Jones v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Charles Jones
Defendant: Jay E. Johnson, Mark Legarda, Martin Russo, Matthew East, Doug Bondar, Mark Barnes, Nancy Livingston, Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. and John Doe Nos. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv01563
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Member cases consolidated into Lead Case 1:23-cv-01542-ELR and Administratively Closed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01542-ELR et al.(ceo)
May 2, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
May 1, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Georgia Bennett on behalf of Jay E. Johnson (Bennett, Georgia)
May 1, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jay E. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurlow, Matthew)
May 1, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Thurlow on behalf of Jay E. Johnson (Thurlow, Matthew)
April 27, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 27, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thurlow, Matthew) Modified on 4/28/2023 to edit text to remove duplicate wording (dob).
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Stay. The parties shall fully brief the Motions to Transfer and Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs request for an extension of fourteen (14) days to respond to Defendants' Motions to Transfer is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/26/2023. (dob)
April 25, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only, #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only filed by Charles Jones. (Penn, Darren)
April 25, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 25, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Charles Jones. (Penn, Darren)
April 25, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes Only with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ezzell, William)
April 24, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Emergency MOTION to Stay filed by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 24, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 Emergency MOTION to Stay Time for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Transfer filed by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Bennett, Georgia) Modified on 4/24/2023 to remove upper case lettering (dob).
April 21, 2023 Filing 16 Emergency MOTION to Stay Time for Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motions to Transfer with Brief In Support by Charles Jones. (Attachments: #1 Brief IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO TRANSFER, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Penn, Darren) Modified on 4/24/2023 to remove upper case lettering (dob).
April 21, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement, and #14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Thurlow by CRD at the direction of the Clerk. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/21/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
April 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew D. Thurlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12544063). Attorney Matthew D. Thurlow added appearing on behalf of Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (rvb)
April 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Charles Jones. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(Penn, Darren)
April 20, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by Charles Jones. (Penn, Darren)
April 20, 2023 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew D. Thurlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12544063).by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Georgia) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 19, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Matthew D. Thurlow. Clerk to follow-up by 5/1/2023. (rvb)
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Mark Barnes Answer due 5/18/2023; Doug Bondar Answer due 5/18/2023; Cardinal Health, Inc. Answer due 5/18/2023; Matthew East Answer due 5/18/2023; Jay E. Johnson Answer due 5/18/2023; Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC Answer due 5/18/2023; Mark Legarda Answer due 5/18/2023; Nancy Livingston Answer due 5/18/2023; Martin Russo Answer due 5/18/2023. Defendants' #8 Motion to Stay remains pending and will be consideredfollowing the parties' filing of any responsive briefing. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/17/20203. (dob) Modified on 4/17/2023 to edit text (dob).
April 17, 2023 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 MOTION to Stay or, in the alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pleading filed as single part motion; should be multi part motion. Clerk made necessary changes. (dob)
April 17, 2023 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
April 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA by Doug Bondar, Matthew East. (Hatcher, R.)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay or, in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Georgia). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 4/17/2023 (dob).
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Georgia with Brief In Support by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Ezzell, William)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burns Marlow on behalf of Doug Bondar, Matthew East (Marlow, Timothy)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Brent Hatcher on behalf of Doug Bondar, Matthew East (Hatcher, R.)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/13/2023. (dob)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark Barnes, Doug Bondar, Cardinal Health, Inc., Matthew East, John Doe Nos. 1-10, Jay E. Johnson, Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo identifying Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC. (Ezzell, William)
April 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc., Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Martin Russo Notice of Related Cases (Bennett, Georgia)
April 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC, Martin Russo, Mark Legarda, Nancy Livingston, Mark Barnes, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12521463) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jones
Represented By: Alexandra Cole
Represented By: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: John David Hadden
Represented By: Kevin M. Ketner
Represented By: William L. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay E. Johnson
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Legarda
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Russo
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew East
Represented By: R. Brent Hatcher
Represented By: Timothy Burns Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bondar
Represented By: R. Brent Hatcher
Represented By: Timothy Burns Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barnes
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Livingston
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Patient Recovery U.S., LLC
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Wesley Ross
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Georgia Bennett
Represented By: S. Derek Bauer
Represented By: Wesley Ross
Represented By: William Douglas Ezzell
Represented By: Matthew D. Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?