Harris et al v. Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Harris and Michael Harris
Defendant: Mercer Global Advisors, Inc., E*TRADE Savings Bank and E*TRADE Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01675
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against E*TRADE Savings Bank, E*TRADE Securities, LLC, Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. filed by Vicki Harris, Michael Harris.(rlh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ECF #11 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the Proposed First Amended Complaint [ECF 11-1]. Defendants' motions to dismiss ECFs #3 and #4 are DENIED as moot. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/12/23. (rlh)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: On review of the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan #14 , the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. Plaintiffs and Defendant E*TRADE have agreed to arbitrate and stay this matter pending that arbitration. Accordingly, all deadlines as they pertain to Plaintiffs and E*TRADE are hereby STAYED. Regarding Plaintiffs and Defendant Mercer, discovery will end on January 22, 2024. Dispositive motions must be filed by February 21, 2024. If a dispositive motion is not filed, the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order must be filed by March 7, 2024, otherwise the Consolidated Pre-Trial Order will be due 30 days after the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/12/23. (rlh)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Local Rule 3.3, NDGa, provides that counsel must file a certificate of interested persons or corporate disclosure statement at the time of first appearance. A review of the docket in this action indicates that Plaintiffs have not complied with this requirement. Within 7 days of this Order, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement. The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to resubmit this docket entry to the Court after 7 days. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 06/05/2023. (slc)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mercer Advisors Intermediate Holdings Inc. for Mercer Global Advisors, Inc.. (Nichols, Alan)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Defendants' time to reply to Plaintiffs' response to the Motion to Dismiss is extended. Defendants Reply deadline is June 16, 2023. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 05/25/2023. (slc)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Bassett, Leslie)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Bassett, Leslie)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Bassett, Leslie)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Bassett, Leslie)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Extension of Time (ECF #10 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time (ECF #9 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is due on May 19, 2023. All other deadlines related to Defendants Motion to Dismiss are set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 05/03/2023. (slc) Modified to edit text on 5/4/2023 (aaq).
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension Of Time In Relation to Defendant E*Trade Securities, Llcs Motion To Dismiss, Or Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration And Stay Action; And Defendant Mercer Global Advisors Inc.s Motion to Dismiss re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bassett, Leslie)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time In Relation to Defendant E*Trade Securities, Llcs Motion To Dismiss, Or Alternatively, To Compel Arbitration And Stay Action; And Defendant Mercer Global Advisors Inc.s Motion To Dismiss re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Harris, Vicki Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bassett, Leslie)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Application of Jodi Benassi for Admission Pro Hac Vice as directed by the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 04/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Application of Kurt A. Kappes for Admission Pro Hac Vice as directed by the Office of the Clerk. APPROVED by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 04/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kurt A. Kappes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556344). Attorney Kurt A. Kappes added appearing on behalf of E*TRADE Securities, LLC. (rvb)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jodi Benassi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556013). Attorney Jodi Benassi added appearing on behalf of Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. (rvb)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by E*TRADE Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ETCM Holdings, LLC for E*TRADE Securities, LLC. (Browning, James)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kurt A. Kappes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556344). with Brief In Support by E*TRADE Securities, LLC. (Browning, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jodi Benassi Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12556013). with Brief In Support by Mercer Global Advisors, Inc.. (Nichols, Alan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kurt A. Kappes. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2023. (rvb)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Mercer Global Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Alan)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action with Brief In Support by E*TRADE Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Exhibit A to Pls.' Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Walsh Account Application, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Operative Customer Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Declaration of Erik Renga)(Browning, James)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Nichols, Alan)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12531650) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 E*TRADE Securities LLC Notice of Consent to Removal)(kng) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Mercer Global Advisors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Harris
Represented By: Leslie Maddox Bassett
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Represented By: Leslie Maddox Bassett
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Global Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Shane Nichols
Represented By: Jodi Benassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Securities, LLC
Represented By: James Richard Browning, Jr
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?