Snow v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Snow
Defendant: Jay E. Johnson, Mark Legarda, Martin Russo, Matthew East, Doug Bondar, Mark Barnes, Nancy Livingston, Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. and John Doe Nos. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv01562
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Member cases consolidated into Lead Case 1:23-cv-01542-ELR and Administratively Closed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01542-ELR et al.(ceo)
May 2, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
May 1, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Georgia Bennett on behalf of Jay E. Johnson (Bennett, Georgia)
May 1, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #18 Motion to Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County by Jay E. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurlow, Matthew)
May 1, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Thurlow on behalf of Jay E. Johnson (Thurlow, Matthew)
April 27, 2023 Filing 30 Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 27, 2023 Filing 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #18 with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thurlow, Matthew)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: This matter is presently before the Court on Plaintiff's for extension of time to respond to Defendants' motions to transfer venu #27 . For good cause shown, the motion for extension of time #27 , is GRANTED. The deadline for filing responses to the motions to transfer venue are EXTENDED through May 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/26/23. (jra)
April 26, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue and Adoption Of Co-Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support, #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Georgia. Responses due by 5/11/2023 (jra)
April 25, 2023 Filing 27 Motion for Extension of Time Respond to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue and Adoption Of Co-Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support by Victoria Snow. (Penn, Darren)
April 25, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only, #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only filed by Victoria Snow. (Penn, Darren)
April 25, 2023 Filing 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only & Adoption of Co-Defendants' Memorandum in Support by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Defendants having filed a motion to consolidate cases for pretrial purposes #23 , the Court finds that a similar motion that was filed in state court and docketed by the Clerk upon removal #3 has been superseded. Accordingly, the original motion #3 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/25/23. (jra)
April 25, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ezzell, William)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The emergency motion to stay the deadlines for responding to the motions to transfer #19 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file a motion for a short extension of the response deadline if she needs one. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/25/23. (jra)
April 24, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Emergency Motion To Stay Time For Plaintiff's Responses To Defendants' Motions To Transfer filed by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 24, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Emergency MOTION to Stay TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER filed by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Bennett, Georgia)
April 24, 2023 Submission of #19 Emergency Motion To Stay Time For Plaintiff's Responses To Defendants' Motions To Transfer to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (jra)
April 21, 2023 Filing 19 Emergency Motion To Stay Time For Plaintiff's Responses To Defendants' Motions To Transfer with Brief In Support by Victoria Snow. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support Of Emergency Motion To Stay Time For Plaintiff's Responses To Defendants' Motions To Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Penn, Darren)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission of Matthew D. Thurlow Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/21/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
April 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew D. Thurlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12544014). Attorney Matthew D. Thurlow added appearing on behalf of Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (rvb)
April 20, 2023 Filing 18 Motion to Remand to State Court of Gwinnett County with Brief In Support by Victoria Snow. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Penn, Darren)
April 20, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Victoria Snow. (Penn, Darren)
April 20, 2023 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew D. Thurlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12544014).by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Georgia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 19, 2023 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew D. Thurlow. Clerk to follow-up by 5/1/2023. (rvb)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: For good cause shown, the motions for extension of time #10 & #12 , are GRANTED. The deadline for filing a response to the complaint is EXTENDED until 7 days after the Court rules on Defendants' motions to consolidate related cases and transfer venue #3 , #9 , & #11 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/17/23. (jra)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 17, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 14, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to Transfer Venue and Adoption Of Co-Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 14, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay or, in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Georgia)
April 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Georgia with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Ezzell, William)
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burns Marlow on behalf of Doug Bondar, Matthew East (Marlow, Timothy)
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Brent Hatcher on behalf of Doug Bondar, Matthew East (Hatcher, R.)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark Barnes, Doug Bondar, Cardinal Health, Inc., John Doe Nos. 1-10, Matthew East, Jay E. Johnson, Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo identifying Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC. (Ezzell, William)
April 12, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Related Cases by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo Notice of Related Cases (Bennett, Georgia)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/12/2023. (bnp)
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 Brief Regarding Assignment of Related Cases re #3 MOTION in Support of Notice of Related Cases filed by Victoria Snow. (Filed originally in state court of Gwinnett County on 4/6/2023) (adg)
April 11, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION in Support of Notice of Related Cases by Mark Barnes, Doug Bondar, Cardinal Health, Inc., Matthew East, Jay E. Johnson, Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Filed originally in State Court of Gwinnett County on 4/3/2023) (adg)
April 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Martin Russo, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12521411). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Snow
Represented By: Alexandra Cole
Represented By: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: John David Hadden
Represented By: Kevin M. Ketner
Represented By: William L. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay E. Johnson
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Legarda
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Russo
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew East
Represented By: R. Brent Hatcher
Represented By: Timothy Burns Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bondar
Represented By: R. Brent Hatcher
Represented By: Timothy Burns Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barnes
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Livingston
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Wesley Ross
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Wesley Ross
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?