RLI Insurance Company et al v. Laras Trucks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RLI Insurance Company and Knightbrook Insurance Company
Defendant: Laras Trucks, Inc., Martimiano Hernandez, Rene Singleton, Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez, Sungliying Suju Torres, Joan Samuel Lewis, Allison Porter, Ramon Vazquez Neri, Brenda Garcia Pineda, Katrice Lott, Lasanje Dianda Weems, Malcomb Xechariah, Julie McCallum, Erick A. Roque and Roy Dunkentell
Case Number: 1:2023cv01589
Filed: April 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Laras Trucks, Inc. answer due 6/20/2023; Allison Porter answer due 6/22/2023; Erick A. Roque answer due 6/21/2023. (ceo)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #30 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Discovery in this case shall continue for a period of four (4) months, to conclude on September 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/6/23. (ceo)
June 5, 2023 Filing 30 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Knightbrook Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
June 2, 2023 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by RLI Insurance Company. Allison Porter served on 6/1/2023. (Veal, Gregory)
June 2, 2023 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Knightbrook Insurance Company. Laras Trucks, Inc. served on 5/30/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Harris, David) Modified to correct answer due date on 6/7/2023 (ceo).
June 2, 2023 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Knightbrook Insurance Company. Erick A. Roque served on 5/31/2023, answer due 6/21/2023. (Harris, David) Modified to correct answer due date on 6/7/2023 (ceo).
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Parties to submit a JPRDP within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order and DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action to the undersigned after the fourteen (14)-day period expires. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/26/23. (ceo)
May 17, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #25 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rene Singleton. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
May 12, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rene Singleton. (Skaar, Kris)
May 11, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Rene Singleton.(Skaar, Kris) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 8, 2023 Interpleader Deposit Received by RLI Insurance Company (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $35,000.00, Receipt #: 100003464. (ceo)
May 8, 2023 Interpleader Deposit Received by Knightbrook Insurance Company (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $35,000.00. Receipt #: 100003465. (ceo)
May 1, 2023 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by RLI Insurance Company. Lasanje Dianda Weems served on 4/14/2023. (Veal, Gregory)
April 28, 2023 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by RLI Insurance Company. Joan Samuel Lewis served on 4/27/2023. (Veal, Gregory)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $35,000.00. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/28/23. c:Financial Office(ceo)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $35,000.00. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/28/23. c:Financial Office(ceo)
April 26, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ramon Vazquez Neri. (Gillespie, Tristan)
April 26, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ramon Vazquez Neri. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
April 25, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy Dunkentell, Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez, Martimiano Hernandez, Katrice Lott, Julie McCallum, Malcomb Xechariah. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to edit event text on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Martimiano Hernandez, Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez, Katrice Lott, Malcomb Xechariah, Roy Dunkentell, Julie McCallum. (Flinn, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 25, 2023 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Roy Dunkentell. Roy Dunkentell served on 4/21/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez. Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez served on 4/21/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Martimiano Hernandez. Martimiano Hernandez served on 4/21/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Malcomb Xechariah. Malcomb Xechariah served on 4/21/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Katrice Lott. Katrice Lott served on 4/21/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Julie McCallum. Julie McCallum served on 4/27/2023. (Flinn, Thomas) Modified to correct service date on 4/25/2023 (ceo).
April 25, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #18 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roy Dunkentell, Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez, Martimiano Hernandez, Katrice Lott, Julie McCallum and Malcomb Xechariah. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Ramon Vazquez Neri. Discovery ends on 9/21/2023.(Gillespie, Tristan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Wade Gillespie on behalf of Ramon Vazquez Neri (Gillespie, Tristan)
April 17, 2023 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Ramon Vazquez Neri. Ramon Vazquez Neri served on 4/17/2023. (Gillespie, Tristan)
April 17, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Sungliying Suju Torres. Sungliying Suju Torres served on 4/17/2023. (Rosner, Noah)
April 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 14, 2023 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knightbrook Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for RLI Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Knightbrook Insurance Company, Ltd. for Knightbrook Insurance Company. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Veal, Gregory)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) with Brief In Support by Knightbrook Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, David)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knightbrook Insurance Company, RLI Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp. for RLI Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Knightbrook Insurance Company, Ltd. for Knightbrook Insurance Company. (Harris, David)
April 12, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (tht)
April 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RLI Insurance Company and Knightbrook Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12524032) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RLI Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Knightbrook Bond, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLI Insurance Company et al v. Laras Trucks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory R. Veal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knightbrook Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laras Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martimiano Hernandez
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Singleton
Represented By: Kris Kelly Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porfirio Mojica Gutierrez
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sungliying Suju Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Samuel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Vazquez Neri
Represented By: Tristan Wade Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Garcia Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrice Lott
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasanje Dianda Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcomb Xechariah
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie McCallum
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick A. Roque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Dunkentell
Represented By: Thomas Michael Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?