial disclosures are due at or within thirty days after the Defendant files his answer. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than thirty days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/7/2023. (ane)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #9 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay this Action. Ruled on by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/7/2023 within #18 Order. (ane)
July 5, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay this Action MOTION to Stay filed by Brandon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J.D. Grunberg, #2 Exhibit A - Jones Response to Pulte RFAs, #3 Exhibit B - Richardson v. Jones Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Johnson v. Jones Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Trester v. PulteGroup Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Trester-Pulte Social Media, #7 Exhibit F - Request to Produce from Pulte to Jones)(Grunberg, Jonathan)
June 21, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay this Action with Brief In Support by William J. Pulte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Florida Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit b - Florida Action Docket)(Hord, Julia) . Added MOTION to Stay on 6/23/2023 (ane).
June 16, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Brandon Jones.(Grunberg, Jonathan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brandon Jones. (Grunberg, Jonathan)
June 16, 2023 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brandon Jones. (Grunberg, Jonathan)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit B - First Retraction Demand, #3 Exhibit C- Second Retraction Demand)(Grunberg, Jonathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 6, 2023 (SUBMISSION TERMINATED AS PREMATURE PER THE #6 ORDER) Submission of #9 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay this Action to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap) Modified on 6/6/2023 (sap).
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. O'Neil. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/19/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Matthew Durkin. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/19/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane)
May 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Stay this Action with Brief In Support by William J. Pulte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Florida Action Docket)(Hord, Julia) . Added MOTION to Stay on 5/19/2023 (ane).
May 17, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of William C. O'Neil Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12602580).. Attorney William C. O'Neil added appearing on behalf of William J. Pulte (kkh)
May 17, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony Matthew Durkin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12602576).. Attorney Anthony Matthew Durkin added appearing on behalf of William J. Pulte (kkh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of William C. O'Neil Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12602580).by William J. Pulte. (Hord, Julia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony Matthew Durkin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12602576).by William J. Pulte. (Hord, Julia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint until 5/17/2023. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/26/2023. (ane)
April 25, 2023 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend the Time for Answering or Otherwise Responding to the Complaint by William J. Pulte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hord, Julia) Modified text on 4/26/2023 (ane).
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Brandon Jones. William J. Pulte served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Grunberg, Jonathan)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 4/11/2023. (sap)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to William J. Pulte. (tht)
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Jones (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12479933) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Pulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jones
Represented By: G. Taylor Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan David Grunberg
Represented By: Nicole Jennings Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Pulte
Represented By: Andrew Pinter
Represented By: William C. O'Neil
Represented By: Julia Carole Hord
Represented By: Anthony Matthew Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?