Securities and Exchange Commission v. French et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Michael J. French, MJF Holdings, LLC, Dugout Enterprises LLC, 208 Sears Street LLC, 211 Crooked Cedar Way LLC, 302 Keithwood Drive LLC, 313 Sliding Rock Drive LLC, 52 Rivermont Road LLC, Allys Farm LLC and MJF Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01443
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Subpoena for the production of documents upon Coinbase, Inc., #2 Subpoena for the production of documents upon Cockroach Fund LLC, #3 Subpoena for the production of documents upon TD Ameritrade, #4 Subpoena for the production of documents upon US Bank)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER MODIFYING THE COURT'S 4/5/2023 ORDER FREEZING THE ASSETS OF DEFENDANTS' AND RELIEF DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/27/2023. (nmb)
April 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Of Intent To Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Produce Documents to JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., #2 Subpoena to Produce Documents to Titan Bank)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 20, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Order Modifying Asset Freeze with Brief In Support by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Contract of Sale, #2 Exhibit B: Escrow Agreement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 19, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL J. FRENCH Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/19/2023. (nmb)
April 19, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MJF HOLDINGS, LLC Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/19/2023. (nmb)
April 19, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MJF CAPITAL, LLC Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/19/2023. (nmb) Modified text on 4/19/2023 (nmb).
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order The #9 Motion for Entry of Consent Judgments is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the consent judgments will be approved and entered. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/19/2023. (jkl)
April 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Defendant Michael J. French, #2 Consent Judgment as to Defendant Michael J. French, #3 Consent of Defendant MJF Holdings, LLC, #4 Consent Judgment as to Defendant MJF Holdings, LLC, #5 Consent of Defendant MJF Capital, LLC, #6 Consent Judgment as to Defendant MJF Capital, LLC)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Responses to Asset Freeze Order by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legacy Wealth Holdings Response, #2 Exhibit B - Cockroach Fund LLC Response, #3 Exhibit C - Titan Bank Response, #4 Exhibit D - TD Ameritrade Response, #5 Exhibit E - Farmers Trust and Savings Bank Response, #6 Exhibit F - Bank of Texas Response)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order In light of the #7 Consent Order Freezing Assets, the #2 Emergency Motion for Asset Freeze is DENIED as moot. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/6/23. (jkl)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER FREEZING ASSETS. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/2023. (nmb)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 Joint MOTION For Entry of Consent Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Freezing Assets)(Murnahan, Kristin)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/5/23. (jkl)
April 4, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. All Defendants. (Loomis, Madison)
April 3, 2023 Notification of Docket Correction: Exhibits 1-6 of #2 Emergency Motion attached to #1 Complaint in error. Exhibits re-attached to #2 Emergency Motion. NEF of #2 regenerated. (tht)
April 3, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to 208 Sears Street LLC, 211 Crooked Cedar Way LLC, 302 Keithwood Drive LLC, 313 Sliding Rock Drive LLC, 52 Rivermont Road LLC, Allys Farm LLC, Dugout Enterprises LLC, Michael J. French, MJF Holdings, LLC. (jra)
April 3, 2023 Filing 2 Emergency Motion For Asset Freeze And Other Equitable Relief with Memorandum of Law by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(jra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2023: #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6) (tht).
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Acceptance Of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/4/2023 - Exhibits 1 - 6 added to complaint in error. Exhibits added to #2 Emergency Motion. (tht).
April 3, 2023 Submission of #2 Emergency Motion For Asset Freeze And Other Equitablle Relief to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. French et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kristin Wilhelm Murnahan
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJF Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugout Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 208 Sears Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 211 Crooked Cedar Way LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 302 Keithwood Drive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 313 Sliding Rock Drive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 52 Rivermont Road LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allys Farm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJF Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?